Ragab v. Ispace, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Mohamed Ragab
Defendant: Ispace, Inc., Ispace Technologies U.S., Inc, Takeshi Hakamada, Jumpei Nozaki, Ryo Ujiie and ispace Technologies U.S., inc.
Case Number: 1:2023cv01789
Filed: July 13, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Robert E Blackburn
Referring Judge: Scott T Varholak
2 Judge: Nina Y Wang
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 5, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2023 Filing 20 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendants Takeshi Hakamada, Jumpei Nozaki, Ryo Ujiie, ispace Technologies U.S., inc., ispace, inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration_of_Ronald_Garan, #2 Exhibit 2 - Employment Agreement_7_26_2016, #3 Exhibit 3 - Employment_Agreement_1_30_2019, #4 Exhibit 4 - 1st Stock Option Agreement, #5 Exhibit 5 - 3rd Stock Option Agreement)(Hofmann, Michael)
August 22, 2023 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mohamed Ragab. Ryo Ujiie served on 8/14/2023, answer due 9/5/2023. (Waechter, Kaylea)
August 22, 2023 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mohamed Ragab. Jumpei Nozaki served on 8/14/2023, answer due 9/5/2023. (Waechter, Kaylea)
August 22, 2023 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mohamed Ragab. ispace Technologies U.S., inc. served on 8/14/2023, answer due 9/5/2023. (Waechter, Kaylea)
August 22, 2023 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mohamed Ragab. ispace, inc. served on 8/14/2023, answer due 9/5/2023. (Waechter, Kaylea)
August 22, 2023 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mohamed Ragab. Takeshi Hakamada served on 8/14/2023, answer due 9/5/2023. (Waechter, Kaylea)
August 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER This matter is before the Court upon review of #13 Amended Complaint and the docket. A Status Conference is set for 10/12/2023 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 8/11/2023. Text Only Entry (stvlc4, )
August 10, 2023 Filing 13 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Mohamed Ragab.(Waechter, Kaylea)
July 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. On or before August 10, 2023, Plaintiff shall either show cause, if any there be, in writing, why this case should not be dismissed due to the Court's lack of subject matter jurisdiction, or submit an amended complaint that adequately alleges this Court's jurisdiction. By Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 7/20/2023. (trvo, )
July 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REFERRING CASE: This case is referred to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak for non-dispositive matters. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, and (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions. Court-sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the request of the parties by motion, this Court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. Alternatively, the Magistrate Judge, at his discretion, may convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. Counsel for the Parties and all counsel who may later enter an appearance shall review and familiarize themselves with the undersigned's Practice Standards, as well as the Practice Standards of the assigned Magistrate Judge. By Judge Nina Y. Wang on 07/14/2023. Text Only Entry (nywlc5, )
July 14, 2023 Filing 10 SUMMONSES issued by Clerk. (athom, )
July 14, 2023 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE by Senior Judge Blackburn. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Nina Y. Wang and drawn to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. All future pleadings should be designated as 23-cv-01789-NYW. (athom, )
July 14, 2023 Filing 8 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Ryo Ujiie by Plaintiff Mohamed Ragab. (Waechter, Kaylea)
July 14, 2023 Filing 7 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Jumpei Nozaki by Plaintiff Mohamed Ragab. (Waechter, Kaylea)
July 14, 2023 Filing 6 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Takeshi Hakamada by Plaintiff Mohamed Ragab. (Waechter, Kaylea)
July 14, 2023 Filing 5 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Ispace Technologies U.S., Inc. by Plaintiff Mohamed Ragab. (Waechter, Kaylea)
July 14, 2023 Filing 4 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Ispace, Inc. by Plaintiff Mohamed Ragab. (Waechter, Kaylea)
July 13, 2023 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). Summons Not Issued. Attorneys Cannot Issue Summons. Use form AO 440, which can be found on our website http://www.cod.uscourts.gov/CourtOperations/RulesProcedures/Forms.aspx. When Requesting the Clerk to Issue Summons, Please use the "SUMMONS REQUEST" Event type. (norlin, )
July 13, 2023 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn and drawn to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Text Only Entry (norlin, )
July 13, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number ACODC-9195783)Attorney Kaylea A. Waechter added to party Mohamed Ragab(pty:pla), filed by Mohamed Ragab. (Attachments: #1 Summons Ispace Inc, #2 Summons Ispace Technologies U.S. Inc, #3 Summons Takeshi Hakamada, #4 Summons Jumpei Nozaki, #5 Summons Ryo Ujiie, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Waechter, Kaylea)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ragab v. Ispace, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mohamed Ragab
Represented By: Kaylea A. Waechter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ispace, Inc.
Represented By: Michael James Hofmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ispace Technologies U.S., Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Takeshi Hakamada
Represented By: Michael James Hofmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jumpei Nozaki
Represented By: Michael James Hofmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryo Ujiie
Represented By: Michael James Hofmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ispace Technologies U.S., inc.
Represented By: Michael James Hofmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?