Ana v. Boselli Investments LLC
Plaintiff: Rodriguez Ana and Ana Rodriguez
Defendant: Boselli Investments LLC and Don Anthony Boselli
Case Number: 1:2023cv00314
Filed: February 2, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Kristen L Mix
Referring Judge: Regina M Rodriguez
Nature of Suit: Other Labor Litigation
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1453 - Class Action Fairness Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 31, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 31 March 2023. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Joint Motion to Vacate and Reset Scheduling Conference #17 is GRANTED. The Scheduling Conference set for April 6, 2023, at 11:00 a.m. is VACATED and RESET to May 15, 2023, at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom A-401 of the Alfred A. Arraj United States Courthouse, 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, no later than May 8, 2023, the parties shallsubmit their proposed scheduling order.(cmadr, )
March 29, 2023 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM regarding #17 Joint MOTION to Vacate Scheduling ConferenceJoint MOTION to Reset Scheduling Conference filed by Ana Rodriguez. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix, by Judge Regina M. Rodriguez on 3/29/2023. Text Only Entry (rmrja)
March 28, 2023 Filing 17 Joint MOTION to Vacate Scheduling Conference, Joint MOTION to Reset Scheduling Conference by Plaintiff Ana Rodriguez. (Gonzales, Brian)
March 27, 2023 Filing 16 RESPONSE to 15 MOTION to Remand filed by Defendant Boselli Investments LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Micah Dawson, #2 Exhibit A-1 - Mediation Confidentiality Agreement, #3 Exhibit A-2 - Jan 17 2022 email from Alex Hood, #4 Exhibit B - Order re Motion for Summary Judgment)(McClelland, Jeffrey)
March 6, 2023 Filing 15 MOTION to Remand, by Plaintiff Ana Rodriguez. (Public Entry to #14 Restricted Level 1) Text Only Entry. (angar, )
March 6, 2023 Filing 14 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 1: by Plaintiff Ana Rodriguez.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: Declaration of Alexander Hood)(Gonzales, Brian)
March 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PRE-SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 03/06/2023. (alave, )
February 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 02/24/2023. Proposed Scheduling Order due 3/30/2023. Scheduling/Planning Conference set for 4/6/2023 11:00 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. (Attachments: #1 Continuation of Main Document, #2 Continuation of Main Document, #3 Continuation of Main Document) (alave, )
February 16, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE of Compliance with D.C. Colo.L.CivR 81.1 by Defendant Boselli Investments LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15)(McClelland, Jeffrey)
February 6, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jeffrey H. McClelland on behalf of Boselli Investments LLCAttorney Jeffrey H. McClelland added to party Boselli Investments LLC(pty:dft) (McClelland, Jeffrey)
February 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of Local Civ. R. 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions, and (5) pursuant to Local Civ. R. 16.6 and at the discretion of the Magistrate Judge, convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. SO ORDERED by Judge Regina M. Rodriguez on 2/6/2023. Text Only Entry (rmrja)
February 3, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Brian David Gonzales on behalf of Ana RodriguezAttorney Brian David Gonzales added to party Ana Rodriguez(pty:pla) (Gonzales, Brian)
February 3, 2023 Filing 7 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (norlin, )
February 3, 2023 Filing 6 Case assigned to Judge Regina M. Rodriguez and drawn to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Text Only Entry (norlin, )
February 3, 2023 Filing 5 STATE COURT ORDER. Plaintiffs Motion for Class Certification is GRANTED; The Court certifies the following class: All current and former hourly employees who worked for Defendant from October 25, 2014 to present.; The Court hereby appoints Plaintiff Ana Rodriguez as class representative for this class. So ORDERED by an Adams County District Court Judge on 11/16/2022. (norlin, )
February 3, 2023 Filing 4 ANSWER to #3 Complaint by Don Anthony Boselli, Boselli Investments LLC.(norlin, )
February 3, 2023 Filing 3 Class Action COMPLAINT against Don Anthony Boselli, Boselli Investments LLC, filed by Ana Rodriguez.(norlin, )
February 3, 2023 Filing 2 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (norlin, )
February 2, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Boselli Investments LLC from Adams County District Court, Case Number 2020CV031368. (Filing fee $ 402, Receipt Number BCODC-8918278), filed by Boselli Investments LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Return of Service, #3 Exhibit C - Answer, #4 Exhibit D- Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures, #5 Exhibit E - Plaintiff's Discovery Responses, #6 Exhibit F - Pages from A Rodriguez PDFTran, #7 Exhibit G - Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification, #8 Exhibit H - Order Grating Plaintiff's Motion For Class Cert, #9 Exhibit I - Demand, #10 Exhibit J - Declaration of George Scott, #11 Exhibit K - FL Voter Record - Stewart, #12 Exhibit L - GA Voter Record - Stearns, #13 Exhibit M - SOS Boselli Investments LLC, #14 Exhibit N-1 - State Court Record Part1, #15 Exhibit N-2 - State Court Record Part2, #16 Exhibit N-3 - State Court Record Part3, #17 Exhibit N-4 - State Court Record Part 4, #18 Exhibit N-5 - State Court Record Part5, #19 Exhibit N-6 - State Court Record Part6, #20 Exhibit N-7 - State Court Record Part7, #21 Exhibit N-8 - State Court Record Part8, #22 Exhibit N-9 - State Court Record Part9, #23 Exhibit N-10 - State Court Record Part10, #24 Exhibit N-11 - State Court Record Part11, #25 Exhibit 0 - Register of Actions)(Dawson, Micah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ana v. Boselli Investments LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodriguez Ana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ana Rodriguez
Represented By: Brian David Gonzales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boselli Investments LLC
Represented By: Micah David Dawson
Represented By: Jeffrey H. McClelland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Don Anthony Boselli
Represented By: Micah David Dawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?