GS Holistic, LLC v. Abdul Qader Qurban Inc. et al
Plaintiff: GS Holistic, LLC
Defendant: Abdul Qader Qurban Inc. doing business as Smoke Tokes #2 and Abdul Qader Asib
Case Number: 1:2023cv01929
Filed: July 28, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: N Reid Neureiter
Referring Judge: Regina M Rodriguez
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1114 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 22, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 22, 2023 Filing 16 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Additional Counsel Peter Ticktin by Peter David Ticktin on behalf of GS Holistic, LLCAttorney Peter David Ticktin added to party GS Holistic, LLC(pty:pla) (Ticktin, Peter)
September 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER. This case is set for a Show Cause Hearing on September 26, 2023 at 2:30 p.m. Only Plaintiff's counsel and business representative are required to attend in person. Other interested parties and individuals may listen to and/or participate in the hearing by calling the conference line as a participant at (888) 398-2342, Access Code 5755390# five minutes prior to the scheduled time. There is to be no recording of the proceedings; however, a transcript can be ordered after the fact. If the court learns that any recordings have been made, the recording party may be subject to contempt of court. By Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on September 21, 2023. Text Only Entry (rvill, )
September 8, 2023 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by GS Holistic, LLC. Abdul Qader Asib served on 8/4/2023, answer due 8/25/2023. (Gilbertson, Christina)
September 8, 2023 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by GS Holistic, LLC. Abdul Qader Qurban Inc. served on 8/4/2023, answer due 8/25/2023. (Gilbertson, Christina)
August 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 22 August 2023. Plaintiff's counsel and a business representative of the Plaintiff shall appear in person on September 26, 2023 at 2:30 p.m. to SHOW CAUSE why a general order should not be issued in each of these near-identical trademark/unfair competition cases staying the cases pending submission of verification that Plaintiff or its counsel has engaged in meaningful, in person, negotiation with each defendant and that those efforts at negotiation have failed. (cmadr, )
August 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of Local Civ. R. 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions, and (5) pursuant to Local Civ. R. 16.6 and at the discretion of the Magistrate Judge, convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. SO ORDERED by Judge Regina M. Rodriguez on 8/14/2023. Text Only Entry (rmrja)
August 11, 2023 Filing 10 Case Reassigned. In accordance with D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(d)(4)(B) and the approval of the Chief Judge, this case is reassigned to Judge Regina M. Rodriguez, and to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. All future pleadings should be designated as 23-cv-01929-RMR-NRN. (Text Only Entry) (agarc, )
August 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REFERRING CASE to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other specifically-referred motions, and (4) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. By District Judge Gordon P Gallagher on 8/1/2023. Text Only Entry (schap, )
August 1, 2023 Filing 8 CASE REASSIGNED. This case was originally assigned incorrectly and has therefore been randomly reassigned to Judge Gordon P Gallagher and drawn to Magistrate Judge Maritza Dominguez Braswell. All future pleadings should be designated as 1:23-cv-01929-GPG. (Text only entry.) (norlin, )
August 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews for non-dispositive matters. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of Local Civ. R. 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) pursuant to Local Civ. R. 16.6 and at the discretion of the Magistrate Judge, convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. By Judge Charlotte N. Sweeney on 8/1/23. Text Only Entry (jdyne)
July 31, 2023 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE by Senior Judge Blackburn. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Charlotte N. Sweeney and drawn to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. All future pleadings should be designated as 23-cv-01929-CNS. (athom, )
July 28, 2023 Filing 5 Report re Copyright: Report on the filing of an action emailed separately to the Director of the Copyright Office. (norlin, )
July 28, 2023 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (norlin, )
July 28, 2023 Filing 3 Case assigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn and drawn to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Text Only Entry (norlin, )
July 28, 2023 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Gilbertson, Christina)
July 28, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ABDUL QADER QURBAN INC., ABDUL QADER ASIB (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number ACODC-9220517)Attorney Christina Gilbertson added to party GS Holistic, LLC(pty:pla), filed by GS Holistic, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Preliminary Record AO 120 Report, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Gilbertson, Christina)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GS Holistic, LLC v. Abdul Qader Qurban Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GS Holistic, LLC
Represented By: Peter David Ticktin
Represented By: Christina Gilbertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abdul Qader Qurban Inc. doing business as Smoke Tokes #2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abdul Qader Asib
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?