Rocky Mountain Gun Owners et al v. Town of Superior, The et al
Plaintiff: Rocky Mountain Gun Owners, National Association for Gun Rights and Charles Bradley Walker
Defendant: Town of Superior, The and Joe Pelle
Case Number: 1:2022cv01685
Filed: July 7, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Raymond P Moore
Referring Judge: N Reid Neureiter
Nature of Suit: Constitutionality of State Statutes
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2022 Filing 40 Unopposed MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Defendant Town of Superior, The. (Perez-Marques, Antonio)
August 24, 2022 Filing 39 NOTICE OF CASE ASSOCIATION by Gordon Lamar Vaughan on behalf of Town of Superior, The (Vaughan, Gordon)
August 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 38 Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 9 August 2022. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties' Joint Motion to Vacate Scheduling Conference (Dkt. #32 ) is GRANTED. The Scheduling Conference set for October 20, 2022 at 10:30 a.m. is VACATED. Counsel shall jointly contact chambers (303-335-2403) to reset the scheduling conference on notice within ten days of the Judge Moore's order on Plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction. PLEASE READ ATTACHED MINUTE ORDER. (cmadr, )
August 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER MODIFYING #34 TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER. By Judge Raymond P. Moore on 8/9/2022.(sdunb, )
August 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER: This matter is before the Court on Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to First Amended Complaint #33 . Being fully advised and finding good cause, the Motion is GRANTED. Defendant shall have until September 30, 2022, in which to file a response to the First Amended Complaint. SO ORDERED by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 8/9/2022. (Text Only Entry)(rmsec )
August 9, 2022 Filing 35 MEMORANDUM regarding #32 MOTION to Vacate filed by Charles Bradley Walker, Rocky Mountain Gun Owners, National Association for Gun Rights. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. By Judge Raymond P. Moore on 8/9/2022. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
August 9, 2022 Filing 34 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify #18 Order on Motion for TRO,, by Defendant Town of Superior, The. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Proposed Order Granting Def's Mot to Modify TRO)(Vaughan, Gordon)
August 9, 2022 Filing 33 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #20 Amended Complaint by Defendant Town of Superior, The. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Proposed Order Granting Motion for EOT to File Response to 1AC)(Vaughan, Gordon)
August 9, 2022 Filing 32 MOTION to Vacate by Plaintiffs National Association for Gun Rights, Rocky Mountain Gun Owners, Charles Bradley Walker. (Arrington, Barry)
August 3, 2022 Filing 31 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Antonio J. Perez-Marques on behalf of Town of Superior, TheAttorney Antonio J. Perez-Marques added to party Town of Superior, The(pty:dft) (Perez-Marques, Antonio)
August 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MINUTE ORDER: This Matter is before the Court following a status conference with the Parties on July 30, 2022 #27 . Pursuant to the agreement of the Parties, the Temporary Restraining Order #18 is DISSOLVED only as to Defendant Joe Pelle, who has been dismissed from this case by Plaintiffs, and the Temporary Restraining Order shall remain in effect pending resolution of the Motion for Preliminary Injunction. The scope of the Temporary Restraining Order may be further modified by agreement of the Parties. SO ORDERED by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 8/1/2022. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
July 29, 2022 Filing 29 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by William James Taylor, Jr on behalf of Town of Superior, TheAttorney William James Taylor, Jr added to party Town of Superior, The(pty:dft) (Taylor, William)
July 29, 2022 Filing 28 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Carey R. Dunne on behalf of Town of Superior, TheAttorney Carey R. Dunne added to party Town of Superior, The(pty:dft) (Dunne, Carey)
July 29, 2022 Filing 27 COURTROOM MINUTES for proceedings held before Judge Raymond P. Moore: Telephonic Status Conference held on 7/29/2022. MOTION to Vacate AND RESET PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION HEARING AND FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE RESPONSE TO COMPLAINT is granted in part and denied in part. Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for 11/8/2022 and 11/9/2022 at 9:00 AM each day in Courtroom A 601 before Judge Raymond P. Moore. Defendant's response to the Motion for Preliminary Injunction due by 9/30/2022. Plaintiff's reply due by 10/21/2022. Court Reporter: Tammy Hoffschildt. (cpear)
July 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MINUTE ORDER: With the assignment of this matter, the parties are advised that throughout this case they are expected to be familiar and comply with not only the Local Rules of this District, but also Judge Raymond P. Moore's Civil Practice Standards, which may be found at: http://www.cod.uscourts.gov/JudicialOfficers/ActiveArticleIIIJudges/HonRaymondPMoore.aspx. SO ORDERED by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 7/29/2022. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
July 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order, and (5) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. By Judge Raymond P. Moore on 7/29/2022. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
July 28, 2022 Filing 24 Party Joe Pelle (in his capacity as Sheriff of Boulder County, Colorado) terminated pursuant to the #20 Amended Complaint filed in this case. Text Only Entry. (sdunb, )
July 28, 2022 Filing 23 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Christopher Philip Lynch on behalf of Town of Superior, TheAttorney Christopher Philip Lynch added to party Town of Superior, The(pty:dft) (Lynch, Christopher)
July 28, 2022 Filing 22 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by David B. Toscano on behalf of Town of Superior, TheAttorney David B. Toscano added to party Town of Superior, The(pty:dft) (Toscano, David)
July 28, 2022 Filing 21 NOTICE re #20 Amended Complaint of Resolution by Defendant Joe Pelle (Hughes, David)
July 28, 2022 Filing 20 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Town of Superior, The, filed by Rocky Mountain Gun Owners, Charles Bradley Walker, National Association for Gun Rights.(Arrington, Barry)
