Hameed v. Mayorkas et al
Plaintiff: Ahmed Hameed
Defendant: Alejandro Mayorkas, Ur Mendoza Jaddou and Kenneth Madsen
Case Number: 1:2022cv02844
Filed: October 31, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Robert E Blackburn
Referring Judge: S Kato Crews
2 Judge: Daniel D Domenico
Nature of Suit: APA Review/Appeal
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 702 Administrative Procedure Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 27, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of Local Civ. R. 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions, and (5) pursuant to Local Civ. R. 16.6 and at the discretion of the Magistrate Judge, convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 12/27/2022. Text Only Entry. (rkeec)
December 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MINUTE ORDER. In error, this case was assigned to the AP docket of the court. This case does not fall within the scope of cases subject to management as an AP case under D.C.COLO. LAPR 1.1(c). The clerk shall assign this case to judicial officers under D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 12/22/2022. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Daniel D. Domenico and drawn to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. All future pleadings should be designated as 22-cv-02844-DDD. (athom, )
December 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond Ur Mendoza Jaddou answer due 2/20/2023; Kenneth Madsen answer due 2/20/2023; Alejandro Mayorkas answer due 2/20/2023.By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 12/20/2022. Text Only Entry(rebsec)
December 19, 2022 Filing 15 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond by Defendants Ur Mendoza Jaddou, Kenneth Madsen, Alejandro Mayorkas. (Berger, Alexandra)
November 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond. Ur Mendoza Jaddou answer due 12/22/2022; Kenneth Madsen answer due 12/22/2022; Alejandro Mayorkas answer due 12/22/2022. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 11/15/2022. Text Only Entry (rebsec)
November 15, 2022 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond by Defendants Ur Mendoza Jaddou, Kenneth Madsen, Alejandro Mayorkas. (Berger, Alexandra)
November 2, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Alexandra J. Berger on behalf of All Defendants Attorney Alexandra J. Berger added to party Ur Mendoza Jaddou(pty:dft), Attorney Alexandra J. Berger added to party Kenneth Madsen(pty:dft), Attorney Alexandra J. Berger added to party Alejandro Mayorkas(pty:dft) (Berger, Alexandra)
November 2, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by David John Semaan on behalf of Ahmed HameedAttorney David John Semaan added to party Ahmed Hameed(pty:pla) (Semaan, David)
October 31, 2022 Filing 10 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (jcharl, )
October 31, 2022 Filing 9 Case assigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Text Only Entry. (jcharl, )
October 31, 2022 Filing 8 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (jcharl, )
October 31, 2022 Filing 7 Case transferred in from District of District of Columbia; Case Number 1:22-cv-02328. File, transfer order and docket sheet received
October 24, 2022 Set/Reset Deadlines: Transfer due by 10/31/2022. (tb) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/31/2022.]
October 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 defendants' unopposed motion to transfer and unopposed motion for extension of time to answer. See text of Order for details. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 10/21/2022. (lcjdb2) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/31/2022.]
October 21, 2022 Filing 5 Consent MOTION to Transfer Case , Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, or Otherwise Respond by UR MENDOZA JADDOU, KENNETH MADSEN, ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Oblea, Erika) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/31/2022.]
October 21, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Erika Kirstie Oblea on behalf of All Defendants (Oblea, Erika) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/31/2022.]
September 14, 2022 Filing 3 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UR MENDOZA JADDOU served on 8/22/2022; KENNETH MADSEN served on 8/22/2022; ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS served on 8/22/2022; US ATTORNEY GENERAL served on 8/22/2022, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 8/22/2022., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 8/22/2022. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 10/21/2022.) (Semaan, David) Modified on 9/16/2022 to correct docket text(zjm). [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/31/2022.]
August 11, 2022 Filing 2 SUMMONS (5) Issued Electronically as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zmrl) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/31/2022.]
August 9, 2022 Case Assigned to Judge John D. Bates. (zsb) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/31/2022.]
August 5, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS, UR MENDOZA JADDOU, KENNETH MADSEN ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9423326) filed by Ahmed Hameed. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons for US Attorney's Office, #3 Summons Summons for ALEDJANDRO MAYORKAS, #4 Summons Summons for KENNETH MADSEN, #5 Summons Summons for UR MENDOZA JADDOU, #6 Summons Summons for MERRICK GARLAND)(Semaan, David) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/31/2022.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hameed v. Mayorkas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ahmed Hameed
Represented By: David John Semaan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alejandro Mayorkas
Represented By: Alexandra J. Berger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ur Mendoza Jaddou
Represented By: Alexandra J. Berger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Madsen
Represented By: Alexandra J. Berger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?