Post v. Vensure Employer Services, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Charles W. Post
Defendant: Vensure Employer Services, Inc., Alliance Group, Inc., The and Michael S. Mapes
Case Number: 1:2022cv02887
Filed: November 4, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Kristen L Mix
Nature of Suit: Other Labor Litigation
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question: Labor
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 13, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on December 27, 2022. This matter is before the Court on the parties' Joint Motion to Reschedule InitialPretrial Conference #13 (the "Motion"). IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Motion #13 is GRANTED. The Scheduling Conference set for February 2, 2023, at 11:00 a.m. is VACATED and RESET to March 14, 2023, at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom A-401 of the Alfred A. Arraj United States Courthouse, 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, no later than March 7, 2023, the parties shall submit their proposed scheduling order, pursuant to District of Colorado Electronic Case Filing ("ECF") Procedures.(csarr, )
December 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on December 27, 2022. This matter is before the Court on Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of time for Defendants to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Amended Complaint #11 (the "Motion"). IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Motion #11 is GRANTED. The deadline for Defendants to answer or otherwise respond to the operative complaint is extended to January 17, 2023.(csarr, )
December 22, 2022 Filing 13 Joint MOTION to Reset Initial Pretrial Conference by Defendants Alliance Group, Inc., The, Michael S. Mapes, Vensure Employer Services, Inc.. (Gibson, Mark)
December 22, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Steven M. Gutierrez on behalf of Alliance Group, Inc., The, Michael S. Mapes, Vensure Employer Services, Inc.Attorney Steven M. Gutierrez added to party Alliance Group, Inc., The(pty:dft), Attorney Steven M. Gutierrez added to party Michael S. Mapes(pty:dft), Attorney Steven M. Gutierrez added to party Vensure Employer Services, Inc.(pty:dft) (Gutierrez, Steven)
December 22, 2022 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Amended Complaint by Defendants Alliance Group, Inc., The, Michael S. Mapes, Vensure Employer Services, Inc.. (Gibson, Mark)
December 22, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Mark Douglas Gibson on behalf of Alliance Group, Inc., The, Michael S. Mapes, Vensure Employer Services, Inc.Attorney Mark Douglas Gibson added to party Alliance Group, Inc., The(pty:dft), Attorney Mark Douglas Gibson added to party Michael S. Mapes(pty:dft), Attorney Mark Douglas Gibson added to party Vensure Employer Services, Inc.(pty:dft) (Gibson, Mark)
December 13, 2022 Filing 9 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to the Complaint by Defendants Alliance Group, Inc., The, Michael S. Mapes, Vensure Employer Services, Inc.. Alliance Group, Inc., The answer due 1/3/2023; Michael S. Mapes answer due 1/3/2023; Vensure Employer Services, Inc. answer due 1/3/2023. (Harrison, Adam)
November 30, 2022 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Charles W. Post. Alliance Group, Inc., The served on 11/28/2022, answer due 12/19/2022; Michael S. Mapes served on 11/28/2022, answer due 12/19/2022; Vensure Employer Services, Inc. served on 11/21/2022, answer due 12/12/2022. (Attachments: #1 Continuation of Main Document, #2 Continuation of Main Document)(Harrison, Adam)
November 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 11/17/2022. Proposed Scheduling Order due 1/26/2023. Scheduling/Planning Conference set for 2/2/2023 11:00 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. (Attachments: #1 Continuation of Main Document, #2 Continuation of Main Document) (alave, )
November 14, 2022 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Alliance Group, Inc., The, Michael S. Mapes, Vensure Employer Services, Inc., filed by Charles W. Post. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Employment Agreement, #2 Exhibit 2 Non-Solicitation Agreement)(Harrison, Adam)
November 9, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Claire E. Hunter by Claire E. Hunter on behalf of Charles W. PostAttorney Claire E. Hunter added to party Charles W. Post(pty:pla) (Hunter, Claire)
November 8, 2022 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (norlin, )
November 4, 2022 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (jcharl, )
November 4, 2022 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Text Only Entry. (jcharl, )
November 4, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND against Michael S. Mapes, The Alliance Group, Inc., Vensure Employer Services, Inc. (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number ACODC-8762718)Attorney Adam Murdoch-Kitt Harrison added to party Charles W. Post(pty:pla), filed by Charles W. Post. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Employment Agreement, #2 Exhibit 2 - Non-Solicitation Agreement, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons Vensure Employer Services, Inc., #5 Summons The Alliance Group, Inc., #6 Summons on Michael S. Mapes)(Harrison, Adam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Post v. Vensure Employer Services, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles W. Post
Represented By: Adam Murdoch-Kitt Harrison
Represented By: Claire E. Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vensure Employer Services, Inc.
Represented By: Steven M. Gutierrez
Represented By: Mark Douglas Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alliance Group, Inc., The
Represented By: Mark Douglas Gibson
Represented By: Steven M. Gutierrez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael S. Mapes
Represented By: Mark Douglas Gibson
Represented By: Steven M. Gutierrez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?