Velasquez Ramirez et al v. Mayorkas et al
Plaintiff: Araceli Jervandita Velasquez Ramirez and Jorge Antonio Velasquez
Defendant: DHS Secretary Alejandro Mayorkas, USCIS, USCIS Director UR MENDOZA JADDOU, Director, USCIS NSC Loren K. Miller, Alejandro Mayorkas, Ur Mendoza Jaddou and Loren K. Miller
Case Number: 1:2023cv01052
Filed: April 25, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Christine M Arguello
Referring Judge: Scott T Varholak
Nature of Suit: APA Review/Appeal
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 702 Administrative Procedure Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 20, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting the parties' #12 Joint Motion for Extension of Time for Defendants to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint and to Reset Scheduling Conference. Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint not later than September 25, 2023. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the Scheduling Conference set for 6/22/2023 is VACATED and RESET for 10/4/2023 at 10:15 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. The parties' joint Proposed Scheduling Order is now due 9/27/2023. SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 6/20/23. Text Only Entry(stvlc3, Andrew)
June 20, 2023 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM regarding #12 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint,,, and to Reset Scheduling Conference filed by USCIS, Alejandro Mayorkas, Loren K. Miller, Ur Mendoza Jaddou. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak by Senior Judge Christine M. Arguello on 6/20/2023. Text Only Entry (cmasec)
June 15, 2023 Filing 12 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint,,, and to Reset Scheduling Conference by Defendants Ur Mendoza Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas, Loren K. Miller, USCIS. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Brown, Logan)
May 30, 2023 Filing 11 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES re: #9 Notice of Entry of Appearance signed by attorney Philip Alterman and filed by attorney Courtney E. Butler. DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. PLEASE TAKE NOTICE - future documents must be filed using the CM/ECF login of the attorneys whose signature is on the pleading, in accordance with D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 4.3(c) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases). (Text Only Entry) (trvo, )
May 30, 2023 Filing 10 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES re: #8 Notice of Entry of Appearance signed by Camila Palmer and filed by attorney Courtney E. Butler. The s/signature did not match the filers name on the account for which the login and password are registered. DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. PLEASE TAKE NOTICE - future documents must be filed using the CM/ECF login of the attorneys whose signature is on the pleading, in accordance with D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 4.3(c) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases). (Text Only Entry) (trvo, )
May 25, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance for co-counsel Philip Alterman by Courtney E. Butler on behalf of Jorge Antonio Velasquez, Araceli Jervandita Velasquez Ramirez (Butler, Courtney)
May 25, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance for co-counsel Camila Palmer by Courtney E. Butler on behalf of Jorge Antonio Velasquez, Araceli Jervandita Velasquez Ramirez (Butler, Courtney)
May 4, 2023 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant(s) Ur Mendoza Jaddou served on 5/1/2023, answer due 6/30/2023; Alejandro Mayorkas served on 5/1/2023, answer due 6/30/2023; Loren K. Miller served on 5/2/2023, answer due 7/1/2023; USCIS served on 5/1/2023, answer due 6/30/2023. (Butler, Courtney)
April 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 26 April 2023. Proposed Scheduling Order due 6/15/2023. Scheduling Conference set for 6/22/2023 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. (cmadr, )
April 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Magistrate Judge Varholak is designated to conduct NDISPO proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b). The Court will unilaterally set the trial on a Court Term Week within 120 days from the date of the final pretrial conference and the parties shall be available for trial accordingly. The Court's Term Weeks can be found under the "Calendar" link on the District Courts homepage (https://www.cod.uscourts.gov). Court-sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. Court-sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. The Magistrate Judge, at his/her discretion, may convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. SO ORDERED by Senior Judge Christine M. Arguello on 4/26/2023. Text Only Entry (cmasec)
April 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER. This matter is before the court sua sponte. This case has been assigned to the AP docket in error. The case does not fall within the scope of cases subject to management as an AP case under D.C.COLO. LAPR 1.1(c) governing cases challenging an action or final decision of an administrative agency. IT IS ORDERED that the clerk shall assign this case to judicial officers under D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 04/26/2023. This case is randomly reassigned to Senior Judge Christine M. Arguello and drawn to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. All future pleadings should be designated as 23-cv-01052-CMA. (athom, )
April 26, 2023 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (jcharl, )
April 25, 2023 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Text Only Entry. (jcharl, )
April 25, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against UR MENDOZA JADDOU, Alejandro Mayorkas, Loren K. Miller, USCIS (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number ACODC-9066870)Attorney Courtney E. Butler added to party Jorge Antonio Velasquez(pty:pla), Attorney Courtney E. Butler added to party Araceli Jervandita Velasquez Ramirez(pty:pla), filed by Araceli Jervandita Velasquez Ramirez, Jorge Antonio Velasquez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Summons Finegan, #14 Summons Garland, #15 Summons Mayorkas, #16 Summons Mendoza Jaddou, #17 Summons USCIS, #18 Summons Miller)(Butler, Courtney)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Velasquez Ramirez et al v. Mayorkas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Araceli Jervandita Velasquez Ramirez
Represented By: Courtney E. Butler
Represented By: Camila S. Palmer
Represented By: Philip M. Alterman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jorge Antonio Velasquez
Represented By: Courtney E. Butler
Represented By: Camila S. Palmer
Represented By: Philip M. Alterman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DHS Secretary Alejandro Mayorkas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USCIS
Represented By: Logan P. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USCIS Director UR MENDOZA JADDOU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director, USCIS NSC Loren K. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alejandro Mayorkas
Represented By: Logan P. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ur Mendoza Jaddou
Represented By: Logan P. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Loren K. Miller
Represented By: Logan P. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?