Bella Health and Wellness et al v. Weiser et al
Plaintiff: BELLA HEALTH AND WELLNESS, DENISE "DEDE&quot CHISM, ABBY SINNETT, KATHLEEN SANDER and Denise DeDe Chism
Defendant: PHIL WEISER, ROLAND FLORES, AMANDA MIXON, JENNIFER BLAIR, BECKETT CZARNECKI, ROBERT M. MAULITZ, SAUGHAR SAMALI, ALAN E. SHACKELFORD, KIELY M. SCHULTZ, AMY E. COLEN, ANITA KUMAR, DONALD LEFKOWITS, MAIDUL MEHMUD, KIAN MODANLOU, SCOTT C. STRAUSS, CHRISTOPHER A. BATES, JULIE ANN HARPER, HIEN H. LY, BERNARD JOSEPH FRANTA, LORI RAE HAMILTON, KARRIE TOMLIN, LENNY ROTHERMUND, HAYLEY HITCHCOCK, ALISSA M. SHELTON, PHYLLIS GRAHAM-DICKERSON, BRANDY VALDEZ MURPHY, DIANE REINHARD, NICHELE BRATTON, AECIAN PENDLETON, JOHN KELLNER, MICHAEL DOUGHERTY and BETH McCANN
Case Number: 1:2023cv00939
Filed: April 14, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: S Kato Crews
Referring Judge: Daniel D Domenico
Nature of Suit: Constitutionality of State Statutes
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 8, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 8, 2023 Filing 64 Joint STATUS REPORT COLORADO MEDICAL AND NURSING BOARDS JOINT STATUS REPORT by Defendants Nichele Bratton, Bernard Joseph Franta, Phyllis Graham-Dickerson, Lori Rae Hamilton, Hayley Hitchcock, Brandy Valdez Murphy, Aecian Pendleton, Diane Reinhard, Lenny Rothermund, Alissa M. Shelton, Karrie Tomlin. (Kenny, Elizabeth)
June 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER granting #62 Motion for Extension of Time to File re #62 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Extend Response and Briefing Deadlines. The deadline for the State Defendants to answer or respond to the complaint shall be extended to June 20, 2023; Plaintiffs' response to Defendant McCann's motion to dismiss and any other motions to dismiss shall be due July 11, 2023; and any replies shall be due July 25, 2023. SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 6/7/2023. Text Only Entry(dddlc5, )
June 7, 2023 Filing 62 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Extend Response and Briefing Deadlines by Plaintiffs Bella Health and Wellness, Denise DeDe Chism, Kathleen Sander, Abby Sinnett. (Rienzi, Mark)
May 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER granting #59 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint, (Second). John Kellner answer due 6/20/2023. SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 5/31/2023. Text Only Entry(dddlc5, )
May 30, 2023 Filing 60 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Geoffrey Charles Klingsporn on behalf of John KellnerAttorney Geoffrey Charles Klingsporn added to party John Kellner(pty:dft) (Klingsporn, Geoffrey)
May 30, 2023 Filing 59 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint,,,,, (Second) by Defendant John Kellner. (Marks, Josh)
May 30, 2023 Filing 58 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Beth McCann. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Beth McCann Second Declaration)(Ringel, Andrew)
May 30, 2023 Filing 57 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,, by Michael Dougherty.(Hughes, David)
May 22, 2023 Filing 56 Joint STATUS REPORT for Colorado Medical and Nursing Boards by Defendants Christopher A. Bates, Jennifer Blair, Nichele Bratton, Amy E. Colen, Beckett Czarnecki, Roland Flores, Bernard Joseph Franta, Phyllis Graham-Dickerson, Lori Rae Hamilton, Julie Ann Harper, Hayley Hitchcock, Anita Kumar, Donald Lefkowits, Hien H. Ly, Robert M. Maulitz, Maidul Mehmud, Amanda Mixon, Kian Modanlou, Brandy Valdez Murphy, Aecian Pendleton, Diane Reinhard, Lenny Rothermund, Saughar Samali, Kiely M. Schultz, Alan E. Shackelford, Alissa M. Shelton, Scott C. Strauss, Karrie Tomlin. (Urankar, Brian)
May 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER granting #53 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond To Plaintiffs' Verified Complaint And Demand For Jury Trial. Defendant John Kellner's answer due on or before 5/30/2023. SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 5/3/2023. Text Only Entry(dddlc5, )
May 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER granting #52 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint . Defendant Michael Dougherty's answer due on or before 5/30/2023. SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 5/3/2023. Text Only Entry(dddlc5, )
