Shenzhen Gooloo E-Commerce Co., LTD v. Pilot, Inc.
Petitioner: Shenzhen Gooloo E-Commerce Co., LTD
Respondent: Pilot, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2023cv00854
Filed: April 6, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: S Kato Crews
Referring Judge: Susan Prose
Nature of Suit: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09 U.S.C. ยง 1 U.S. Arbitration Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 14, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 14, 2023 Filing 18 REPLY to Response to #8 MOTION to Dismiss Petition to Vacate Arbitration Award and to Confirm the Award filed by Respondent Pilot, Inc.. (Ruge, Alex)
June 1, 2023 Filing 17 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Briana Diane Long on behalf of Pilot, Inc.Attorney Briana Diane Long added to party Pilot, Inc.(pty:res) (Long, Briana)
June 1, 2023 Filing 16 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Alex William Ruge on behalf of Pilot, Inc.Attorney Alex William Ruge added to party Pilot, Inc.(pty:res) (Ruge, Alex)
May 31, 2023 Filing 15 ANSWER/REPLY to #10 Counterclaim by Shenzhen Gooloo E-Commerce Co., LTD.(Pierce, William)
May 31, 2023 Filing 14 RESPONSE to #10 Counterclaim by Counter Defendant Shenzhen Gooloo E-Commerce Co., LTD. (Pierce, William)
May 31, 2023 Filing 13 RESPONSE to #8 MOTION to Dismiss Petition to Vacate Arbitration Award and to Confirm the Award filed by Petitioner Shenzhen Gooloo E-Commerce Co., LTD. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Support)(Pierce, William)
May 10, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE of Related Case by Respondent Pilot, Inc. (Bradford, Aaron)
May 10, 2023 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Bradford, Aaron)
May 10, 2023 Filing 10 COUNTERCLAIM for Confirmation, Recognition and Enforcement of Foreign Arbitral Award against Shenzhen Gooloo E-Commerce Co., LTD, filed by Pilot, Inc..(Bradford, Aaron)
May 10, 2023 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by Pilot, Inc..(Bradford, Aaron)
May 10, 2023 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss Petition to Vacate Arbitration Award and to Confirm the Award by Respondent Pilot, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Bradford, Aaron)
May 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 REASSIGNING MAGISTRATE JUDGE. This action is reassigned to Magistrate Judge Susan Prose upon her appointment. All future pleadings should reference Magistrate Judge Prose at the beginning of the civil action number (such as 23-cv-00854-SP). Unless otherwise ordered, the dates and times for all previously scheduled matters will be maintained and will now be handled by Magistrate Judge Prose in Courtroom C-205. Her chambers are located in Room C-254 of the Byron G. Rogers Courthouse. Her telephone number is 303-335-2722. (Text only entry) (agarc, )
April 6, 2023 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. No Summons Issued. (norlin, )
April 6, 2023 Filing 5 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Text Only Entry (norlin, )
April 6, 2023 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Pierce, William)
April 6, 2023 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Restrict by Petitioner Shenzhen Gooloo E-Commerce Co., LTD. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Pierce, William)
April 6, 2023 Filing 2 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 1: by Petitioner Shenzhen Gooloo E-Commerce Co., LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit E)(Pierce, William)
April 6, 2023 Filing 1 PETITION to Vacate Arbitration Award (Filing fee $ 402, Receipt Number ACODC-9033034)Attorney William Matthew Pierce added to party Shenzhen Gooloo E-Commerce Co., LTD(pty:pet), filed by Shenzhen Gooloo E-Commerce Co., LTD. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Petition, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Summons, #9 Civil Cover Sheet)(Pierce, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shenzhen Gooloo E-Commerce Co., LTD v. Pilot, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Shenzhen Gooloo E-Commerce Co., LTD
Represented By: William Matthew Pierce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Pilot, Inc.
Represented By: Aaron Patrick Bradford
Represented By: Briana Diane Long
Represented By: Alex William Ruge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?