Debien v. ServiceSource International, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Stephen Debien
Defendant: ServiceSource International, Inc., Andrew M. Baker, Jane Okun Bomba, John Ferron, John Harris, John A. Meyer, Gary B. Moore and Rich Walker
Case Number: 1:2022cv01452
Filed: June 9, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Christine M Arguello
Referring Judge: Lewis T Babcock
2 Judge: S Kato Crews
Nature of Suit: Securities, Commodities, Exchange
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 78 Securities Exchange Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER Setting Telephone Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference. Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 9/21/2022 10:00 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. The parties shall file their proposed scheduling order and email a copy in Word format to Crews_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov, no later than seven calendar days before the conference. At the scheduled time, counsel shall call the Court provided conference line at (888) 251-2909 Access Code: 5662814#. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 7/14/2022. Text Only Entry (amont, )
July 11, 2022 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Stephen Debien. Andrew M. Baker waiver sent on 7/7/2022, answer due 9/6/2022; Jane Okun Bomba waiver sent on 7/7/2022, answer due 9/6/2022; John Ferron waiver sent on 7/7/2022, answer due 9/6/2022; John Harris waiver sent on 7/7/2022, answer due 9/6/2022; John A. Meyer waiver sent on 7/7/2022, answer due 9/6/2022; Gary B. Moore waiver sent on 7/7/2022, answer due 9/6/2022; ServiceSource International, Inc. waiver sent on 7/7/2022, answer due 9/6/2022; Rich Walker waiver sent on 7/7/2022, answer due 9/6/2022. (Ackerman, Marc)
July 8, 2022 Filing 14 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (sphil, )
June 29, 2022 Filing 13 SUMMONS REQUEST as to SERVICESOURCE INTERNATIONAL, INC., ANDREW M. BAKER, JANE OKUN BOMBA, JOHN FERRON, JOHN HARRIS, JOHN A. MEYER, GARY B. MOORE, RICH WALKER by Plaintiff Stephen Debien. (Ackerman, Marc)
June 28, 2022 Filing 12 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES: re: #11 Summons Request filed by attorney Ackerman, Marc. The summons will not be issued due to an incomplete case caption. The summons must list all defendants; "et al." cannot substitute the listing of all parties named in the case. Action to take - REFILE THE DOCUMENT. (Text Only Entry) (sphil, )
June 28, 2022 Filing 11 SUMMONS REQUEST as to SERVICESOURCE INTERNATIONAL, INC. ANDREW M. BAKER, JANE OKUN BOMBA, JOHN FERRON, JOHN HARRIS, JOHN A. MEYER, GARY B. MOORE, RICH WALKER by Plaintiff Stephen Debien. (Ackerman, Marc)
June 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Magistrate Judge Crews is designated to conduct NDISPO proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b). Court-sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. The Magistrate Judge, at his/her discretion, may convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. SO ORDERED by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 6/22/2022. Text Only Entry (cmasec)
June 21, 2022 Filing 9 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #8 Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Christine M. Arguello and drawn to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. All future pleadings should be designated as 22-cv-01452-CMA. (Text Only Entry) (csarr, )
June 21, 2022 Filing 8 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Stephen Debien All parties do not consent.. (Ackerman, Marc)
June 10, 2022 Filing 7 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (trvo, )
June 10, 2022 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE by Senior Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 6/10/2022. This case is randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. All future pleadings should be designated as 22-cv-01452-SKC. (trvo, )
June 9, 2022 Filing 5 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). Summons submitted is incomplete and not issued. Attorneys are not allowed to issue summonses pursuant to Fed. Civ. Rule 4. Please file completed summons for issuance using the event Summons Request. (norlin, )
June 9, 2022 Filing 4 Case assigned to Judge Lewis T. Babcock and drawn to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Text Only Entry (norlin, )
June 9, 2022 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Ackerman, Marc)
June 9, 2022 Filing 2 SUMMONS REQUEST as to SERVICESOURCE INTERNATIONAL, INC. ANDREW M. BAKER, JANE OKUN BOMBA, JOHN FERRON, JOHN HARRIS, JOHN A. MEYER, GARY B. MOORE, RICH WALKER by Plaintiff Stephen Debien. (Ackerman, Marc)
June 9, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew M. Baker, Jane Okun Bomba, John Ferron, John Harris, John A. Meyer, Gary B. Moore, ServiceSource International, Inc., Rich Walker (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number BCODC-8498392)Attorney Marc L. Ackerman added to party Stephen Debien(pty:pla), filed by Stephen Debien. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Ackerman, Marc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Debien v. ServiceSource International, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Debien
Represented By: Marc L. Ackerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ServiceSource International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Okun Bomba
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Ferron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John A. Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary B. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rich Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?