Colorado Republican Party v. Griswold
Plaintiff: Colorado Republican Party
Defendant: Secretary of State Jena Griswold and Jena Griswold
Case Number: 1:2023cv01948
Filed: July 31, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Philip A Brimmer
Referring Judge: Kathryn A Starnella
Nature of Suit: Constitutionality of State Statutes
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 2, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2023 Filing 24 RESPONSE to #21 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint, Response to Motion for 21-day Enlargement filed by Plaintiff Colorado Republican Party. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration)(Chambers, D.)
September 27, 2023 Filing 23 MEMORANDUM regarding #21 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint, filed by Jena Griswold. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella, by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 9/27/2023. Text Only Entry (pabsec, )
September 27, 2023 Filing 22 Exhibits in Support of #21 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint, by Defendant Jena Griswold. (Holter, Kyle)
September 27, 2023 Filing 21 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint, by Defendant Jena Griswold. (Holter, Kyle)
September 14, 2023 Filing 20 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Kyle M. Holter on behalf of Jena GriswoldAttorney Kyle M. Holter added to party Jena Griswold(pty:dft) (Holter, Kyle)
August 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella on 22 August 2023. Proposed Scheduling Order due 10/26/2023. Scheduling Conference set for 11/2/2023 10:30 AM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella. (Attachments: #1 Continuation of Main Document, #2 Continuation of Main Document) (cmadr, )
August 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella for non-dispositive matters. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, and (4) conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding, by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 8/15/2023. Text Only Entry (pabsec, )
August 15, 2023 Filing 17 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #16 Order. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer and drawn to Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella. All future pleadings should be designated as 23-cv-01948-PAB. (Text Only Entry) (cmadr, )
August 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella on 14 August 2023. This matter is before the Court on Plaintiff's Consent/Non-Consent to the Exercise of Jurisdiction by a United States Magistrate Judge in Direct Assignment Cases #15 . IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this case shall be assigned to a District Judge under D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(c)(8) D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(a). (cmadr, )
August 12, 2023 Filing 15 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Colorado Republican Party All parties do not consent.. (Eastman, John)
August 7, 2023 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jena Griswold. Jena Griswold waiver sent on 8/3/2023, answer due 10/2/2023. (Sullivan, Grant)
August 7, 2023 Filing 13 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (sphil, )
August 7, 2023 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE by Senior Judge Robert E. Blackburn. This case is randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella for all further proceedings. All future pleadings should be designated as 23-cv-01948-KAS . (sphil, )
August 4, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Randy Blair Corporon on behalf of Colorado Republican PartyAttorney Randy Blair Corporon added to party Colorado Republican Party(pty:pla) (Corporon, Randy)
August 3, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by D. Beth Chambers on behalf of Colorado Republican PartyAttorney D. Beth Chambers added to party Colorado Republican Party(pty:pla) (Chambers, D.)
August 2, 2023 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of Mailing/Service re #8 Response to Notice of Related Case by Plaintiff Colorado Republican Party. (Eastman, John)
August 2, 2023 Filing 8 RESPONSE to #6 Notice (Other) by Plaintiff Colorado Republican Party. (Eastman, John)
August 2, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Anthony T Caso on behalf of Colorado Republican PartyAttorney Anthony T Caso added to party Colorado Republican Party(pty:pla) (Caso, Anthony)
August 2, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE of Related Case by Defendant Jena Griswold (Sullivan, Grant)
August 2, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Emily B. Buckley on behalf of Jena GriswoldAttorney Emily B. Buckley added to party Jena Griswold(pty:dft) (Buckley, Emily)
August 2, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Grant T. Sullivan on behalf of Jena GriswoldAttorney Grant T. Sullivan added to party Jena Griswold(pty:dft) (Sullivan, Grant)
August 1, 2023 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (efoga, )
July 31, 2023 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn and drawn to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Text Only Entry (efoga, )
July 31, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against Colorado Republican Party (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number BCODC-9224030)Attorney John C. Eastman added to party Colorado Republican Party(pty:pla), filed by Colorado Republican Party. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summons)(Eastman, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Colorado Republican Party v. Griswold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Colorado Republican Party
Represented By: John C. Eastman
Represented By: Anthony T Caso
Represented By: D. Beth Chambers
Represented By: Randy Blair Corporon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary of State Jena Griswold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jena Griswold
Represented By: Kyle M. Holter
Represented By: Emily B. Buckley
Represented By: Grant T. Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?