Schubert v. Kaiser Foundation Hospitals
Plaintiff: Robert Schubert
Defendant: Kaiser Foundation Hospitals
Case Number: 1:2023cv00564
Filed: March 1, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Kristen L Mix
Referring Judge: Regina M Rodriguez
2 Judge: Kathryn A Starnella
Nature of Suit: Other Labor Litigation
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 704 Labor Litigation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 8, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 26 REASSIGNING MAGISTRATE JUDGE. This action is reassigned to Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella upon her appointment. All future pleadings should reference Magistrate Judge Starnella at the end of the civil action number (such as 23-cv-00564-RMR-KAS). Unless otherwise ordered, the dates and times for all previously scheduled matters will be maintained and will now be handled by Magistrate Judge Starnella in Courtroom C-204. Her chambers are located in Room C-253 of the Byron G. Rogers Courthouse. Her telephone number is 303-335-2770. (Text only entry) (trvo, )
July 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 STIPULATED ORDER REGARDING THE DISCLOSURE OF PRIVILEGED INFORMATION by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 07/14/2023. (alave, )
July 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 07/14/2023. (alave, )
July 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 07/14/2023. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Stipulated Motion for Protective Order #20 is GRANTED. The Protective Order [20-1] supplied by the parties is accepted for filing and entered as an Order of theCourt as of the date of this Minute Order.(alave, )
July 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER REFERRING MOTION: #20 Stipulated MOTION for Protective Order filed by Kaiser Foundation Hospitals. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix by Judge Regina M. Rodriguez on 7/12/2023. Text Only Entry (rmrja)
July 12, 2023 Filing 21 STIPULATION of Order Regarding the Disclosure of Privileged Information by Defendant Kaiser Foundation Hospitals. (Law, David)
July 12, 2023 Filing 20 Stipulated MOTION for Protective Order by Defendant Kaiser Foundation Hospitals. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Stipulated Protective Order)(Law, David)
June 30, 2023 Filing 19 SUPPLEMENT/AMENDMENT to #14 Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Robert Schubert. (Singer, Elliot)
June 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 6/30/23. (lgale, )
June 30, 2023 Filing 17 MINUTE ENTRY for Scheduling Conference held before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 6/30/2023. Discovery due by 3/15/2024. FTR: KLM Courtroom A401. (Attachments: #1 Discovery Procedures and Requirements of Practice) (lgale, )
June 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 6/14/23. Due to a conflict in the Court's schedule, the Scheduling Conference set for 6/15/2023 is CONTINUED to 6/30/2023 10:00 AM in Courtroom A401 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Text Only Entry (lgale, )
June 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 PRE-SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on June 7, 2023. (csarr, )
June 7, 2023 Filing 14 Proposed Scheduling Order by Defendant Kaiser Foundation Hospitals. (Law, David)
May 15, 2023 Filing 13 Kaiser Foundation Hospital's ANSWER to #1 Complaint, and Jury Demand by Kaiser Foundation Hospitals.(Rogers, Laurene)
April 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of Local Civ. R. 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions, and (5) pursuant to Local Civ. R. 16.6 and at the discretion of the Magistrate Judge, convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. SO ORDERED by Judge Regina M. Rodriguez on 4/28/2023. Text Only Entry (rmrja)
April 28, 2023 Filing 11 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #10 Minute Order. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Regina M. Rodriguez and drawn to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. All future pleadings should be designated as 23-cv-00564-RMR. (Text Only Entry) (alave, )
April 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 04/28/2023. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this case shall be assigned to a District Judge under D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(c)(8) and D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(a) re: #9 Consent/Non-Consent Form to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge filed by Robert Schubert. (alave, )
April 26, 2023 Filing 9 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Robert Schubert All parties do not consent.. (Singer, Elliot)
March 14, 2023 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Law, David)
March 14, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by David Stanford Law on behalf of Kaiser Foundation HospitalsAttorney David Stanford Law added to party Kaiser Foundation Hospitals(pty:dft) (Law, David)
March 14, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Laurene S. Rogers by Laurene Sumiko Rogers on behalf of Kaiser Foundation HospitalsAttorney Laurene Sumiko Rogers added to party Kaiser Foundation Hospitals(pty:dft) (Rogers, Laurene)
March 14, 2023 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Robert Schubert. Kaiser Foundation Hospitals waiver sent on 3/14/2023, answer due 5/13/2023. (Singer, Elliot)
March 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 03/08/2023. Proposed Scheduling Order due 6/8/2023. Scheduling/Planning Conference set for 6/15/2023 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. (Attachments: #1 Continuation of Main Document, #2 Continuation of Main Document) (alave, )
March 2, 2023 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (norlin, )
March 1, 2023 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Text Only Entry (norlin, )
March 1, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kaiser Foundation Hospitals (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number ACODC-8966938)Attorney Elliot Asher Singer added to party Robert Schubert(pty:pla), filed by Robert Schubert. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Singer, Elliot)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schubert v. Kaiser Foundation Hospitals
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Schubert
Represented By: Elliot Asher Singer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaiser Foundation Hospitals
Represented By: David Stanford Law
Represented By: Laurene Sumiko Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?