Brodie et al v. Runyon
Plaintiff: Lillian Brodie, Laura Brodie, Robert Brodie and Lillian S. Brodie
Defendant: William Runyon
Case Number: 1:2023cv00406
Filed: February 10, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Kristen L Mix
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Auto Negligence
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 6, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 4/5/23. (lgale, )
April 5, 2023 Filing 21 MINUTE ENTRY for Scheduling Conference held before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 4/5/2023. Discovery due by 10/1/2023. Dispositive Motions due by 11/1/2023. FTR: KLM Courtroom A401. (Attachments: #1 Discovery Procedures and Requirements of Practice) (lgale, )
April 4, 2023 Filing 20 Proposed MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify Complaint by Plaintiffs Laura Brodie, Lillian S. Brodie, Robert Brodie. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Huckstep, Aaron)
March 29, 2023 Filing 19 Proposed Scheduling Order by Defendant William Runyon. (Hertzke, Billy-George)
March 8, 2023 Filing 18 KLM CIVIL MOTIONS PRACTICE STANDARDS by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 03/08/2023. (alave, )
March 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER OF REFERENCE. Pursuant to the consent of the parties to the jurisdiction of the magistrate judge #15 , this case is referred to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix for all purposes pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 3/07/2023. Text Only Entry (pabsec, )
March 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 PRE-SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 03/06/2023. (alave, )
March 2, 2023 Filing 15 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant William Runyon All parties consent.. (Logan, William)
February 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Hearing/Conference; granting #13 Motion for Order. Counsel for Plaintiffs shall call the Court at 888-363-4749, Access Code: 2115325#, from a land line, if possible, at the time of the Scheduling Conference. by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 2/28/2023. Text Only Entry(klmlc2, )
February 28, 2023 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION for Hearing/Conference , Unopposed MOTION for Order to by Plaintiffs Laura Brodie, Lillian S. Brodie, Robert Brodie. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Huckstep, Aaron)
February 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE Proposed Scheduling Order due 3/29/2023. Scheduling/Planning Conference set for 4/5/2023 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 02/24/2023. (Attachments: #1 Continuation of Main Document, #2 Continuation of Main Document) (alave, )
February 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER. Pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(c)(4), the deadline to file the Consent/Non-Consent to United States Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form [#7] is March 22, 2023. by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 2/24/2023. Text Only Entry (klmlc2, )
February 16, 2023 Filing 10 ANSWER to #5 Complaint by William Runyon.(Logan, William)
February 14, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Aaron J. Huckstep on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Aaron J. Huckstep added to party Laura Brodie(pty:pla), Attorney Aaron J. Huckstep added to party Lillian S. Brodie(pty:pla), Attorney Aaron J. Huckstep added to party Robert Brodie(pty:pla) (Huckstep, Aaron)
February 13, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by William Francis Logan on behalf of William Runyon (Logan, William)
February 13, 2023 Filing 7 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (tgall, ) Modified to corrected docketed date ((tgall, ).
February 13, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE of Waiver and Acceptance of Service of Summons, Complaint, and Civil Case Cover Sheet by Attorney for Defendant William Runyon, on 01/20/2023. (tgall, ) Modified to corrected docketed date ((tgall, ) .
February 13, 2023 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against William Runyon, filed by Lillian S. Brodie, Robert Brodie, Laura Brodie.(tgall, ) Modified to corrected docketed date (tgall, ) .
February 13, 2023 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Text Only Entry. (tgall, ) Modified to corrected docketed date ((tgall, ) .
February 13, 2023 Filing 3 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry). (tgall, ) Modified to corrected docketed date ((tgall, ) .
February 10, 2023 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF NOTICE OF FILING OF NOTICE OF REMOVAL WAS FILED WITH STATE COURT re: #1 Notice of Removal,, by Defendant William Runyon. (Hertzke, Billy-George)
February 10, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by William Runyon from Gunnison, Case Number 23cv30004. (Filing fee $ 402, Receipt Number ACODC-8934556), filed by William Runyon. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - State Court Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit C - State Court Summons, #4 Exhibit D - State Court Waiver, #5 Exhibit E - Property Records Search, #6 Exhibit F - Voter Information, #7 Exhibit G - Declaration of William Runyon, #8 Civil Cover Sheet, #9 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #10 State Court Pleadings Index)(Hertzke, Billy-George)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brodie et al v. Runyon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lillian Brodie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Brodie
Represented By: Aaron J. Huckstep
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Brodie
Represented By: Aaron J. Huckstep
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lillian S. Brodie
Represented By: Aaron J. Huckstep
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Runyon
Represented By: Billy-George Hertzke
Represented By: William Francis Logan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?