May 3, 2023 Filing 53 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond To Plaintiffs' Verified Complaint And Demand For Jury Trial by Defendant John Kellner. (Tomsic, Ann)
May 2, 2023 Filing 52 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint,,,,, by Defendant Michael Dougherty. (Hughes, David)
May 2, 2023 Filing 51 TRANSCRIPT of MOTION HEARING held on 4/24/23 before Judge Domenico. Pages: 1-130. NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within seven calendar days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Intent to Redact, of the party's intent to redact personal identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. If a Notice of Intent to Redact is not filed within the allotted time, this transcript will be made electronically available after 90 days. Please see the Notice of Electronic Availability of Transcripts document at www.cod.uscourts.gov. Transcript may only be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber prior to the 90 day deadline for electronic posting on PACER. (Thomas, Julie)
May 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER granting #49 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint. Defendant Beth McCann's answer is due on or before 5/30/2023. SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 5/2/2023. Text Only Entry(dddlc5, )
May 2, 2023 Filing 49 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint,,,,, by Defendant Beth McCann. (Ringel, Andrew)
April 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. The Temporary Restraining Order, Doc. #8 , is DISSOLVED. Plaintiffs' Emergency Motion for a Preliminary Injunction, Doc. #7 , is DENIED. The defendants must file a status report within two business days of any material action that occurs in the rulemaking process contemplated by Senate Bill 23-190, including any issuance of a notice of proposed rulemaking, any public hearing regarding a proposed rule, any adoption of a temporary or emergency rule, and any final adoption of a proposed rule by the Colorado Medical Board, the State Board of Pharmacy, or the State Board of Nursing. By Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 04/28/2023. (athom, )
April 26, 2023 Filing 47 Conventionally Submitted Material : USB exhibit to #34 -5 Declaration, by Plaintiffs Bella Health and Wellness, Denise DeDe Chism -Material placed in the oversized area A-1-7 of the Clerk's Office. Text Only Entry. (angar, )
April 24, 2023 Filing 46 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Daniel D. Domenico: Evidentiary Hearing held on 4/24/2023. Taking under advisement #7 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Court Reporter: Julie Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiffs' witness list, #2 Defendants' witness list, #3 Plaintiffs' exhibit list, #4 Defendants' exhibit list) (rkeec)
April 21, 2023 Filing 45 REPLY to Response to #7 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiffs Bella Health and Wellness, Denise DeDe Chism, Kathleen Sander, Abby Sinnett. (Rienzi, Mark)
April 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 44 MINUTE ORDER re: Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for 4/24/2023. Each side must provide the Court with two hard copies of its exhibits (one set of original exhibits and one copy for the bench) by 09:00 AM on 4/24/2023. All exhibits must be pre-marked with a label identifying the exhibit number and case number. The exhibits must be bound in one or more three-ring binders no larger than three inches in width, and the binders must be labeled on the cover and on the spine with the case caption, hearing date, and "ORIGINAL" or "COPY." SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 4/21/2023. Text Only Entry (dddlc5, )
April 21, 2023 Filing 43 Exhibit List by Defendant John Kellner. (Tomsic, Ann)
April 21, 2023 Filing 42 Witness List by Defendant John Kellner. (Tomsic, Ann)
April 21, 2023 Filing 41 STATUS REPORT by Defendant John Kellner. (Tomsic, Ann)
April 21, 2023 Filing 40 Witness List by Plaintiffs Bella Health and Wellness, Denise DeDe Chism, Kathleen Sander, Abby Sinnett. (Rienzi, Mark)
