Hajiseyedjavadi v. Mayorkas et al
Plaintiff: Seyed Ali Hajiseyedjavadi
Defendant: Alejandro Mayorkas, Ur M Jaddou, Ted H. Kim and Merrick B. Garland
Case Number: 1:2023cv01014
Filed: April 21, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Robert E Blackburn
Referring Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
2 Judge: Kristen L Mix
Nature of Suit: APA Review/Appeal
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 702 Administrative Procedure Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 19, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 19, 2023 Filing 18 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Sadaf F. Ahmed on behalf of Seyed Ali HajiseyedjavadiAttorney Sadaf F. Ahmed added to party Seyed Ali Hajiseyedjavadi(pty:pla) (Ahmed, Sadaf)
May 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 05/12/2023. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Unopposed Motion for Extension of Responsive Pleading Deadline #15 is GRANTED. The deadline for Defendants to answer or otherwise respond to the operative complaint is extended to July 11, 2023.(alave, )
May 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other specifically-referred motions, and (4) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. Motion #15 referred to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. By District Judge Gordon P Gallagher on 5/11/2023. Text Only Entry (sdunb, )
May 11, 2023 Filing 15 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint,, by Defendants Merrick B. Garland, Ur M Jaddou, Ted H. Kim, Alejandro Mayorkas. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Isler, Thomas)
May 1, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Thomas Alan Isler on behalf of Merrick B. Garland, Ur M Jaddou, Ted H. Kim, Alejandro MayorkasAttorney Thomas Alan Isler added to party Merrick B. Garland(pty:dft), Attorney Thomas Alan Isler added to party Ur M Jaddou(pty:dft), Attorney Thomas Alan Isler added to party Ted H. Kim(pty:dft), Attorney Thomas Alan Isler added to party Alejandro Mayorkas(pty:dft) (Isler, Thomas)
April 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER. This matter is before the court sua sponte. This case has been assigned to the AP docket in error. The case does not fall within the scope of cases subject to management as an AP case under D.C.COLO. LAPR 1.1(c) governing cases challenging an action or final decision of an administrative agency. IT IS ORDERED that the clerk shall assign this case to judicial officers under D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 04/24/2023. This case is randomly reassigned to District Judge Gordon P. Gallagher and drawn to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. All future pleadings should be designated as 23-cv-01014-GPG. (athom, )
April 21, 2023 Filing 12 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (norlin, )
April 21, 2023 Filing 11 Case assigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn.Text Only Entry (norlin, )
April 21, 2023 Filing 10 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (norlin, )
April 21, 2023 Filing 9 Case transferred in from District of District of Columbia; Case Number 1:23-cv-00331. File, transfer order and docket sheet received
April 10, 2023 Set/Reset Deadlines: Transfer due by 4/20/2023. (mac) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 4/21/2023.]
April 10, 2023 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Upon review of Defendants' #8 Consent Motion to Transfer and Extend, it is ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED. The Clerk is directed to transfer this action to the United States District Court for the District of Colorado. It is further ORDERED that Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint within 21 days after this action is docketed in the transferee district. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on April 10, 2023. (lccjn1) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 4/21/2023.]
April 5, 2023 Filing 8 Consent MOTION to Transfer Case , Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by MERRICK B. GARLAND, UR M. JADDOU, TED H. KIM, ALEJANDRO N. MAYORKAS. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hammond, Derek) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 4/21/2023.]
April 5, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Derek S. Hammond on behalf of All Defendants (Hammond, Derek) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 4/21/2023.]
February 16, 2023 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UR M. JADDOU served on 2/10/2023; TED H. KIM served on 2/10/2023; ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS served on 2/10/2023 (Ahmed, Sadaf) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 4/21/2023.]
February 16, 2023 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 2/13/2023. (Ahmed, Sadaf) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 4/21/2023.]
February 16, 2023 Filing 4 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 2/7/2023. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 4/8/2023. (Ahmed, Sadaf) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 4/21/2023.]
February 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on February 9, 2023. (lccjn1) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 4/21/2023.]
February 7, 2023 Filing 2 SUMMONS (5) Issued Electronically as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zcb) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 4/21/2023.]
February 7, 2023 Case Assigned to Judge Carl J. Nichols. (zcb) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 4/21/2023.]
February 6, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MERRICK B. GARLAND, UR M. JADDOU, TED H. KIM, ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9841149) filed by SEYED ALI HAJISEYEDJAVADI. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EXHIBIT A, #2 Exhibit EXHIBIT B, #3 Summons SUMMONS FOR U.S. ATTORNEY, #4 Summons SUMMONS FOR ATT. GENERAL, #5 Summons SUMMONS FOR ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS, #6 Summons SUMMONS FOR UR. M. JADDOU, #7 Summons SUMMONS FOR TED H. KIM, #8 Civil Cover Sheet CIVIL COVER SHEET)(Ahmed, Sadaf) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 4/21/2023.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hajiseyedjavadi v. Mayorkas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Seyed Ali Hajiseyedjavadi
Represented By: Sadaf F. Ahmed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alejandro Mayorkas
Represented By: Thomas Alan Isler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ur M Jaddou
Represented By: Thomas Alan Isler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ted H. Kim
Represented By: Thomas Alan Isler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merrick B. Garland
Represented By: Thomas Alan Isler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?