Phillips v. Hoos et al
Plaintiff: Emma Phillips
Defendant: Lauren Hoos, Flexdrive Services, LLC and Lyft, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2023cv00752
Filed: March 24, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: S Kato Crews
Referring Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 22, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 22, 2023 Filing 44 JOINDER in Defendant Lyft, Inc.'s Designation of Nonparties at Fault by Defendant Lauren Hoos. (Jones, Max)
May 15, 2023 Filing 43 DESIGNATION OF NON-PARTY Designation of Nonparties at Fault by Defendant Lyft, Inc.. (Sandberg, John)
May 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 42 PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on May 9, 2023. (csarr, )
May 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting #39 Motion for Protective Order by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on May 9, 2023. Text Only Entry(csarr, )
May 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 40 MEMORANDUM regarding #39 Joint MOTION for Protective Order filed by Lyft, Inc. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews, by District Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 5/8/2023. Text Only Entry (sdunb, )
May 5, 2023 Filing 39 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Defendant Lyft, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Protective Order)(Sandberg, John)
May 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 38 SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 5/3/2023. (amont, )
May 3, 2023 Filing 37 COURTROOM MINUTES for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews: Scheduling Conference held on 5/3/2023. Discovery due by 2/7/2024. Dispositive Motions due by 3/8/2024. Joint Status Report due by 7/29/2023. FTR: Courtroom C-201. (amont, )
May 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other specifically-referred motions, and (4) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. By District Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 5/1/2023. Text Only Entry (sdunb, )
May 1, 2023 Filing 35 MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE by Senior Judge Blackburn. This case is randomly reassigned to District Judge Gordon P. Gallagher and drawn to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. All future pleadings should be designated as 23-cv-00752-GPG. (athom, )
April 28, 2023 Filing 34 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #33 Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn and drawn to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. All future pleadings should be designated as 23-cv-00752-REB. (Text Only Entry) (csarr, )
April 28, 2023 Filing 33 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant Lyft, Inc. All parties do not consent.. (Sandberg, John)
April 28, 2023 Filing 32 Proposed Scheduling Order by Defendant Lyft, Inc.. (Sandberg, John)
April 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting #30 Motion for Extension of Time to File. The parties are granted an extension of up to and including 4/28/2023 to file the proposed scheduling order and consent form. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 4/27/2023. Text Only Entry(amont, )
April 26, 2023 Filing 30 STIPULATED Motion for Extension of Time Stipulated Motion for Two-Day Extension of Time to File Proposed Scheduling Order and Magistrate Judge Consent Form by Defendant Lyft, Inc.. (Sandberg, John) Modified on 4/27/2023 to add gavel (amont, ).
April 26, 2023 Filing 29 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by John M. Sandberg on behalf of Lyft, Inc.Attorney John M. Sandberg added to party Lyft, Inc.(pty:dft) (Sandberg, John)
April 21, 2023 Filing 28 Defendant Lauren Hoos' ANSWER to #4 Complaint and Jury Demand by Lauren Hoos.(Boutsicaris, Stephanie)
April 10, 2023 Filing 27 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Yarger, Frederick)
April 10, 2023 Filing 26 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Defendant Lyft, Inc. (Yarger, Frederick)
April 10, 2023 Filing 25 ANSWER to #4 Complaint Attorney Frederick Richard Yarger added to party Lyft, Inc.(pty:dft) by Lyft, Inc..(Yarger, Frederick)
April 10, 2023 Filing 24 ANSWER to #4 Complaint by Flexdrive Services, LLC.(Hambley, Victoria)
April 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MINUTE ORDER Setting Telephone Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference. Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 5/3/2023 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. The parties shall file their proposed scheduling order and email a copy in Word format to Crews_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov, no later than seven calendar days before the conference. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that a completed Magistrate Judge Consent Form (ECF. #9 ) shall be filed no later than seven calendar days before the conference. At the scheduled time, counsel shall call the Court provided conference line at (888) 251-2909 Access Code: 5662814#. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 4/7/2023. Text Only Entry (amont, )
April 6, 2023 Filing 22 NOTICE of Register of Actions by Defendant Lyft, Inc. (Yarger, Frederick)
April 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #19 Motion for Extension of Time. Flexdrive Services, LLC may have to and including 4/10/2023 to answer or otherwise respond. By Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 4/3/2023. Text Only Entry (skclc1)
