Cross Creek Ranch LLC et al v. Crotts
Plaintiff: Cross Creek Ranch LLC, Pinnacle Services Inc and Health E Solutions, Inc.
Defendant: Ryan Crotts
Case Number: 1:2023cv00050
Filed: January 6, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: S Kato Crews
Referring Judge: Raymond P Moore
Nature of Suit: Other Labor Litigation
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 lr Diversity - Labor
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 18, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant's Counterclaim by Plaintiffs Health E Solutions, Inc., Cross Creek Ranch LLC, Pinnacle Services Inc. (Starritt, Sam)
March 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiffs Health E Solutions, Inc., Cross Creek Ranch LLC, Pinnacle Services Inc All parties do not consent.. (Starritt, Sam)
March 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiffs Health E Solutions, Inc., Cross Creek Ranch LLC, Pinnacle Services Inc. (Starritt, Sam)
February 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 BRIEF in Opposition to #14 MOTION to Stay Arbitration filed by Defendant Ryan Crotts, Counter Claimant Ryan Crotts. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A_Conferral Email, #2 Exhibit B_Affidavit of Ryan Crotts, #3 Exhibit C_Michael Foutz email, #4 Exhibit D_Ltr from Joseph Wojcik, Esq., #5 Exhibit E_Ltr from Robert Davis, Esq., #6 Exhibit F_Termination Agreement)(Baird, John)
February 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Defendant Ryan Crotts ANSWER to #13 Amended Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM and Jury Demand against Health E Solutions, Inc., Cross Creek Ranch LLC, Pinnacle Services Inc by Ryan Crotts. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Labor Service Agreement)(Baird, John)
February 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MOTION to Stay Arbitration by Plaintiffs Health E Solutions, Inc., Cross Creek Ranch LLC, Pinnacle Services Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 Arbitration Demand and Ex A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 Labor Services Agreement, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 Foutz Affidavit)(Starritt, Sam)
January 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Ryan Crotts, filed by Cross Creek Ranch LLC, Pinnacle Services Inc.(Starritt, Sam)
January 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER Setting Telephone Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference. Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 3/9/2023 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews.The parties shall file their proposed scheduling order and email a copy in Word format to Crews_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov, no later than seven calendar days before the conference. At the scheduled time, counsel shall call the Court provided conference line at (888) 251-2909 Access Code: 5662814#. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 1/23/2023. Text Only Entry (amont, )
January 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Sam D. Starritt on behalf of Cross Creek Ranch LLC, Pinnacle Services IncAttorney Sam D. Starritt added to party Cross Creek Ranch LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Sam D. Starritt added to party Pinnacle Services Inc(pty:pla) (Starritt, Sam)
January 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER: With the assignment of this matter, the parties are advised that throughout this case they are expected to be familiar and comply with not only the Local Rules of this District, but also Judge Raymond P. Moore's Civil Practice Standards, which may be found at: http://www.cod.uscourts.gov/JudicialOfficers/ActiveArticleIIIJudges/HonRaymondPMoore.aspx. SO ORDERED by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 1/10/2023. Text Only Entry (rmsec)
January 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order, and (5) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. By Judge Raymond P. Moore on 1/10/2023. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec)
January 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Beth Ann Doherty Quinn on behalf of Ryan CrottsAttorney Beth Ann Doherty Quinn added to party Ryan Crotts(pty:dft) (Quinn, Beth)
January 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (tgall, )
January 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service of District Court Civil Summons, Complaint and Jury Demand, and District Court Civil (CV) Case Cover Sheet for Initial Pleading of Complaint, Declaration of Tory Pomi (Exhibit) upon Ryan Crotts on 12/26/2022. (tgall, )
January 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND against Ryan Crotts, filed by Cross Creek Ranch LLC, Pinnacle Services Inc.(tgall, )
January 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Case assigned to Judge Raymond P. Moore and drawn to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Text Only Entry. (tgall, )
January 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry). (tgall, )
January 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by John Mark Baird on behalf of Ryan Crotts (Baird, John)
January 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Ryan Crotts from La Plata County District Court, Case Number 2022CV230147. (Filing fee $ 402, Receipt Number ACODC-8871348), filed by Ryan Crotts. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Complaint and Jury Demand, #2 Exhibit B: District Court Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit C: District Court Summons, #4 Exhibit D: District Court Affidavit of Service, #5 Exhibit E: LaPlata District Court Register of Action, #6 Exhibit F: Notice of Removal, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Baird, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cross Creek Ranch LLC et al v. Crotts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cross Creek Ranch LLC
Represented By: Sam D. Starritt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pinnacle Services Inc
Represented By: Sam D. Starritt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Health E Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Sam D. Starritt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Crotts
Represented By: Beth Ann Doherty Quinn
Represented By: John Mark Baird
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?