April 21, 2023 Filing 39 Exhibit List for State Defendants by Defendant Phil Weiser. (Kotlarczyk, Michael)
April 21, 2023 Filing 38 Exhibit List by Plaintiffs Bella Health and Wellness, Denise DeDe Chism, Kathleen Sander, Abby Sinnett. (Rienzi, Mark)
April 21, 2023 Filing 37 Witness List by Defendant Phil Weiser. (Kotlarczyk, Michael)
April 21, 2023 Filing 36 DECLARATION of Ryan Day by Defendant Phil Weiser. (Kotlarczyk, Michael)
April 21, 2023 Filing 35 DECLARATION of Robert M. Russel by Defendant Phil Weiser. (Kotlarczyk, Michael)
April 21, 2023 Filing 34 DECLARATION of Denise Chism by Plaintiffs Bella Health and Wellness, Denise DeDe Chism, Kathleen Sander, Abby Sinnett. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Bella Health FAQ Page, #2 Exhibit B - Bella Health APR Info Page, #3 Exhibit C - Bella Health APR Social Media Posts, #4 Exhibit D - Screenshot of Ultrasound, #5 Exhibit E - Video of Ultrasound)(Rienzi, Mark)
April 20, 2023 Filing 33 RESPONSE to #7 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Defendant Michael Dougherty. (Ruhland, Catherine)
April 20, 2023 Filing 32 RESPONSE to #7 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction STATE DEFENDANTS RESPONSE TO EMERGENCY MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION filed by Defendant Phil Weiser. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Sullivan, Grant)
April 20, 2023 Filing 31 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Elizabeth V. Kenny on behalf of Nichele Bratton, Bernard Joseph Franta, Phyllis Graham-Dickerson, Lori Rae Hamilton, Hayley Hitchcock, Brandy Valdez Murphy, Aecian Pendleton, Diane Reinhard, Lenny Rothermund, Alissa M. Shelton, Karrie TomlinAttorney Elizabeth V. Kenny added to party Nichele Bratton(pty:dft), Attorney Elizabeth V. Kenny added to party Bernard Joseph Franta(pty:dft), Attorney Elizabeth V. Kenny added to party Phyllis Graham-Dickerson(pty:dft), Attorney Elizabeth V. Kenny added to party Lori Rae Hamilton(pty:dft), Attorney Elizabeth V. Kenny added to party Hayley Hitchcock(pty:dft), Attorney Elizabeth V. Kenny added to party Brandy Valdez Murphy(pty:dft), Attorney Elizabeth V. Kenny added to party Aecian Pendleton(pty:dft), Attorney Elizabeth V. Kenny added to party Diane Reinhard(pty:dft), Attorney Elizabeth V. Kenny added to party Lenny Rothermund(pty:dft), Attorney Elizabeth V. Kenny added to party Alissa M. Shelton(pty:dft), Attorney Elizabeth V. Kenny added to party Karrie Tomlin(pty:dft) (Kenny, Elizabeth)
April 20, 2023 Filing 30 RESPONSE to #7 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Defendant John Kellner. (Tomsic, Ann)
April 20, 2023 Filing 29 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Abigail M. Hinchcliff on behalf of Phil WeiserAttorney Abigail M. Hinchcliff added to party Phil Weiser(pty:dft) (Hinchcliff, Abigail)
April 20, 2023 Filing 28 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Brian J. Urankar on behalf of Christopher A. Bates, Jennifer Blair, Amy E. Colen, Beckett Czarnecki, Roland Flores, Julie Ann Harper, Anita Kumar, Donald Lefkowits, Hien H. Ly, Robert M. Maulitz, Maidul Mehmud, Amanda Mixon, Kian Modanlou, Saughar Samali, Kiely M. Schultz, Alan E. Shackelford, Scott C. StraussAttorney Brian J. Urankar added to party Christopher A. Bates(pty:dft), Attorney Brian J. Urankar added to party Jennifer Blair(pty:dft), Attorney Brian J. Urankar added to party Amy E. Colen(pty:dft), Attorney Brian J. Urankar added to party Beckett Czarnecki(pty:dft), Attorney Brian J. Urankar added to party Roland Flores(pty:dft), Attorney Brian J. Urankar added to party Julie Ann Harper(pty:dft), Attorney Brian J. Urankar added to party Anita Kumar(pty:dft), Attorney Brian J. Urankar added to party Donald Lefkowits(pty:dft), Attorney Brian J. Urankar added to party Hien H. Ly(pty:dft), Attorney Brian J. Urankar added to party Robert M. Maulitz(pty:dft), Attorney Brian J. Urankar added to party Maidul Mehmud(pty:dft), Attorney Brian J. Urankar added to party Amanda Mixon(pty:dft), Attorney Brian J. Urankar added to party Kian Modanlou(pty:dft), Attorney Brian J. Urankar added to party Saughar Samali(pty:dft), Attorney Brian J. Urankar added to party Kiely M. Schultz(pty:dft), Attorney Brian J. Urankar added to party Alan E. Shackelford(pty:dft), Attorney Brian J. Urankar added to party Scott C. Strauss(pty:dft) (Urankar, Brian)
