GS Holistic, LLC v. Alphastar Vapes, Ltd et al
Plaintiff: GS Holistic, LLC
Defendant: Alphastar Vapes Ltd doing business as Alphastar Vapes Ltd and Jimmy O. Vargas
Case Number: 1:2023cv01930
Filed: July 28, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: N Reid Neureiter
Referring Judge: Regina M Rodriguez
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1114 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 22, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 22, 2023 Filing 20 DECLARATION of of Chris Folkerts by Plaintiff GS Holistic, LLC. (Ticktin, Peter)
September 22, 2023 Filing 19 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Additional Counsel Peter Ticktin by Peter David Ticktin on behalf of GS Holistic, LLCAttorney Peter David Ticktin added to party GS Holistic, LLC(pty:pla) (Ticktin, Peter)
September 21, 2023 Filing 18 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES: Peter Ticktin. Attorney or pro se has used an incorrect signature format in violation of D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 4.3(a) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases). REFILE THE DOCUMENT, Using the correct Event Type "Notice of Entry of Appearance" Further, The filer must affix a complete electronic s/signature to the pleading as well as a complete and updated address block. (norlin, )
September 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MINUTE ORDER. This case is set for a Show Cause Hearing on September 26, 2023 at 2:30 p.m. Only Plaintiff's counsel and business representative are required to attend in person. Other interested parties and individuals may listen to and/or participate in the hearing by calling the conference line as a participant at (888) 398-2342, Access Code 5755390# five minutes prior to the scheduled time. There is to be no recording of the proceedings; however, a transcript can be ordered after the fact. If the court learns that any recordings have been made, the recording party may be subject to contempt of court. By Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on September 21, 2023. Text Only Entry (rvill, )
September 19, 2023 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance of Additional Counsel Peter Ticktin by Plaintiff GS Holistic, LLC (Ticktin, Peter)
September 8, 2023 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by GS Holistic, LLC. Jimmy O. Vargas served on 8/4/2023, answer due 8/25/2023. (Gilbertson, Christina)
September 8, 2023 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by GS Holistic, LLC. Alphastar Vapes Ltd served on 8/4/2023, answer due 8/25/2023. (Gilbertson, Christina)
August 25, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jennifer M. McCallum on behalf of All Defendants Attorney Jennifer M. McCallum added to party Alphastar Vapes Ltd(pty:dft), Attorney Jennifer M. McCallum added to party Jimmy O. Vargas(pty:dft) (McCallum, Jennifer)
August 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 22 August 2023. Plaintiff's counsel and a business representative of the Plaintiff shall appear in person on September 26, 2023 at 2:30 p.m. to SHOW CAUSE why a general order should not be issued in each of these near-identical trademark/unfair competition cases staying the cases pending submission of verification that Plaintiff or its counsel has engaged in meaningful, in person, negotiation with each defendant and that those efforts at negotiation have failed. (cmadr, )
August 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER. Given the reassignment of this case to District Judge Rodriguez and Magistrate Judge Neureiter, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Scheduling Conference set for November 2, 2023, before Magistrate Judge Starnella and the October 26, 2023 deadline to file a Proposed Scheduling Order are VACATED. by Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella on 8/15/2023. Text Only Entry (kaslc2, )
August 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of Local Civ. R. 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions, and (5) pursuant to Local Civ. R. 16.6 and at the discretion of the Magistrate Judge, convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. SO ORDERED by Judge Regina M. Rodriguez on 8/14/2023. Text Only Entry (rmrja)
August 11, 2023 Filing 9 Case Reassigned. In accordance with D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(d)(4)(B) and the approval of the Chief Judge, this case is reassigned to Judge Regina M. Rodriguez, and drawn to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. All future pleadings should be designated as 23-cv-01930-RMR-NRN. (Text Only Entry) (agarc, )
August 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 REASSIGNING MAGISTRATE JUDGE. This action is reassigned to Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella upon her appointment. All future pleadings should reference Magistrate Judge Starnella at the beginning of the civil action number (such as 23-cv-01930-KAS). Unless otherwise ordered, the dates and times for all previously scheduled matters will be maintained and will now be handled by Magistrate Judge Starnella in Courtroom C-204. Her chambers are located in Room C-253 of the Byron G. Rogers Courthouse. Her telephone number is 303-335-2770. (Text only entry) (agarc, )
August 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 3 August 2023. Proposed Scheduling Order due 10/26/2023. Scheduling Conference set for 11/2/2023 10:00 AM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. (Attachments: #1 Continuation of Main Document, #2 Continuation of Main Document) (cmadr, )
August 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER. Pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(c)(4), the deadline to file the Consent/Non-Consent to United States Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form [#4-2] is October 19, 2023. by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 8/3/2023. Text Only Entry (klmlc2, )
July 28, 2023 Filing 5 Report re Copyright: Report on the filing of an action emailed separately to the Director of the Copyright Office. (norlin, )
July 28, 2023 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (norlin, )
July 28, 2023 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Text Only Entry (norlin, )
July 28, 2023 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Gilbertson, Christina)
July 28, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ALPHASTAR VAPES LTD, JIMMY O. VARGAS (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number ACODC-9220651)Attorney Christina Gilbertson added to party GS Holistic, LLC(pty:pla), filed by GS Holistic, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Preliminary Record AO 120 Report, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Gilbertson, Christina)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GS Holistic, LLC v. Alphastar Vapes, Ltd et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GS Holistic, LLC
Represented By: Peter David Ticktin
Represented By: Christina Gilbertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alphastar Vapes Ltd doing business as Alphastar Vapes Ltd
Represented By: Jennifer M. McCallum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jimmy O. Vargas
Represented By: Jennifer M. McCallum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?