Sheldon v. Williams et al
Petitioner: Gary Sheldon
Respondent: Dr. Williams and Herbst
Case Number: 1:2023cv00273
Filed: January 30, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Referring Judge: Kristen L Mix
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241 fd - Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Federal)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 7, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 28, 2023 Filing 6 REASSIGNING MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Due to the recent appointment of Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher as a United States District Judge, and with the permission of Chief Judge Brimmer pursuant to D.C. Colo. L. Civ. R. 40.1(a), this action is reassigned to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. All future pleadings should be designated as 23-cv-00273-KLM. (Text only entry) (nmilt)
February 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER. Mr. Sheldon shall cure the filing deficiencies, as directed in the February 1, 2023 Order, within 30 days from the date of this minute order. Failure to comply will result in dismissal of this action without further notice, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 2/22/2023. forms mailed as ordered (angar, )
February 15, 2023 Filing 4 RESPONSE to #3 Order to Cure Deficiencies by Petitioner Gary Sheldon. (trvo, )
February 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Directing Mr. Sheldon to Cure Deficiencies. If Mr. Sheldon fails to cure the designated deficiencies within thirty (30) days from the date of this order, the action will be dismissed without prejudice and without further notice, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 2/1/2023. (angar, )
January 30, 2023 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry (norlin, )
January 30, 2023 Filing 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Pursuant to 28 USC 2241, filed by Gary Sheldon.(norlin, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sheldon v. Williams et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Gary Sheldon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Dr. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Herbst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?