July 26, 2022 Filing 19 MOTION to Vacate AND RESET PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION HEARING AND FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE RESPONSE TO COMPLAINT by Defendant Town of Superior, The. (Vaughan, Gordon)
July 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 07/22/2022. Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction (ECF No. #11 ) is GRANTED IN PART, DENIED IN PART, and DEFERRED IN PART as indicated in the attached Order. This Temporary Restraining Order shall remain in effect for fourteen (14) days from its effective date, unless it is otherwise modified by the Court. Status Conference set for 7/29/2022 10:30 AM in Courtroom A 601 before Judge Raymond P. Moore. Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for 8/4/2022 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 601 before Judge Raymond P. Moore. (athom, )
July 20, 2022 Filing 17 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Gordon Lamar Vaughan on behalf of Town of Superior, TheAttorney Gordon Lamar Vaughan added to party Town of Superior, The(pty:dft) (Vaughan, Gordon)
July 19, 2022 Filing 16 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by David Evan Hughes on behalf of Joe PelleAttorney David Evan Hughes added to party Joe Pelle(pty:dft) (Hughes, David)
July 19, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Colin James Mayberry on behalf of Joe PelleAttorney Colin James Mayberry added to party Joe Pelle(pty:dft) (Mayberry, Colin)
July 14, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Eric Paul Apjoke on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Eric Paul Apjoke added to party National Association for Gun Rights(pty:pla), Attorney Eric Paul Apjoke added to party Rocky Mountain Gun Owners(pty:pla), Attorney Eric Paul Apjoke added to party Charles Bradley Walker(pty:pla) (Apjoke, Eric)
July 13, 2022 Filing 13 SUPPLEMENT/AMENDMENT to Motion for TRO and Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiffs National Association for Gun Rights, Rocky Mountain Gun Owners, Charles Bradley Walker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Arrington, Barry)
July 13, 2022 Filing 12 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to the filing of #11 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order . This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Raymond P. Moore and drawn to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. All future pleadings should be designated as 22-cv-01685-RM. (Text Only Entry) (cmadr, )
July 13, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Plaintiffs National Association for Gun Rights, Rocky Mountain Gun Owners, Charles Bradley Walker. (Attachments: #1 Walker Declaration, #2 Brown Declaration, #3 Curcuruto Declaration, #4 Proposed TRO)(Arrington, Barry)
July 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE AND SETTING DEADLINE FOR FILING OF CONSENT/NON-CONSENT FORM by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 11 July 2022. Consent Form due by 10/6/2022. Proposed Scheduling Order due 10/13/2022. Scheduling Conference set for 10/20/2022 10:30 AM in Courtroom C203 before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. The Scheduling Conference will be conducted via telephone. The parties are directed to call the conference line as a participant at (888) 398-2342, Access Code 5755390# at the scheduled time. (cmadr, )
July 11, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Shaun Pearman on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Shaun Pearman added to party National Association for Gun Rights(pty:pla), Attorney Shaun Pearman added to party Rocky Mountain Gun Owners(pty:pla), Attorney Shaun Pearman added to party Charles Bradley Walker(pty:pla) (Pearman, Shaun)
July 11, 2022 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Joe Pelle served on 7/8/2022, answer due 7/29/2022. (Arrington, Barry)
July 11, 2022 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Town of Superior, The served on 7/8/2022, answer due 7/29/2022. (Arrington, Barry)
July 11, 2022 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE Judge Lewis T. Babcock. This case is randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. All future pleadings should be designated as 22-cv-01685-NRN. (sphil, )
July 8, 2022 Filing 5 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (jtorr, )
July 7, 2022 Filing 4 Case assigned to Judge Lewis T. Babcock and drawn to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Text Only Entry. (jtorr, )
July 7, 2022 Filing 3 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Joe Pelle by Plaintiffs National Association for Gun Rights, Rocky Mountain Gun Owners, Charles Bradley Walker. (Arrington, Barry)
July 7, 2022 Filing 2 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Town of Superior by Plaintiffs National Association for Gun Rights, Rocky Mountain Gun Owners, Charles Bradley Walker. (Arrington, Barry)
July 7, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number ACODC-8541780)Attorney Barry Kevin Arrington added to party National Association for Gun Rights(pty:pla), Attorney Barry Kevin Arrington added to party Rocky Mountain Gun Owners(pty:pla), Attorney Barry Kevin Arrington added to party Charles Bradley Walker(pty:pla), filed by Rocky Mountain Gun Owners, Charles Bradley Walker, National Association for Gun Rights. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Arrington, Barry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rocky Mountain Gun Owners et al v. Town of Superior, The et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rocky Mountain Gun Owners
Represented By: Barry Kevin Arrington
Represented By: Eric Paul Apjoke
Represented By: Shaun Pearman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Association for Gun Rights
Represented By: Barry Kevin Arrington
Represented By: Eric Paul Apjoke
Represented By: Shaun Pearman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Bradley Walker
Represented By: Barry Kevin Arrington
Represented By: Eric Paul Apjoke
Represented By: Shaun Pearman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Town of Superior, The
Represented By: Antonio J. Perez-Marques
Represented By: Carey R. Dunne
Represented By: Christopher Philip Lynch
Represented By: David B. Toscano
Represented By: Gordon Lamar Vaughan
Represented By: William James Taylor, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Pelle
Represented By: Colin James Mayberry
Represented By: David Evan Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?