Brooks v. Acosta et al
Plaintiff: Paula Brooks
Defendant: Jorge Blanco Acosta and Cusi Trucking Corp.
Case Number: 1:2023cv00732
Filed: March 22, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: N Reid Neureiter
Referring Judge: Nina Y Wang
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Auto Negligence
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 18, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER REFERRING CASE: This case is referred to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter for non-dispositive matters. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, and (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions. Court-sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the request of the parties by motion, this Court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. Alternatively, the Magistrate Judge, at his discretion, may convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. Counsel for the Parties and all counsel who may later enter an appearance shall review and familiarize themselves with the undersigned's Practice Standards, as well as the Practice Standards of the assigned Magistrate Judge. By Judge Nina Y. Wang on 5/18/2023. Text Only Entry (nywlc3, )
May 17, 2023 Filing 19 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #18 Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Nina Y. Wang and drawn to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. All future pleadings should be designated as 23-cv-00732-NYW. (Text Only Entry) (cmadr, )
May 17, 2023 Filing 18 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendants Jorge Blanco Acosta, Cusi Trucking Corp. All parties do not consent.. (Abramson, Jonathan)
May 16, 2023 Filing 17 DESIGNATION OF NON-PARTY by Defendants Jorge Blanco Acosta, Cusi Trucking Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-TAR (1 of 2), #2 Exhibit A-TAR (2 of 2))(Abramson, Jonathan)
April 24, 2023 Filing 16 NOTICE re #1 Notice of Removal,, Consent to Removal by Defendant Jorge Blanco Acosta (Abramson, Jonathan)
April 20, 2023 Filing 15 NOTICE of Change of Address/Contact Information by Giorgia Balin Turpen (Turpen, Giorgia)
April 17, 2023 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Paula Brooks. Jorge Blanco Acosta waiver sent on 4/14/2023, answer due 6/13/2023. (Turpen, Giorgia)
April 6, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE re #1 Notice of Removal,, Register of Actions (Elbert County District Court) by Defendant Cusi Trucking Corp. (Abramson, Jonathan)
March 29, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by J. Kyle Bachus on behalf of Paula BrooksAttorney J. Kyle Bachus added to party Paula Brooks(pty:pla) (Bachus, J.)
March 29, 2023 Filing 11 ANSWER to #6 Complaint by Cusi Trucking Corp..(Abramson, Jonathan)
March 23, 2023 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of Service by mail by Clerk of Court re #9 Order, to J. Kyle Bachus, Esq. #24441 BACHUS & SCHANKER, L.L.C. 101 W. Colfax Ave., Ste. 650 Denver, Colorado 80202. Text Only Entry (cmadr, )
March 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE AND SETTING DEADLINE FOR FILING OF CONSENT/NON-CONSENT FORM by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 23 March 2023. Consent Form due by 5/17/2023. Proposed Scheduling Order due 5/24/2023. Scheduling Conference set for 5/31/2023 10:00 AM in Courtroom C203 before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. The Scheduling Conference will be conducted via telephone. The parties are directed to call the conference line as a participant at (888) 398-2342, Access Code 5755390# at the scheduled time. (cmadr, )
March 22, 2023 Filing 8 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (tgall, )
March 22, 2023 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Complaint and Summons upon Cusi Trucking Corp. on 02/20/2023. (tgall, )
March 22, 2023 Filing 6 CIVIL COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND against Jorge Blanco Acosta, Cusi Trucking Corp., filed by Paula Brooks.(tgall, )
March 22, 2023 Filing 5 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Text Only Entry. (tgall, )
March 22, 2023 Filing 4 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry). (tgall, )
March 22, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Bobby Glendon Riley, Jr on behalf of Cusi Trucking Corp.Attorney Bobby Glendon Riley, Jr added to party Cusi Trucking Corp.(pty:dft) (Riley, Bobby)
March 22, 2023 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Abramson, Jonathan)
March 22, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Cusi Trucking Corp., Jorge Blanco Acosta from Elbert County District Court, Case Number 2023CV30014. (Filing fee $ 402, Receipt Number ACODC-9005859), filed by Cusi Trucking Corp., Jorge Blanco Acosta. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2-Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit 3-Summonses, #4 Exhibit 4-ROS (Cusi Trucking), #5 Exhibit 5-Brooks Accurint Report, #6 Exhibit 6-TAR, #7 Exhibit 7-Cert. Good Standing (Cusi), #8 Exhibit 8-FMCSA Snapshot (Cusi), #9 Civil Cover Sheet)(Abramson, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brooks v. Acosta et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paula Brooks
Represented By: Giorgia Balin Turpen
Represented By: J. Kyle Bachus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jorge Blanco Acosta
Represented By: Jonathan Marshall Abramson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cusi Trucking Corp.
Represented By: Bobby Glendon Riley, Jr.
Represented By: Jonathan Marshall Abramson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?