April 20, 2023 Filing 27 NOTICE of Non-Participation from Defendant Beth McCann by Defendant Beth McCann (Ringel, Andrew)
April 20, 2023 Filing 26 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Andrew David Ringel on behalf of Beth McCannAttorney Andrew David Ringel added to party Beth McCann(pty:dft) (Ringel, Andrew)
April 19, 2023 Filing 25 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Catherine R. Ruhland on behalf of Michael DoughertyAttorney Catherine R. Ruhland added to party Michael Dougherty(pty:dft) (Ruhland, Catherine)
April 19, 2023 Filing 24 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by David Evan Hughes on behalf of Michael DoughertyAttorney David Evan Hughes added to party Michael Dougherty(pty:dft) (Hughes, David)
April 19, 2023 Filing 23 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES: re: #21 Notice of Entry of Appearance filed by attorney Ann Bronwen Tomsic. The format for the attorney's signature block is not correct. DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - future documents must be filed pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 4.3(d) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil Cases). (Text Only Entry) (athom, )
April 19, 2023 Filing 22 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Denise DeDe Chism, Bella Health and Wellness, Abby Sinnett, Kathleen Sander. Nichele Bratton waiver sent on 4/16/2023, answer due 6/15/2023; Bernard Joseph Franta waiver sent on 4/16/2023, answer due 6/15/2023; Phyllis Graham-Dickerson waiver sent on 4/16/2023, answer due 6/15/2023; Lori Rae Hamilton waiver sent on 4/16/2023, answer due 6/15/2023; Hayley Hitchcock waiver sent on 4/16/2023, answer due 6/15/2023; Brandy Valdez Murphy waiver sent on 4/16/2023, answer due 6/15/2023; Aecian Pendleton waiver sent on 4/16/2023, answer due 6/15/2023; Diane Reinhard waiver sent on 4/16/2023, answer due 6/15/2023; Lenny Rothermund waiver sent on 4/16/2023, answer due 6/15/2023; Alissa M. Shelton waiver sent on 4/16/2023, answer due 6/15/2023; Karrie Tomlin waiver sent on 4/16/2023, answer due 6/15/2023. (Attachments: #1 Waiver of the Service of Summons - Alissa M. Shelton, #2 Waiver of the Service of Summons - Bernard Joseph Franta, #3 Waiver of the Service of Summons - Brandy Valdez Murphy, #4 Waiver of the Service of Summons - Diane Reinhard, #5 Waiver of the Service of Summons - Hayley Hitchcock, #6 Waiver of the Service of Summons - Karrie Tomlin, #7 Waiver of the Service of Summons - Lenny Rothermund, #8 Waiver of the Service of Summons - Lori Rae Hamilton, #9 Waiver of the Service of Summons - Nichele Bratton, #10 Waiver of the Service of Summons - Phyllis Graham-Dickerson)(Rienzi, Mark)
April 18, 2023 Filing 21 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Ann Bronwen Tomsic on behalf of All Defendants Attorney Ann Bronwen Tomsic added to party John Kellner(pty:dft) (Tomsic, Ann)
April 18, 2023 Filing 20 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Grant T. Sullivan on behalf of Phil WeiserAttorney Grant T. Sullivan added to party Phil Weiser(pty:dft) (Sullivan, Grant)
April 18, 2023 Filing 19 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Michael T. Kotlarczyk on behalf of Phil WeiserAttorney Michael T. Kotlarczyk added to party Phil Weiser(pty:dft) (Kotlarczyk, Michael)
April 17, 2023 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Beth McCann served on 4/17/2023, answer due 5/8/2023. (Rienzi, Mark)
April 17, 2023 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. John Kellner served on 4/17/2023, answer due 5/8/2023. (Rienzi, Mark)
April 17, 2023 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Denise DeDe Chism, Bella Health and Wellness, Abby Sinnett, Kathleen Sander. Michael Dougherty served on 4/17/2023, answer due 5/8/2023. (Rienzi, Mark)
