Rra-Shada v. King Soopers et al
Plaintiff: Richard Rra-Shada
Defendant: King Soopers and James Scott Brinson
Case Number: 1:2022cv02847
Filed: October 31, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: S Kato Crews
Referring Judge: Regina M Rodriguez
Nature of Suit: Other Labor Litigation
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 704 Labor Litigation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 2, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 NOTICE of Change of Address/Contact Information by Plaintiff Richard Rra-Shada (angar, )
November 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MEMORANDUM regarding #25 MOTION to Stay Proceedings filed by Richard Rra-Shada. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews, by Judge Regina M. Rodriguez on 11/30/2022. Text Only Entry (rmrja)
November 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MOTION to Stay Proceedings, by Plaintiff Richard Rra-Shada. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit)(angar, )
November 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 NOTICE of Filing Motion to Stay Proceedings, by Plaintiff Richard Rra-Shada (angar, )
November 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 RESPONSE to #19 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff Richard Rra-Shada. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit)(angar, )
November 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Setting Telephonic Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference. The Telephonic Scheduling Conference is set for 2/8/2023 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. The parties shall file their proposed scheduling order and email a copy in Word document format to Crews_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov, 7 days before the scheduled conference (on or before 2/1/2023).Counsel and Plaintiff are directed to call in for this Telephonic Scheduling Conference using the dial-in information:CONFERENCE CALL LINE: (888) 251-2909ACCESS CODE: 5662814#SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 11/23/2022. Text Only Entry (skclc2).
November 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendants James Scott Brinson, King Soopers All parties do not consent.. (Vickles, Heather)
November 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MEMORANDUM regarding #19 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by King Soopers, James Scott Brinson. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews, by Judge Regina M. Rodriguez on 11/21/2022. Text Only Entry (rmrja)
November 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint by Defendants James Scott Brinson, King Soopers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Stephanie McClanahan)(Vickles, Heather)
November 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 RESPONSE to #14 MOTION to Dismiss CORRECTED filed by Plaintiff Richard Rra-Shada. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit)(angar, )
November 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Richard Rra-Shada - Plaintiff party consents.. (angar, )
November 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendants James Scott Brinson, King Soopers All parties do not consent.. (Vickles, Heather)
November 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MEMORANDUM regarding #14 MOTION to Dismiss CORRECTED filed by King Soopers, James Scott Brinson, #13 MOTION to Dismiss filed by King Soopers, James Scott Brinson. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews, by Judge Regina M. Rodriguez on 11/8/2022. Text Only Entry (rmrja)
November 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss CORRECTED by Defendants James Scott Brinson, King Soopers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Stephanie McClanahan)(Vickles, Heather)
November 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 DISREGARD - REFILED AT #14 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendants James Scott Brinson, King Soopers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Stephanie McClanahan)(Vickles, Heather) Modified on 11/15/2022 to term motion and show as refiled at #14 (angar, ).
November 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Richard Rra-Shada - Plaintiff party consents. (angar, )
November 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 First Amended Complaint, against James Scott Brinson, King Soopers, filed by Richard Rra-Shada.(angar, )
November 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Plaintiff's Notice of Filing of Notice to Amend Complaint, by Plaintiff Richard Rra-Shada (angar, )
November 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of Mailing/Service by Defendants James Scott Brinson, King Soopers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Vickles, Heather)
November 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of Local Civ. R. 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions, and (5) pursuant to Local Civ. R. 16.6 and at the discretion of the Magistrate Judge, convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. SO ORDERED by Judge Regina M. Rodriguez on 11/1/2022. Text Only Entry (rmrja)
November 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE by Senior Judge Blackburn. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Regina M. Rodriguez and drawn to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. All future pleadings should be designated as 22-cv-02847-RMR. (athom, )
October 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (tgall, )
October 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Notice, Claim, and Summons To Appear For Trail against James Scott Brinson, King Soopers, filed by Richard Rra-Shada.(tgall, )
October 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Case assigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn and drawn to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Text Only Entry. (tgall, )
October 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry). (tgall, )
October 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent DILLON COMPANIES, INC., d/b/a KING SOOPERS, INC. for James Scott Brinson, King Soopers. (Vickles, Heather)
October 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by King Soopers, James Scott Brinson from Small Claims Court, Case Number 2022S00653. (Filing fee $ 402, Receipt Number ACODC-8750570), filed by King Soopers, James Scott Brinson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Vickles, Heather)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rra-Shada v. King Soopers et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Rra-Shada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: King Soopers
Represented By: Heather Fox Vickles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Scott Brinson
Represented By: Heather Fox Vickles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?