Richeson v. Weiser
Plaintiff: David Allen Richeson
Defendant: Philip J. Weiser
Case Number: 1:2022cv01370
Filed: June 1, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Michael E Hegarty
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 28, 2022 Filing 19 MOTION to Compel U.S. Veteran Administration to Provide Requested Information by Plaintiff David Allen Richeson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(cmadr, )
July 20, 2022 Filing 18 MOTION to Compel Policy Waiver by Plaintiff David Allen Richeson. (cmadr, )
July 14, 2022 Filing 17 REPLY to Response to #8 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Defendant Philip J. Weiser. (Katarikawe, Andrew)
July 5, 2022 Filing 16 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re: #12 Order on Motion to Clarify, #11 MOTION to Clarify Addressed to David Allen Richeson 7105 Simms Street Arvada, CO 80004. (Attachments: #1 Continuation of Main Document) (cmadr, )
July 1, 2022 Filing 15 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re: #9 Minute Order, Addressed to David Allen Richeson 7105 Simms Street Arvada, CO 80004. (cmadr, )
June 30, 2022 Filing 14 RESPONSE to #8 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Plaintiff David Allen Richeson. (cmadr, )
June 24, 2022 Filing 13 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re: #4 Summons Request, and #5 Summons Issued Addressed to David Allen Richeson 7105 Simms Street Arvada, CO 80004. (cmadr, )
June 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 24 June 2022. Plaintiff's Motion to Clarify #11 is granted, and based on his explanation, the Court will continue to use the 7105 Simms Street address. However, the Court emphasizes that ultimately, it is Plaintiff's own responsibility to stay up-to-date with his case.(cmadr, )
June 23, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION to Clarify for the Court Plaintiff's Physical Contact Information-Mailing Address by Plaintiff David Allen Richeson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(cmadr, )
June 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 22 June 2022. Before the Court is Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. ECF #8 . Pursuant to D.C. Colo. LCivR 7.1(d) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 6(d), Plaintiff shall file a response to the motion on or before July 18, 2022. Defendant may file his reply in support of the motion within fourteen days after the response. In addition, the Court notes that the Clerk of Court may not have the correct mailing address for Plaintiff. Mail sent to the 7105 Simms Street address that Plaintiff provided was returned as undeliverable. As soon as possible upon notice of this Minute Order, Plaintiff shall provide his correct mailing address to the Clerk of Court and file a Notice of such in this case. The Court asks Defendant's counsel to email a copy of this Minute Order to Plaintiff at any his known email addresses. (cmadr, )
June 22, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Defendant Philip J. Weiser. (Katarikawe, Andrew)
June 21, 2022 Filing 10 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re: #1 Complaint, #3 Magistrate Judge, 2 Case Assigned to Judge Addressed to David Allen Richeson. (sphil, )
June 15, 2022 Filing 7 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re: #6 Summons Returned Executed, #1 Complaint Addressed to David Allen Richeson 7105 Simms Street Arvada, CO 80004. (Attachments: #1 Continuation of Main Document) (cmadr, )
June 2, 2022 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed Philip J. Weiser served on 6/1/2022, answer due 6/22/2022. (cmadr, )
June 1, 2022 Filing 5 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (jtorr, )
June 1, 2022 Filing 4 SUMMONS REQUEST by Plaintiff David Allen Richeson. (jtorr, )
June 1, 2022 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. No summons issued. (jtorr, )
June 1, 2022 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Text Only Entry. (jtorr, )
June 1, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Philip J. Weiser (Filing Fee: $402, Receipt Number: COX103373), filed by David Allen Richeson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Receipt) (jtorr, ) Modified to attach copy of receipt on 6/1/2022 (cmadr, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Richeson v. Weiser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Allen Richeson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philip J. Weiser
Represented By: Andrew Mutabaazi Katarikawe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?