Wolford v. Boulder County et al
Plaintiff: Joshua Lee Wolford
Defendant: Joe Pelle, Boulder County, State of Colorado and Davis
Case Number: 1:2022cv03107
Filed: November 30, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 13, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MINUTE ORDER. Plaintiff shall have until February 3, 2023, to submit a certified copy of his inmate account statement for the six months immediately preceding the filing of this action. Alternatively, Plaintiff may pay the $402.00 filing fee in full. Failure to cure this remaining deficiency in the time allowed will result in dismissal of this action without prejudice and without further notice. Further, Plaintiff's #11 Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed on Appeal Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915 and Fed. R. App. P. 24 is denied without prejudice because this action is not an appeal, so the motion uses the wrong form. And Plaintiff's #21 Motion to Pro Se/Change Counsel and #22 Motion to Reduce Bonds/Medical Mental Firlow are denied without prejudice as premature. By Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 1/13/2023.(jtorr, )
January 11, 2023 Filing 22 MOTION to Reduce Bonds/Medical, Mental Firlow (sic), filed by Plaintiff Joshua Lee Wolford. (jtorr, )
January 11, 2023 Filing 21 MOTION to Pro Se/Change Counsel (sic), filed by Plaintiff Joshua Lee Wolford. (jtorr, )
January 9, 2023 Filing 20 LETTER by Plaintiff Joshua Lee Wolford. (sdunb, )
January 6, 2023 Filing 19 NOTICE by Plaintiff Joshua Lee Wolford. (jtorr, )
January 6, 2023 Filing 18 NOTICE by Plaintiff Joshua Lee Wolford. (jtorr, )
January 6, 2023 Filing 17 NOTICE by Plaintiff Joshua Lee Wolford. (jtorr, )
January 6, 2023 Filing 16 NOTICE by Plaintiff Joshua Lee Wolford. (jtorr, )
January 6, 2023 Filing 15 NOTICE by Plaintiff Joshua Lee Wolford. (jtorr, )
January 5, 2023 Filing 14 LETTER by Plaintiff Joshua Lee Wolford. (jtorr, )
January 3, 2023 Filing 13 LETTER re: Defendants Information, filed by Plaintiff Joshua Lee Wolford (jtorr, )
January 3, 2023 Filing 12 Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915 by Plaintiff Joshua Lee Wolford. (jtorr, )
January 3, 2023 Filing 11 Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed on Appeal Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915 and Fed. R. App. P. 24 by Plaintiff Joshua Lee Wolford. (jtorr, )
January 3, 2023 Filing 10 AMENDED PRISONER COMPLAINT against Boulder County, Davis, State of Colorado, filed by Joshua Lee Wolford.(jtorr, )
December 29, 2022 Filing 9 LETTER by Plaintiff Joshua Lee Wolford. (jtorr, )
December 19, 2022 Filing 8 LETTER by Plaintiff Joshua Lee Wolford. (jtorr, )
December 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER denying #5 Motion to Proceed Prosecution and #6 Motion to Protection Order BCSO Jail. Plaintiff has until January 17, 2023, to cure the deficiencies. Plaintiff is reminded that this action will be dismissed without further notice if he fails to cure the deficiencies within the time allowed. By Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 12/15/2022. (Forms mailed as ordered.)(jtorr, )
December 12, 2022 Filing 6 MOTION to Protection Order BCSO Jail, filed by Plaintiff Joshua Lee Wolford. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jtorr, )
December 12, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION to Proceed Prosecution by Plaintiff Joshua Lee Wolford. (jtorr, )
December 5, 2022 Filing 4 LETTER by Plaintiff Joshua Lee Wolford. (jtorr, )
December 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO CURE DEFICIENCIES. If Plaintiff fails to cure all designated deficiencies within thirty (30) days from the date of this order, the action will be dismissed without further notice. The dismissal shall be without prejudice. It is FURTHER ORDERED that #1 Plaintiff's Motion to Place Protection Order is denied without prejudice as premature because Plaintiff has not filed a pleading on a court-approved form or paid the applicable filing fee. By Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 12/5/2022.(jtorr, )
November 30, 2022 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry. (jcharl, )
November 30, 2022 Filing 1 MOTION to Place Protection Order by Plaintiff Joshua Lee Wolford. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jcharl, ) ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wolford v. Boulder County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Lee Wolford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Pelle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boulder County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Colorado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?