Muller v. Perez et al
Plaintiff: Sandra Muller
Defendant: Eduardo Perez, The Waggoners Trucking and Waggoners Trucking, The
Case Number: 1:2023cv00513
Filed: February 24, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: S Kato Crews
Referring Judge: Charlotte N Sweeney
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Auto Negligence
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 14, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 14, 2023 Filing 17 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Sandra Muller All parties do not consent.. (Phillips, Andrew)
March 10, 2023 Filing 16 NOTICE re #1 Notice of Removal,, Register of Actions (Denver County District Court) by Defendants Eduardo Perez, Waggoners Trucking, The (Nikolaevskaya, Yulia)
March 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Setting Telephonic Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference. The Telephonic Scheduling Conference is set for 5/4/2023 at 10:30 a.m. in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. The parties shall file their proposed scheduling order AND email a copy in Word document format to Crews_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov, 7 days before the scheduled conference (on or before 4/27/2023). The Magistrate Judge #13 Consent Form is also due by 4/27/2023.Counsel are directed to call in for this Telephonic Scheduling Conference using the dial-in information:CONFERENCE CALL LINE: (888) 251-2909ACCESS CODE: 5662814#SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 3/8/2023. Text Only Entry (skclc2).
March 3, 2023 Filing 14 ANSWER to #9 Complaint by Eduardo Perez, Waggoners Trucking, The.(Abramson, Jonathan)
February 27, 2023 Filing 13 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (jcharl, )
February 27, 2023 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT/RETURN of Service of Summons, District Court civil case cover sheet for initial pleading of complaint, counterclaim, cross-claim or third party complaint, Complaint and Jury demand, Delay reduction Order. upon Eduardo Perez on 01/27/2023. (jcharl, )
February 27, 2023 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT/RETURN of Service of District Court civil case cover sheet for initial pleading of complaint, Summons, Complaint and jury demand, and Delay reduction order upon Wagners Trucking on 01/25/2023. (jcharl, )
February 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews for non-dispositive matters. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of Local Civ. R. 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) pursuant to Local Civ. R. 16.6 and at the discretion of the Magistrate Judge, convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. by Judge Charlotte N. Sweeney on 2/27/23. Text Only Entry (jdyne)
February 27, 2023 Filing 9 COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Eduardo Perez, The Waggoners Trucking, filed by Sandra Muller.(jcharl, )
February 27, 2023 Filing 8 Case assigned to Judge Charlotte N. Sweeney and drawn to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Text Only Entry. (jcharl, )
February 27, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Andrew J. Phillips on behalf of Sandra MullerAttorney Andrew J. Phillips added to party Sandra Muller(pty:pla) (Phillips, Andrew)
February 27, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jordan Scott Levine on behalf of Sandra MullerAttorney Jordan Scott Levine added to party Sandra Muller(pty:pla) (Levine, Jordan)
February 27, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Elizabeth R. Fisher on behalf of Sandra MullerAttorney Elizabeth R. Fisher added to party Sandra Muller(pty:pla) (Fisher, Elizabeth)
February 27, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Sarah G. Freedman on behalf of Sandra MullerAttorney Sarah G. Freedman added to party Sandra Muller(pty:pla) (Freedman, Sarah)
February 24, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Bobby Glendon Riley, Jr on behalf of Eduardo Perez, The Waggoners TruckingAttorney Bobby Glendon Riley, Jr added to party Eduardo Perez(pty:dft), Attorney Bobby Glendon Riley, Jr added to party The Waggoners Trucking(pty:dft) (Riley, Bobby)
February 24, 2023 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Abramson, Jonathan)
February 24, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by The Waggoners Trucking, Eduardo Perez from District Court for the City and County of Denver, Case Number 2023CV30144. (Filing fee $ 402, Receipt Number ACODC-8958779), filed by The Waggoners Trucking, Eduardo Perez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2-Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit 3-Summonses, #4 Exhibit 4-ROS (Waggoners), #5 Exhibit 5-ROS (Perez), #6 Exhibit 6-Accurint Report (Perez), #7 Exhibit 7-Cert. Good Standing (Waggoners), #8 Exhibit 8-FMCSA Snapshot, #9 Civil Cover Sheet)(Abramson, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Muller v. Perez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Muller
Represented By: Andrew J. Phillips
Represented By: Elizabeth R. Fisher
Represented By: Jordan Scott Levine
Represented By: Sarah G. Freedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eduardo Perez
Represented By: Bobby Glendon Riley, Jr.
Represented By: Jonathan Marshall Abramson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Waggoners Trucking
Represented By: Bobby Glendon Riley, Jr.
Represented By: Jonathan Marshall Abramson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Waggoners Trucking, The
Represented By: Bobby Glendon Riley, Jr.
Represented By: Jonathan Marshall Abramson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?