Harco National Insurance Company v. Cascade Aircraft Management LLC et al
Plaintiff: Harco National Insurance Company
Defendant: Cascade Aircraft Management LLC, Leading Edge Aviation of Georgia and Michael Burke
Case Number: 1:2023cv01545
Filed: June 19, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Referring Judge: N Reid Neureiter
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 17, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 17, 2023 Filing 22 REPLY to Response to #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Supporting Memorandum of Law filed by Defendant Cascade Aircraft Management LLC. (Lee, Evan)
August 17, 2023 Filing 21 REPLY to Response to #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Supporting Memorandum of Law filed by Defendants Michael Burke, Leading Edge Aviation of Georgia. (Lampert, Bruce)
August 3, 2023 Filing 20 BRIEF in Opposition to #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Supporting Memorandum of Law filed by Plaintiff Harco National Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - CAM Wesbsite - Aircraft Builder Assistance Page, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - CAM Website - CAM News Page, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 - Douglas County Sheriff Incident Report, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4 - Evolution Website - Build and Support Centers)(Rardin, Richard)
August 3, 2023 Filing 19 BRIEF in Opposition to #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Supporting Memorandum of Law filed by Plaintiff Harco National Insurance Company. (Rardin, Richard)
July 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #17 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Supporting Memorandum of Law. Plaintiff is afforded a 14-day extension of time until August 3, 2023 to file its response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction. By District Judge Gordon P Gallagher on 7/12/2023. Text Only Entry(sdunb, )
July 11, 2023 Filing 17 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Supporting Memorandum of Law by Plaintiff Harco National Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Proposed Order)(Rardin, Richard)
July 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Supporting Memorandum of Law . Plaintiff is afforded a 14 day extension of time until August 3, 2023 to file its response to Cascade's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction. By District Judge Gordon P Gallagher on 7/7/2023. Text Only Entry(sdunb, )
July 6, 2023 Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Supporting Memorandum of Law by Plaintiff Harco National Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Proposed Order)(Rardin, Richard)
July 6, 2023 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Harco National Insurance Company. Michael Burke served on 6/19/2023, answer due 7/10/2023. (Rardin, Richard)
June 29, 2023 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Supporting Memorandum of Law by Defendants Michael Burke, Leading Edge Aviation of Georgia. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Lampert, Bruce)
June 27, 2023 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Harco National Insurance Company. Michael Burke served on 6/19/2023, answer due 7/10/2023; Leading Edge Aviation of Georgia served on 6/19/2023, answer due 7/10/2023. (Rardin, Richard)
June 27, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Richard Roy Rardin on behalf of Harco National Insurance CompanyAttorney Richard Roy Rardin added to party Harco National Insurance Company(pty:pla) (Rardin, Richard)
June 26, 2023 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Supporting Memorandum of Law by Defendant Cascade Aircraft Management LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Lee, Evan)
June 21, 2023 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of Service by mail by Clerk of Court re #8 Order, to Richard Rardin, Cozen O'Connor PC, 707 17th Street, Suite 3100, Denver CO 80202. Text Only Entry (cmadr, )
June 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 20 June 2023. Proposed Scheduling Order due 9/19/2023. Scheduling Conference set for 9/26/2023 11:30 AM in Courtroom C203 before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. The Scheduling Conference will be conducted via telephone. The parties are directed to call the conference line as a participant at (888) 398-2342, Access Code 5755390# at the scheduled time. (cmadr, )
June 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other specifically-referred motions, and (4) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. By District Judge Gordon P Gallagher on 6/20/2023. Text Only Entry (sdunb, )
June 19, 2023 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (blaws)
June 19, 2023 Filing 5 Case assigned to District Judge Gordon P Gallagher and drawn to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Text Only Entry. (blaws)
June 19, 2023 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Complaint, Summons upon Cascade Aircraft Management on 05/18/2023. (blaws)
June 19, 2023 Filing 3 STATE COURT COMPLAINT against Michael Burke, Cascade Aircraft Management LLC, Leading Edge Aviation of Georgia, filed by Harco National Insurance Company. (blaws)
June 19, 2023 Filing 2 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (blaws)
June 19, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Cascade Aircraft Management LLC from Douglas County District Court, Case Number 2023CV030365. (Filing fee $ 402, Receipt Number ACODC-9156693), filed by Cascade Aircraft Management LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit 1 Complaint, #4 Exhibit 2 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Exhibit 3 Summons to Cascade, #6 Exhibit 4 Summons to Leading Edge, #7 Exhibit 5 Summons to Burke, #8 Exhibit 6 Delay Reduction Order, #9 Exhibit 7 Summons to Leading Edge, #10 Exhibit 8 Return of Service Cascade, #11 Exhibit 9 Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #12 Exhibit 10 Register of Actions, #13 Exhibit 11 Consent to Removal)(Lee, Evan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harco National Insurance Company v. Cascade Aircraft Management LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harco National Insurance Company
Represented By: Richard Roy Rardin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cascade Aircraft Management LLC
Represented By: Evan P. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leading Edge Aviation of Georgia
Represented By: Bruce A. Lampert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Burke
Represented By: Bruce A. Lampert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?