Wright v. Hobby Lobby Stores, Inc.
Plaintiff: Abby Wright
Defendant: Hobby Lobby Stores, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2022cv03065
Filed: November 28, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: N Reid Neureiter
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 2, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Edith M. Jordan on behalf of Abby WrightAttorney Edith M. Jordan added to party Abby Wright(pty:pla) (Jordan, Edith)
November 29, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Sam C. Cannon on behalf of Abby WrightAttorney Sam C. Cannon added to party Abby Wright(pty:pla) (Cannon, Sam)
November 29, 2022 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of Service by mail by Clerk of Court re #7 Order, to Sam Cannon, 320 Maple Street, #115, Fort Collins, CO 80521. Text Only Entry (cmadr, )
November 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE AND SETTING DEADLINE FOR FILING OF CONSENT/NON-CONSENT FORM by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 29 November 2022. Consent Form due by 2/15/2023. Proposed Scheduling Order due 2/22/2023. Scheduling Conference set for 3/1/2023 10:30 AM in Courtroom C203 before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. (cmadr, )
November 28, 2022 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (norlin, )
November 28, 2022 Filing 5 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Text Only Entry (norlin, )
November 28, 2022 Filing 4 Defendant Hobby Lobby Stores, Inc.'s ANSWER to #3 Complaint, Defenses and Jury Demand by Hobby Lobby Stores, Inc..(norlin, )
November 28, 2022 Filing 3 COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Hobby Lobby Stores, Inc., filed by Abby Wright.(norlin, )
November 28, 2022 Filing 2 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (norlin, )
November 28, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Hobby Lobby Stores, Inc. from Denver County District Court, Case Number 2022CV32987. (Filing fee $ 402, Receipt Number BCODC-8797578), filed by Hobby Lobby Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Bryan, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wright v. Hobby Lobby Stores, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abby Wright
Represented By: Edith M. Jordan
Represented By: Sam C. Cannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hobby Lobby Stores, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher Daniel Bryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?