Jones v. PDC Energy, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Brian Jones
Defendant: PDC Energy, Inc., Mark E. Ellis, Barton R. Brookman, Pamela R. Butcher, Paul J. Korus, Lynn A. Peterson, Carlos A. Sabater and Diana L. Sands
Case Number: 1:2023cv01726
Filed: July 7, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: S Kato Crews
Referring Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Securities, Commodities, Exchange
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 78 Securities Exchange Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 8, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2023 Filing 15 Civil Case Terminated pursuant to the #14 notice of voluntary dismissal filed in this case. Text Only Entry (schap, )
August 8, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Case by Plaintiff Brian Jones (Acocelli, Richard)
July 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER. Based on Plaintiff's #12 Notice, the #2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction is withdrawn. Given the nature of the action, it is unclear what further litigation the parties intend to engage in with regard to this matterif any. Therefore, within thirty (30) days, the parties SHALL jointly update the Court as to any need for further litigation and outline the litigation plan moving forward. So Ordered by District Judge Gordon P Gallagher on 7/25/2023. Text Only Entry (schap, )
July 24, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE re #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION to Expedite MOTION for Discovery Notice of Withdrawal of Motion by Plaintiff Brian Jones (Acocelli, Richard)
July 18, 2023 Filing 11 LETTER re: 9 Order,,,, by Plaintiff Brian Jones. (Acocelli, Richard)
July 14, 2023 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Brian Jones. Barton R. Brookman waiver sent on 7/12/2023, answer due 9/11/2023; Pamela R. Butcher waiver sent on 7/12/2023, answer due 9/11/2023; Mark E. Ellis waiver sent on 7/12/2023, answer due 9/11/2023; Paul J. Korus waiver sent on 7/12/2023, answer due 9/11/2023; PDC Energy, Inc. waiver sent on 7/12/2023, answer due 9/11/2023; Lynn A. Peterson waiver sent on 7/12/2023, answer due 9/11/2023; Carlos A. Sabater waiver sent on 7/12/2023, answer due 9/11/2023; Diana L. Sands waiver sent on 7/12/2023, answer due 9/11/2023. (Acocelli, Richard)
July 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE OF COMPLAINT, SUMMONS, AND OTHER DOCUMENTS; ORDER REGARDING HEARING; ORDER SETTING BRIEFING DEADLINES. It is ordered that Plaintiff serve the following on Defendants no later than Monday, July 17, 2023: the Complaint (D. #1 ), Summons (D. #5 ), Plaintiff's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction and Expedited Discovery and Proceedings (D. #2 ), Plaintiff's Memorandum of Law in Support of His Motion for a Preliminary Injunction and Expedited Discovery and Proceedings (D. #4 ), Declaration of Richard A. Acocelli in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction and Expedited Discovery and Proceedings (D. #6 ), and this Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that no later than Friday, July 21, 2023, the parties SHALL jointly contact the Court's Chambers in Grand Junction via email at Gallagher_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov to set a NON-EVIDENTIARY HEARING in this matter. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants file their opposition, if any, to Plaintiff's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction and Expedited Discovery and Proceedings (D. #2 ) no later than Monday, July 24, 2023. By District Judge Gordon P Gallagher on 7/11/2023. Text Only Entry (sdunb, )
July 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other specifically-referred motions, and (4) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. By District Judge Gordon P Gallagher on 7/10/2023. Text Only Entry (sdunb, )
July 7, 2023 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE by Senior Judge Blackburn. This case is randomly reassigned to District Judge Gordon P Gallagher and drawn to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. All future pleadings should be designated as 23-cv-01726-GPG. (athom, )
July 7, 2023 Filing 6 DECLARATION of Richard A. Acocelli regarding MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION to Expedite MOTION for Discovery #2 by Plaintiff Brian Jones. (Acocelli, Richard)
July 7, 2023 Filing 5 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (tgall, )
July 7, 2023 Filing 4 BRIEF in Support of #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION to Expedite MOTION for Discovery filed by Plaintiff Brian Jones. (Acocelli, Richard)
July 7, 2023 Filing 3 Case assigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn and drawn to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Text Only Entry. (tgall, )
July 7, 2023 Filing 2 WITHDRAWN MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , MOTION to Expedite , MOTION for Discovery by Plaintiff Brian Jones. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only), #2 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Acocelli, Richard) Modified on 7/25/2023 to withdraw pursuant to the 13 Order (schap, ).
July 7, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Barton R. Brookman, Pamela R. Butcher, Mark E. Ellis, Paul J. Korus, PDC Energy, Inc., Lynn A. Peterson, Carlos A. Sabater, Diana L. Sands (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number ACODC-9185110)Attorney Richard Adam Acocelli added to party Brian Jones(pty:pla), filed by Brian Jones. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Acocelli, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. PDC Energy, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Jones
Represented By: Richard Adam Acocelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PDC Energy, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark E. Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barton R. Brookman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pamela R. Butcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul J. Korus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynn A. Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carlos A. Sabater
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diana L. Sands
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?