April 17, 2023 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Denise DeDe Chism, Bella Health and Wellness, Abby Sinnett, Kathleen Sander. Christopher A. Bates waiver sent on 4/16/2023, answer due 6/15/2023; Jennifer Blair waiver sent on 4/16/2023, answer due 6/15/2023; Amy E. Colen waiver sent on 4/16/2023, answer due 6/15/2023; Beckett Czarnecki waiver sent on 4/16/2023, answer due 6/15/2023; Roland Flores waiver sent on 4/16/2023, answer due 6/15/2023; Julie Ann Harper waiver sent on 4/16/2023, answer due 6/15/2023; Anita Kumar waiver sent on 4/16/2023, answer due 6/15/2023; Donald Lefkowits waiver sent on 4/16/2023, answer due 6/15/2023; Hien H. Ly waiver sent on 4/16/2023, answer due 6/15/2023; Robert M. Maulitz waiver sent on 4/16/2023, answer due 6/15/2023; Maidul Mehmud waiver sent on 4/16/2023, answer due 6/15/2023; Amanda Mixon waiver sent on 4/16/2023, answer due 6/15/2023; Kian Modanlou waiver sent on 4/16/2023, answer due 6/15/2023; Saughar Samali waiver sent on 4/16/2023, answer due 6/15/2023; Kiely M. Schultz waiver sent on 4/16/2023, answer due 6/15/2023; Alan E. Shackelford waiver sent on 4/16/2023, answer due 6/15/2023; Scott C. Strauss waiver sent on 4/16/2023, answer due 6/15/2023; Phil Weiser waiver sent on 4/16/2023, answer due 6/15/2023. (Attachments: #1 Waiver of the Service of Summons - Amanda Mixon, #2 Waiver of the Service of Summons - Amy E. Colen, #3 Waiver of the Service of Summons - Anita Kumar, #4 Waiver of the Service of Summons - Beckett Czarecki, #5 Waiver of the Service of Summons - Christopher A. Bates, #6 Waiver of the Service of Summons - Donald Lefkowits, #7 Waiver of the Service of Summons - Hien H. Ly, #8 Waiver of the Service of Summons - Jennifer Blair, #9 Waiver of the Service of Summons - Julie Ann Harper, #10 Waiver of the Service of Summons - Kian Modanlou, #11 Waiver of the Service of Summons - Kiely M. Schultz, #12 Waiver of the Service of Summons - Maidul Mehmud, #13 Waiver of the Service of Summons - Robert M. Maulitz, #14 Waiver of the Service of Summons - Roland Flores, #15 Waiver of the Service of Summons - Saughar Samali, #16 Waiver of the Service of Summons - Scott C. Strauss, #17 Waiver of the Service of Summons - Phil Weiser)(Rienzi, Mark)
April 17, 2023 Filing 14 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (blaws)
April 17, 2023 Filing 13 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (trvo, )
April 16, 2023 Filing 12 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Beth McCann by Plaintiffs BELLA HEALTH AND WELLNESS, DENISE "DEDE" CHISM, KATHLEEN SANDER, ABBY SINNETT. (Rienzi, Mark)
April 16, 2023 Filing 11 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Michael Dougherty by Plaintiffs BELLA HEALTH AND WELLNESS, DENISE "DEDE" CHISM, KATHLEEN SANDER, ABBY SINNETT. (Rienzi, Mark)
April 16, 2023 Filing 10 SUMMONS REQUEST as to John Kellner by Plaintiffs BELLA HEALTH AND WELLNESS, DENISE "DEDE" CHISM, KATHLEEN SANDER, ABBY SINNETT. (Rienzi, Mark)
April 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of Local Civ. R. 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions, and (5) pursuant to Local Civ. R. 16.6 and at the discretion of the Magistrate Judge, convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 4/15/2023. Text Only Entry (dddlc1, )
April 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING IN PART #7 Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order.It is ORDERED that Plaintiffs' Emergency Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction, Doc. #7 , is GRANTED IN PART as to the request for a temporary restraining order and TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT as to the request for a preliminary injunction.It is FURTHER ORDERED that the defendants and their officers, agents, servants, employees, attorneys, and any other persons who are in active concert or participation with them who receive actual notice of this Order by personal service or otherwise are TEMPORARILY RESTRAINED from enforcing Senate Bill 23-190 against the plaintiffs. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 65(b)(2), this temporary restraining order will expire fourteen days after entry, unless the Court extends it for good cause before that time or the Court grants a motion to dissolve or modify it pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 65(b)(4).It is FURTHER ORDERED that a Preliminary Injunction Hearing is SET for 4/24/2023 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom A1002 before Judge Daniel D. Domenico, at which the defendants must SHOW CAUSE why the Court should not enter a preliminary injunction extending the injunctive relief set forth in this Order until final adjudication of this case on the merits. PLEASE SEE ORDER FOR ADDITONAL INFORMATION.By Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 4/15/2023. (dddlc1, )
