Curran et al v. Home Partners Holdings LLC et al
Plaintiff: Michael Curran, Christa Curran and Kelly Colbert
Defendant: Home Partners Holdings LLC, HPA US1 LLC and OPVHHJV LLC doing business as Pathlight Property Management
Case Number: 1:2023cv01279
Filed: May 22, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Maritza Dominguez Braswell
Referring Judge: Daniel D Domenico
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 19, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER: In view of the #13 Proposed Scheduling Order with Disputed Issues, a Scheduling Conference is SET for August 3, 2023, at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Maritza Dominguez Braswell. The Conference will be conducted by video. The parties are directed to the attached instructions for appearing by video feed. By Magistrate Judge Maritza Dominguez Braswell on 7/19/2023. Text Only Entry (mdblc1)
July 19, 2023 Filing 14 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiffs Kelly Colbert, Christa Curran, Michael Curran All parties do not consent.. (Regan, Anne)
July 19, 2023 Filing 13 Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiffs Kelly Colbert, Christa Curran, Michael Curran. (Regan, Anne)
July 13, 2023 Filing 12 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to the Complaint by Defendants OPVHHJV LLC, Home Partners Holdings LLC, HPA US1 LLC. All Defendants. (Cockson, Michael)
July 13, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Michael Fredrick Cockson on behalf of All Defendants Attorney Michael Fredrick Cockson added to party HPA US1 LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Michael Fredrick Cockson added to party Home Partners Holdings LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Michael Fredrick Cockson added to party OPVHHJV LLC(pty:dft) (Cockson, Michael)
June 7, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance Scott C. Harris by Scott C. Harris on behalf of Kelly Colbert, Christa Curran, Michael CurranAttorney Scott C. Harris added to party Kelly Colbert(pty:pla), Attorney Scott C. Harris added to party Christa Curran(pty:pla), Attorney Scott C. Harris added to party Michael Curran(pty:pla) (Harris, Scott)
June 7, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Joseph C. Bourne on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Joseph C. Bourne added to party Kelly Colbert(pty:pla), Attorney Joseph C. Bourne added to party Christa Curran(pty:pla), Attorney Joseph C. Bourne added to party Michael Curran(pty:pla) (Bourne, Joseph)
June 7, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Susan E. Ellingstad on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Susan E. Ellingstad added to party Kelly Colbert(pty:pla), Attorney Susan E. Ellingstad added to party Christa Curran(pty:pla), Attorney Susan E. Ellingstad added to party Michael Curran(pty:pla) (Ellingstad, Susan)
June 7, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance S. Michael Dunn by S. Michael Dunn on behalf of Kelly Colbert, Christa Curran, Michael CurranAttorney S. Michael Dunn added to party Kelly Colbert(pty:pla), Attorney S. Michael Dunn added to party Christa Curran(pty:pla), Attorney S. Michael Dunn added to party Michael Curran(pty:pla) (Dunn, S.)
May 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE DEADLINES. Proposed Scheduling Order due 7/19/2023. By Magistrate Judge Maritza Dominguez Braswell on 5/31/2023. (evaug)
May 24, 2023 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Michael Curran, Kelly Colbert, Christa Curran. HPA US1 LLC waiver sent on 5/23/2023, answer due 7/22/2023; Home Partners Holdings LLC waiver sent on 5/23/2023, answer due 7/22/2023; OPVHHJV LLC waiver sent on 5/23/2023, answer due 7/22/2023. (Regan, Anne)
May 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Maritza Dominguez Braswell. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of Local Civ. R. 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions, and (5) pursuant to Local Civ. R. 16.6 and at the discretion of the Magistrate Judge, convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 5/23/2023. Text Only Entry. (rkeec)
May 23, 2023 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (blaws)
May 22, 2023 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge Daniel D. Domenico and drawn to Magistrate Judge Maritza Dominguez Braswell. Text Only Entry. (blaws)
May 22, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against HPA US1 LLC, Home Partners Holdings LLC, OPVHHJV LLC (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number BCODC-9114305)Attorney Anne T. Regan added to party Kelly Colbert(pty:pla), Attorney Anne T. Regan added to party Christa Curran(pty:pla), Attorney Anne T. Regan added to party Michael Curran(pty:pla), filed by Michael Curran, Kelly Colbert, Christa Curran. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons)(Regan, Anne)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Curran et al v. Home Partners Holdings LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Curran
Represented By: Anne T. Regan
Represented By: Joseph C. Bourne
Represented By: S. Michael Dunn
Represented By: Scott C. Harris
Represented By: Susan E. Ellingstad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christa Curran
Represented By: Anne T. Regan
Represented By: Joseph C. Bourne
Represented By: S. Michael Dunn
Represented By: Scott C. Harris
Represented By: Susan E. Ellingstad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly Colbert
Represented By: Anne T. Regan
Represented By: Scott C. Harris
Represented By: S. Michael Dunn
Represented By: Joseph C. Bourne
Represented By: Susan E. Ellingstad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Home Partners Holdings LLC
Represented By: Michael Fredrick Cockson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HPA US1 LLC
Represented By: Michael Fredrick Cockson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OPVHHJV LLC doing business as Pathlight Property Management
Represented By: Michael Fredrick Cockson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?