Doro-on v. Saffen
Plaintiff: Anna Doro-on
Defendant: Franklin R. Saffen
Interested Party: USA
Case Number: 1:2023cv02038
Filed: August 10, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Daniel D Domenico
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 as - Fed. Question - Assault, Libel, Slander
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 3, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2023 Filing 24 RESPONSE to #23 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Interested Party USA. (Leneis, Brad)
September 18, 2023 Filing 23 MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice by Plaintiff Anna Doro-on. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only), #2 Proof of Service, #3 Proof of Service - Receipt)(cmadr, )
September 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER REFERRING MOTIONS: #16 MOTION for Default Judgment; AND #15 MOTION to Substitute Party filed by USA.Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 9/14/2023. Text Only Entry (dddlc3, )
September 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 14 September 2023. This matter comes before the Court sua sponte. The Complaint filed by the Plaintiff on August 10, 2023 (ECF #1 ) is stricken as improper and for failure to comply with Court instructions. Plaintiff shall file an Amended Complaint on or before September 25, 2023. It is further ORDERED that Plaintiff shall also file a response to the Motion to Substitute on or before September 25, 2023. (cmadr, )
September 14, 2023 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE of Service by mail by Clerk of Court re 17 Minute Order and 18 Order on Motion for Default Judgment to Anna Doro-on PO Box 729 Lake George, CO 80827. Text Only Entry (cmadr, )
September 14, 2023 Filing 19 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to 17 Minute Order. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Daniel D. Domenico and drawn to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. All future pleadings should be designated as 23-cv-02038-DDD. (Text Only Entry) (cmadr, )
September 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER finding as moot #13 Motion for Default Judgment, Plaintiff having subsequently filed a separate reformatted motion at ECF 16. Entered by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 9/14/23. Text Only Entry(mehlc4, )
September 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to the form declining consent under D.C. Colo. LCivR 40.1(c) at ECF 7, the Court directs the Clerk of Court to reassign this case under D.C. Colo. LCivR 40.1(a). This Court may continue on the case to hear matters referred by the district judge under 28 U.S.C. 636(b), Fed. R. Civ. P. 72 and D.C. Colo. LCivR 72.1(c). Entered by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 9/14/23. Text Only Entry (mehlc4, )
September 13, 2023 Filing 15 MOTION to Substitute Party by Defendant United States. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Franklin Saffen, #2 Exhibit US Attorney Certification)(Leneis, Brad)
September 13, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Brad E. Leneis on behalf of United StatesAttorney Brad E. Leneis added to party United States(pty:dft) (Leneis, Brad)
September 12, 2023 Filing 16 MOTION for Default Judgment by Plaintiff Anna Doro-on. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only), #2 Declaration, #3 Proof of Service, #4 Certified Mail Receipt, #5 Attachment, #6 Exhibit Cover Page, #7 Exhibit A, #8 Exhibit B, #9 Exhibit C, #10 Exhibit D, #11 Exhibit E)(cmadr, )
September 11, 2023 Filing 13 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Franklin R. Saffen by Plaintiff Anna Doro-on. (cmadr, )
September 11, 2023 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTE REGARDING DEFAULT, re: #11 Request to Enter Default. Default will not be entered as to Franklin R. Saffen. Default has already been entered as to defendant. See ECF 10 . Text Only Entry. (jtorr, )
September 7, 2023 Filing 10 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Franklin R. Saffen. Text Only Entry. (jtorr, )
September 6, 2023 Filing 11 REQUEST to Enter Default by Plaintiff Anna Doro-on. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Support, #2 Return of Service, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Continuation of Main Document, #7 Proof of Service, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(jtorr, )
September 5, 2023 Filing 9 REQUEST to Enter Default by Plaintiff Anna Doro-on. (Attachments: #1 Continuation of Main Document)(jtorr, )
September 5, 2023 Filing 8 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Anna Doro-on. (jtorr, )
September 5, 2023 Filing 7 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Anna Doro-on. Plaintiff does not consent. (jtorr, )
August 21, 2023 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed Franklin R. Saffen served on 8/14/2023, answer due 9/5/2023. (cmadr, )
August 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 8/14/2023. Magistrate Judge Consent Form due 10/3/2023. Proposed Scheduling Order due 10/6/2023. Scheduling Conference set for 10/16/2023 at 11:45 a.m. in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. (jtorr, )
August 10, 2023 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued Over Counter by Clerk. (jcharl, )
August 10, 2023 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (jcharl, )
August 10, 2023 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Text Only Entry. (jcharl, )
August 10, 2023 Filing 1 STRICKENCOMPLAINT against Franklin R. Saffen Filing Fee: $402.00 Receipt Number:107854, filed by Anna Doro-on. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jcharl, ) Modified pursuant to ECF #21 on 9/14/2023 (cmadr, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doro-on v. Saffen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anna Doro-on
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Franklin R. Saffen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: USA
Represented By: Brad E. Leneis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?