April 14, 2023 Filing 7 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiffs BELLA HEALTH AND WELLNESS, DENISE "DEDE" CHISM, KATHLEEN SANDER, ABBY SINNETT. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Proposed Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause, #2 Temporary Restraining Order Information)(Rienzi, Mark)
April 14, 2023 Filing 6 Case assigned to Judge Daniel D. Domenico and drawn to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Text Only Entry. (blaws)
April 14, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Laura Wolk Slavis on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Laura Wolk Slavis added to party BELLA HEALTH AND WELLNESS(pty:pla), Attorney Laura Wolk Slavis added to party DENISE "DEDE" CHISM(pty:pla), Attorney Laura Wolk Slavis added to party KATHLEEN SANDER(pty:pla), Attorney Laura Wolk Slavis added to party ABBY SINNETT(pty:pla) (Slavis, Laura)
April 14, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Rebekah Perry Ricketts on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Rebekah Perry Ricketts added to party BELLA HEALTH AND WELLNESS(pty:pla), Attorney Rebekah Perry Ricketts added to party DENISE "DEDE" CHISM(pty:pla), Attorney Rebekah Perry Ricketts added to party KATHLEEN SANDER(pty:pla), Attorney Rebekah Perry Ricketts added to party ABBY SINNETT(pty:pla) (Ricketts, Rebekah)
April 14, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Daniel Matthew Vitagliano on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Daniel Matthew Vitagliano added to party BELLA HEALTH AND WELLNESS(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel Matthew Vitagliano added to party DENISE "DEDE" CHISM(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel Matthew Vitagliano added to party KATHLEEN SANDER(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel Matthew Vitagliano added to party ABBY SINNETT(pty:pla) (Vitagliano, Daniel)
April 14, 2023 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Rienzi, Mark)
April 14, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number BCODC-9048309)Attorney Mark Leonard Rienzi added to party BELLA HEALTH AND WELLNESS(pty:pla), Attorney Mark Leonard Rienzi added to party DENISE "DEDE" CHISM(pty:pla), Attorney Mark Leonard Rienzi added to party KATHLEEN SANDER(pty:pla), Attorney Mark Leonard Rienzi added to party ABBY SINNETT(pty:pla), filed by DENISE "DEDE" CHISM, BELLA HEALTH AND WELLNESS, ABBY SINNETT, KATHLEEN SANDER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Provider Ethical Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - 2022 Practice Agreements & Financial Policies, #3 Exhibit C - Mission Story, BellaWellness.org, #4 Exhibit D - FAQs, BellaWellness.org, #5 Exhibit E - Bella Social Media, #6 Exhibit F - SB 23-190, #7 Exhibit G - Excerpts from Press Conference on the Introduction of SB 23-190, #8 Exhibit H - Excerpts from Senate Judiciary Hearing On SB23-190, #9 Exhibit I - Excerpts from Senate Second and Third Reading of SB23-190, #10 Exhibit J - Excerpts from House Judiciary Hearing on SB23-190, #11 Exhibit K - Excerpts from House Third Reading of SB23-190 Transcript, #12 Exhibit L - Excerpts from House Third Reading of SB 23-190 (April 1, 2023), #13 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rienzi, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bella Health and Wellness et al v. Weiser et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BELLA HEALTH AND WELLNESS
Represented By: Daniel Matthew Vitagliano
Represented By: Laura Wolk Slavis
Represented By: Rebekah Perry Ricketts
Represented By: Mark Leonard Rienzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DENISE "DEDE&quot CHISM
Represented By: Daniel Matthew Vitagliano
Represented By: Laura Wolk Slavis
Represented By: Rebekah Perry Ricketts
