Ditto et al v. Sanofi S.A. et al
Plaintiff: Lois Y. Ditto and Charles E. Ditto
Defendant: Sanofi U.S. Services, Inc., Sanofi S.A., Aventis Pharma S.A., Sanofi-Aventis U.S., Inc. and Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC
In Re: Taxotere (Docetaxel) Products Liability Litigation
Case Number: 1:2023cv01373
Filed: May 31, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Maritza Dominguez Braswell
Referring Judge: Charlotte N Sweeney
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 31, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 31, 2023 Filing 12 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (tgall, )
May 31, 2023 Filing 11 Case assigned to Judge Charlotte N. Sweeney and drawn to Magistrate Judge Maritza Dominguez Braswell. Text Only Entry. (tgall, )
May 31, 2023 Filing 10 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry). (tgall, )
May 31, 2023 Filing 9 Case transferred in from District of Louisiana Eastern; Case Number 2:17-cv-09040. File, transfer order and docket sheet received.
May 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TRANSFER ORDER - Case transferred to District of Colorado. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 5/12/2023. (MDL 2740, Doc. 15836) (sa) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 5/31/2023.]
May 24, 2023 Filing 7 Joint Designation of Record for MDL Transfer by Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (Case Specific) (Attachments: #1 1, #2 2)(Kaufman, Christopher) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 5/31/2023.]
May 18, 2023 Filing 6 Designation of Record for MDL Transfer by All Defendants. (General) (Attachments: #1 1, #2 2, #3 3, #4 4, #5 5, #6 6, #7 7, #8 8, #9 9, #10 10, #11 11, #12 12, #13 13, #14 14, #15 15, #16 16, #17 17, #18 18, #19 19, #20 20, #21 21, #22 22, #23 23, #24 24, #25 25, #26 26, #27 27, #28 28, #29 29, #30 30, #31 31, #32 32, #33 33, #34 34, #35 35, #36 36, #37 37, #38 38, #39 39, #40 40, #41 41, #42 42, #43 43, #44 44, #45 45, #46 46, #47 47, #48 48, #49 49, #50 50, #51 51, #52 52, #53 53, #54 54, #55 55, #56 56, #57 57, #58 58, #59 59, #60 60, #61 61, #62 62, #63 63, #64 64, #65 65, #66 66, #67 67, #68 68, #69 69, #70 70, #71 71, #72 72, #73 73, #74 74, #75 75, #76 76, #77 77, #78 78, #79 79, #80 80, #81 81, #82 82, #83 83, #84 84, #85 85, #86 86, #87 87, #88 88, #89 89, #90 90, #91 91, #92 92, #93 93, #94 94, #95 95, #96 96, #97 97, #98 98, #99 99, #100 100, #101 101, #102 102, #103 103, #104 104, #105 105, #106 106, #107 107, #108 108, #109 109, #110 110, #111 111, #112 112, #113 113, #114 114, #115 115, #116 116)(Winsberg, Gabriel) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 5/31/2023.]
May 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Jane Triche Milazzo. Chief Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance.(ADI) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 5/31/2023.]
September 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PRETRIAL ORDERS. Signed by Chief Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt.(ADI) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 5/31/2023.]
September 19, 2017 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Aventis Pharma S.A., Sanofi S.A., Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (Payton, Paige) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 5/31/2023.]
September 14, 2017 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Chief Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (jeg) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 5/31/2023.]
September 14, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-6358129) filed by Lois Y. Ditto, Charles E. Ditto. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)Attorney Christopher L. Coffin added to party Charles E. Ditto(pty:pla), Attorney Christopher L. Coffin added to party Lois Y. Ditto(pty:pla).(Coffin, Christopher) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 5/31/2023.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ditto et al v. Sanofi S.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi U.S. Services, Inc.
Represented By: Adrienne L. Byard
Represented By: Cailynn D. Hayter
Represented By: Christopher J. Kaufman
Represented By: Mariham Yaft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aventis Pharma S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi-Aventis U.S., Inc.
Represented By: Adrienne L. Byard
Represented By: Cailynn D. Hayter
Represented By: Christopher J. Kaufman
Represented By: Mariham Yaft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC
Represented By: Adrienne L. Byard
Represented By: Cailynn D. Hayter
Represented By: Christopher J. Kaufman
Represented By: Mariham Yaft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lois Y. Ditto
Represented By: Jessica Ann Reynolds
Represented By: John Christopher Elliott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles E. Ditto
Represented By: Jessica Ann Reynolds
Represented By: John Christopher Elliott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Taxotere (Docetaxel) Products Liability Litigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?