Sanchez-Bell v. CSAA General Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Bernie Sachez-Bell and Bernie Sanchez-Bell
Defendant: CSAA General Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2022cv01678
Filed: July 6, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: William J Martinez
Referring Judge: Scott T Varholak
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 10, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 8/23/2022. (morti, )
August 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTE ENTRY for Scheduling Conference held before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 8/23/2022. Discovery due by 4/14/2023. Dispositive Motions due by 5/19/2023. Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/13/2023 09:15 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. FTR: A402. (morti, )
August 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant CSAA General Insurance Company All parties do not consent.. (Taylor, Winslow)
August 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Proposed Scheduling Order by Defendant CSAA General Insurance Company. (Taylor, Winslow)
July 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ANSWER to #4 Complaint by CSAA General Insurance Company.(Taylor, Winslow)
July 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 11 July 2022. Proposed Scheduling Order due 8/16/2022. Scheduling Conference set for 8/23/2022 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. (cmadr, )
July 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Counsel for the parties and all counsel who may later enter an appearance shall review and familiarize themselves with the undersigned's Revised Practice Standards (as most recently revised effective December 1, 2021 and as they may be amended from time to time), which may be downloaded #here. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 7/ 11/2022. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
July 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Magistrate Judge Varholak, or such other Magistrate Judge who may in the future be reassigned this case, is designated to conduct NDISPO proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 72(a) and (b). Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the Magistrate Judge or on the request of the parties by motion, the court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 7/11/2022. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
July 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Matthew Eric Bennett on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Matthew Eric Bennett added to party Bernie Sachez-Bell(pty:pla) (Bennett, Matthew)
July 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Kurt Hans Henkel on behalf of CSAA General Insurance CompanyAttorney Kurt Hans Henkel added to party CSAA General Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Henkel, Kurt)
July 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE by Senior Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 7/8/2022. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge William J. Martinez and drawn to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. All future pleadings should be designated as 22-cv-01678-WJM. (trvo, )
July 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (jtorr, )
July 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 COMPLAINT for Damages and Jury Demand against CSAA General Insurance Company, filed by Bernie Sachez-Bell.(jtorr, )
July 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Case assigned to Judge Lewis T. Babcock and drawn to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Text Only Entry. (jtorr, )
July 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (jtorr, )
July 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by CSAA General Insurance Company from Denver County District Court, Case Number 2022CV31671. (Filing fee $ 402, Receipt Number ACODC-8539953), filed by CSAA General Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Complaint), #2 Exhibit B (Summons), #3 Exhibit C (District Court Cover Sheet), #4 Exhibit D (Pre-Trial Order), #5 Exhibit E (Delay Reduction Order), #6 Exhibit F (Register of Actions), #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Taylor, Winslow)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sanchez-Bell v. CSAA General Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bernie Sachez-Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bernie Sanchez-Bell
Represented By: Matthew Eric Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSAA General Insurance Company
Represented By: Winslow Russell Taylor, III
Represented By: Kurt Hans Henkel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?