April 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #18 Motion for Extension of Time. Lyft, Inc. may have to and including 4/10/2023 to answer or otherwise respond. By Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 4/3/2023. Text Only Entry (skclc1)
March 31, 2023 Filing 19 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #4 Complaint by Defendant Flexdrive Services, LLC. (Hambley, Victoria)
March 30, 2023 Filing 18 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #4 Complaint by Defendant Lyft, Inc.. (Stewart, Edward)
March 30, 2023 Filing 17 NOTICE of Consent to Notice of Removal of Action (Joint) by Defendant Flexdrive Services, LLC (Hambley, Victoria)
March 30, 2023 Filing 16 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Stephanie E. Boutsicaris on behalf of Lauren HoosAttorney Stephanie E. Boutsicaris added to party Lauren Hoos(pty:dft) (Boutsicaris, Stephanie)
March 30, 2023 Filing 15 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Max K. Jones, Jr on behalf of Lauren HoosAttorney Max K. Jones, Jr added to party Lauren Hoos(pty:dft) (Jones, Max)
March 30, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Robyn L. Clarke on behalf of Emma PhillipsAttorney Robyn L. Clarke added to party Emma Phillips(pty:pla) (Clarke, Robyn)
March 30, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Bradley Aaron Levin on behalf of Emma PhillipsAttorney Bradley Aaron Levin added to party Emma Phillips(pty:pla) (Levin, Bradley)
March 28, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Paul Joseph Rupprecht on behalf of Flexdrive Services, LLCAttorney Paul Joseph Rupprecht added to party Flexdrive Services, LLC(pty:dft) (Rupprecht, Paul)
March 28, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Victoria Brittany Hambley on behalf of Flexdrive Services, LLCAttorney Victoria Brittany Hambley added to party Flexdrive Services, LLC(pty:dft) (Hambley, Victoria)
March 27, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Paul J. Rupprecht by Paul Joseph Rupprecht on behalf of Lyft, Inc.Attorney Paul Joseph Rupprecht added to party Lyft, Inc.(pty:dft) (Rupprecht, Paul)
March 24, 2023 Filing 9 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (tgall, )
March 24, 2023 Filing 8 STATE COURT ORDER Granting Order Regarding Defendant's Unopposed Motion For Extension Of Time To File Responsive Pleading(s). By District Court Judge, Boulder County, on 03/20/2023. (tgall, )
March 24, 2023 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons, Complaint and Jury Demand, District Court Civil (CV) Case Cover Sheet For Initial Pleading of Complaint, Counterclaim, Cross-Claim Or Third-Party Complaint upon Lyft, Inc. on 02/23/2023. (tgall, )
March 24, 2023 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons, Complaint and Jury Demand, Case Cover Sheet For Initial Pleading of Complaint, Counterclaim, Cross-Claim Or Third-Party Complaint upon Lauren Hoos on 03/18/2023. (tgall, )
March 24, 2023 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons, Complaint and Jury Demand, District Court Civil (CV) Case Cover Sheet For Initial Pleading of Complaint, Counterclaim, Cross-Claim Or Third-Party Complaint upon Flexdrive Services, LLC on 02/23/2023. (tgall, )
March 24, 2023 Filing 4 COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND against Flexdrive Services, LLC, Lauren Hoos, Lyft, Inc., filed by Emma Phillips.(tgall, )
March 24, 2023 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Text Only Entry. (tgall, )
March 24, 2023 Filing 2 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry). (tgall, )
March 24, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Lyft, Inc. from Boulder County District Court, Colorado, Case Number 2023CV30112. (Filing fee $ 402, Receipt Number ACODC-9010821), filed by Lyft, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Hoos Affidavit of Service, #3 Exhibit C - Lyft Affidavit of Service, #4 Exhibit D - NJ Voter Information, #5 Exhibit E - Flexdrive Cert. of Good Standing, #6 Exhibit F - Lyft Cert. of Good Standing, #7 Exhibit G - Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Exhibit H-1 - Docket Sheet, #9 Exhibit H-2 - Cover Sheet, #10 Exhibit H-3 - Complaint, #11 Exhibit H-4 - Flexdrive Affidavit of Service, #12 Exhibit H-5 - Lyft Affidavit of Service, #13 Exhibit H-6 - Flexdrive Summons, #14 Exhibit H-7 - Lyft Summons, #15 Exhibit H-8 - Entry of Appearance, #16 Exhibit H-9 - Motion for Extension, #17 Exhibit H-10 - Proposed Order re Motion for Extension, #18 Exhibit H-11 - Order Granting Extension, #19 Exhibit H-12 - Hoos Affidavit of Service, #20 Exhibit H-13 - Hoos Summons, #21 Exhibit I - State Court Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #22 Appendix 1, #23 Appendix 2)(Hambley, Victoria)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Phillips v. Hoos et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emma Phillips
Represented By: Bradley Aaron Levin
Represented By: Robyn L. Clarke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lauren Hoos
Represented By: Max K. Jones, Jr.
Represented By: Stephanie E. Boutsicaris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flexdrive Services, LLC
Represented By: Paul Joseph Rupprecht
Represented By: Victoria Brittany Hambley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lyft, Inc.
Represented By: Victoria Brittany Hambley
Represented By: Edward Craig Stewart
Represented By: Frederick Richard Yarger
Represented By: John M. Sandberg
Represented By: Paul Joseph Rupprecht
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?