Represented By: Mark Leonard Rienzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ABBY SINNETT
Represented By: Daniel Matthew Vitagliano
Represented By: Laura Wolk Slavis
Represented By: Rebekah Perry Ricketts
Represented By: Mark Leonard Rienzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KATHLEEN SANDER
Represented By: Daniel Matthew Vitagliano
Represented By: Laura Wolk Slavis
Represented By: Rebekah Perry Ricketts
Represented By: Mark Leonard Rienzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denise DeDe Chism
Represented By: Daniel Matthew Vitagliano
Represented By: Laura Wolk Slavis
Represented By: Rebekah Perry Ricketts
Represented By: Mark Leonard Rienzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHIL WEISER
Represented By: Abigail M. Hinchcliff
Represented By: Grant T. Sullivan
Represented By: Michael T. Kotlarczyk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROLAND FLORES
Represented By: Brian J. Urankar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMANDA MIXON
Represented By: Brian J. Urankar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JENNIFER BLAIR
Represented By: Brian J. Urankar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BECKETT CZARNECKI
Represented By: Brian J. Urankar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT M. MAULITZ
Represented By: Brian J. Urankar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAUGHAR SAMALI
Represented By: Brian J. Urankar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALAN E. SHACKELFORD
Represented By: Brian J. Urankar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KIELY M. SCHULTZ
Represented By: Brian J. Urankar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMY E. COLEN
Represented By: Brian J. Urankar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANITA KUMAR
Represented By: Brian J. Urankar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DONALD LEFKOWITS
Represented By: Brian J. Urankar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAIDUL MEHMUD
Represented By: Brian J. Urankar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KIAN MODANLOU
Represented By: Brian J. Urankar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCOTT C. STRAUSS
Represented By: Brian J. Urankar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHRISTOPHER A. BATES
Represented By: Brian J. Urankar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JULIE ANN HARPER
Represented By: Brian J. Urankar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HIEN H. LY
Represented By: Brian J. Urankar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BERNARD JOSEPH FRANTA
Represented By: Elizabeth Virginia Kenny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LORI RAE HAMILTON
Represented By: Elizabeth Virginia Kenny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KARRIE TOMLIN
Represented By: Elizabeth Virginia Kenny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LENNY ROTHERMUND
Represented By: Elizabeth Virginia Kenny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HAYLEY HITCHCOCK
Represented By: Elizabeth Virginia Kenny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALISSA M. SHELTON
Represented By: Elizabeth Virginia Kenny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHYLLIS GRAHAM-DICKERSON
Represented By: Elizabeth Virginia Kenny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRANDY VALDEZ MURPHY
Represented By: Elizabeth Virginia Kenny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DIANE REINHARD
Represented By: Elizabeth Virginia Kenny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NICHELE BRATTON
Represented By: Elizabeth Virginia Kenny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AECIAN PENDLETON
Represented By: Elizabeth Virginia Kenny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN KELLNER
Represented By: Ann Bronwen Tomsic
Represented By: Geoffrey Charles Klingsporn
Represented By: Josh Adam Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL DOUGHERTY
Represented By: Catherine R. Ruhland
Represented By: David Evan Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BETH McCANN
Represented By: Andrew David Ringel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?