Toddy, LLC v. Brumate, Inc.
Plaintiff: Toddy, LLC
Defendant: Brumate, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2022cv01441
Filed: June 8, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: S Kato Crews
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1051 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2022 Filing 14 Toddy, LLC's ANSWER/REPLY to #12 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Brumate, Inc. Attorney Melissa Lawson Romero added to party Toddy, LLC(pty:cd), Attorney Melissa Lawson Romero added to party Toddy, LLC(pty:pla) by Toddy, LLC.(Romero, Melissa)
July 1, 2022 Filing 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Stohry, Bradley)
July 1, 2022 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against Toddy, LLC by Brumate, Inc..(Stohry, Bradley)
July 1, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Bradley Mark Stohry on behalf of Brumate, Inc.Attorney Bradley Mark Stohry added to party Brumate, Inc.(pty:dft) (Stohry, Bradley)
June 15, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Saul Daniel Cohen on behalf of Toddy, LLCAttorney Saul Daniel Cohen added to party Toddy, LLC(pty:pla) (Cohen, Saul)
June 15, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by David Michael Kelly on behalf of Toddy, LLCAttorney David Michael Kelly added to party Toddy, LLC(pty:pla) (Kelly, David)
June 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Setting Telephonic Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference. The Telephonic Scheduling Conference is set for 9-8-2022 at 10:30 am in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. The parties shall file their proposed scheduling order, and email a copy in Word format to Crews_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov, 7 days before the Telephonic Scheduling Conference (on or before 9-1-2022). The Magistrate Judge Consent Form [#4] is due 9-1-2022. Dial in information for the Scheduling Conference is as follows:CONFERENCE CALL LINE: (888) 251-2909ACCESS CODE: 5662814# SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 6-14-2022. Text Only Entry (skclc2).
June 13, 2022 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Toddy, LLC. Brumate, Inc. served on 6/10/2022, answer due 7/1/2022. (Fairless, Carolyn)
June 9, 2022 Filing 5 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (jcharl, )
June 8, 2022 Filing 6 Report re Patent/Trademark: Report on the filing of an action emailed (NEF) to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (jcharl, )
June 8, 2022 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Text Only Entry. (jcharl, )
June 8, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE Report on the Filing of an Action Regarding a Trademark by Plaintiff Toddy, LLC (Fairless, Carolyn)
June 8, 2022 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Fairless, Carolyn)
June 8, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Brumate, Inc. (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number ACODC-8496817)Attorney Carolyn J. Fairless added to party Toddy, LLC(pty:pla), filed by Toddy, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Summons, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Fairless, Carolyn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Toddy, LLC v. Brumate, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Toddy, LLC
Represented By: Carolyn J. Fairless
Represented By: David Michael Kelly
Represented By: Melissa Lawson Romero
Represented By: Saul Daniel Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brumate, Inc.
Represented By: Bradley Mark Stohry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?