Rasch v. Fox et al
Plaintiff: Kyle Rasch
Defendant: M.D. Charles J Fox, Yampa Valley Medical Center, M.D. Allen T Belshaw, Charles J. Fox, Yampa Valley Medical Center doing business as UCHealth Yampa Valley Medical Center and Allen T. Benshaw
Case Number: 1:2022cv01748
Filed: July 14, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Scott T Varholak
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Medical Malpractice
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #25 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension. For good cause shown, the Scheduling Conference set for 9/15/2022 09:00 AM is VACATED and RESET for 10/12/2022 at 9:45 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. The Consent Form is now due 9/28/2022 and the Proposed Scheduling Order is now due 10/5/2022. SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 9/7/22. Text Only Entry(stvlc3, Andrew)
September 6, 2022 Filing 25 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Consent/Non Consent to Exercise of Jurisdiction by Magistrate by Plaintiff Kyle Rasch. (Leventhal, James)
September 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #23 Plaintiff's Motion For Extension Of Time To File The Consent/Non-Consent To The Exercise Of Jurisdiction By A United States Magistrate Judge In Direct Assignment Cases. For good cause shown, the parties' deadline to file the Consent/Non-Consent is EXTENDED to September 6, 2022. Additionally, the parties are FURTHER ORDERED to ensure that all Motions fully comply with the D.C.COLO.LCivR 7.1(a)-(c) duty to confer. SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 9/2/22. Text Only Entry(stvlc3, Andrew)
September 1, 2022 Filing 23 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File The Consent Non-Consent to Exercise of Jurisdiction by A United States Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Kyle Rasch. (Leventhal, James)
August 29, 2022 Filing 22 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, and Jury Demand by Allen T. Benshaw.(Faraci, Paul)
August 19, 2022 Filing 21 NOTICE of Third Party Payor - Priority Health by Plaintiff Kyle Rasch (Thompson, Julia)
August 19, 2022 Filing 20 NOTICE of Third Party Payor - Meridian Choice by Plaintiff Kyle Rasch (Thompson, Julia)
August 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #18 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond. Defendant Allen T. Benshaw answer due 8/29/2022. SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 8/17/2022. Text Only Entry(stvlc2, )
August 15, 2022 Filing 18 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint, by Defendant Allen T. Benshaw. (Faraci, Paul)
August 11, 2022 Filing 17 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES:re: #15 Answer to Complaint filed by attorney Amy E. Cook-Olson. DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - counsel must submit a change of contact request through the Manage my Account tab at the PACER website at https://www.pacer.gov/, pursuant to D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(c) and 3.5 of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases).(Text Only Entry) (cmadr, )
August 11, 2022 Filing 16 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES: re: #15 Answer to Complaint filed by attorney Angela Lund Klein & Amy Cook Olson. The s/signature did not match the filers name on the account for which the login and password are registered. DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - future documents must be filed pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 4.3(c) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases).(Text Only Entry) (cmadr, )
August 10, 2022 Filing 15 ANSWER to ComplaintAttorney Angela Lund Klein added to party Yampa Valley Medical Center(pty:dft) by Yampa Valley Medical Center.(Klein, Angela)
August 9, 2022 Filing 14 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES: re: #13 Answer to Complaint filed by attorneys Stephen Jerome Hensen & Nicole Brooke Grimmesey. The s/signature did not match the filers name on the account for which the login and password are registered. DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - future documents must be filed pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 4.3(c) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases).(Text Only Entry) (cmadr, )
August 8, 2022 Filing 13 Defendant Charles Fox ANSWER to #1 Complaint, Attorney Nicole Brooke Grimmesey added to party Charles J. Fox(pty:dft) by Charles J. Fox.(Grimmesey, Nicole)
July 26, 2022 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kyle Rasch. Allen T. Benshaw served on 7/23/2022, answer due 8/13/2022. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Leventhal, James)
July 25, 2022 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kyle Rasch. Yampa Valley Medical Center served on 7/20/2022, answer due 8/10/2022. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Leventhal, James)
July 25, 2022 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kyle Rasch. Charles J. Fox served on 7/21/2022, answer due 8/11/2022. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Leventhal, James)
July 20, 2022 Filing 9 SUMMONSES issued by Clerk. (cmadr, )
July 19, 2022 Filing 8 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Belshaw, Fox, Yampa Valley Medical Center by Plaintiff Kyle Rasch. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(Leventhal, James)
July 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER SETTING DEADLINE FOR FILING ELECTION CONCERNING CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO MAGISTRATE JURISDICTION FORM AND SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 15 July 2022. Consent Form due by 9/1/2022. Proposed Scheduling Order due 9/8/2022. Scheduling Conference set for 9/15/2022 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. (cmadr, )
July 15, 2022 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (athom, )
July 15, 2022 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE by Senior Judge Blackburn. This case is randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. All future pleadings should be designated as 22-cv-01748-STV. (athom, )
July 15, 2022 Filing 4 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). No summons issued. (jtorr, )
July 15, 2022 Filing 3 Case assigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn and drawn to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Text Only Entry. (jtorr, )
July 15, 2022 Filing 2 Administrative Notice: Duplicate filing fee received. Financial notified and a refund is pending. (Text Only Entry) (norlin, )
July 15, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Allen T Belshaw, Charles J Fox, Yampa Valley Medical Center (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number ACODC-8554221)Attorney James M. Leventhal added to party Kyle Rasch(pty:pla), filed by Kyle Rasch. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Leventhal, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rasch v. Fox et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kyle Rasch
Represented By: James M. Leventhal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M.D. Charles J Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yampa Valley Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M.D. Allen T Belshaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles J. Fox
Represented By: Stephen Jerome Hensen
Represented By: Nicole Brooke Grimmesey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yampa Valley Medical Center doing business as UCHealth Yampa Valley Medical Center
Represented By: Amy E. Cook-Olson
Represented By: Angela Lund Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allen T. Benshaw
Represented By: Paul Andrew Faraci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?