Crafts Outlet, Inc., The v. Crafts Online Outlet, Inc, The et al
Plaintiff: The Crafts Outlet, Inc. and Crafts Outlet, Inc., The
Defendant: The Crafts Online Outlet, Inc, Tommie Gomez, Jason Gomez and Crafts Online Outlet, Inc, The
Case Number: 1:2023cv02278
Filed: September 6, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Philip A Brimmer
Referring Judge: Kathryn A Starnella
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1121 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 3, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella for non-dispositive matters. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, and (4) conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding, by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 11/3/2023. Text Only Entry
November 2, 2023 Filing 20 CASE REASSIGNED. pursuant to #19 Minute Order.All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer. All future pleadings should be designated as 23-cv-02278-PAB. (Text Only Entry) (norlin, )
November 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MINUTE ORDER This matter is before the Court on the Election Concerning Consent/Non- Consent to United States Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction [#18] (the Consent/Non- Consent Form). This case was assigned to a United States Magistrate Judge pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(c). The signed Consent-Non-Consent Form [#18] indicates that at least one party has declined to consent. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this case shall be assigned to a District Judge under D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(c)(8) and D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(a).Entered by Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella on 11/2/2023. (norlin, ) Modified on 11/3/2023 to correct filing date (norlin, ).
November 2, 2023 Filing 18 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Crafts Outlet, Inc., The All parties do not consent.. (Harvill, Allison)
November 1, 2023 Filing 17 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Jason Gomez, Tommie Gomez.(DeVine, Angela)
October 26, 2023 Filing 16 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Allison Joelle Harvill on behalf of Crafts Outlet, Inc., TheAttorney Allison Joelle Harvill added to party Crafts Outlet, Inc., The(pty:pla) (Harvill, Allison)
October 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 PRE-SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella on 24 October 2023. (cmadr, )
October 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella on 3 October 2023. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading #13 is GRANTED. Defendants Tommie and Jason Gomez have up to and including November 2, 2023, to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint #1 .(cmadr, )
September 29, 2023 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint, by Defendants Jason Gomez, Tommie Gomez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Fraudulent Business Filing Complaint)(DeVine, Angela)
September 29, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Angela Deborah DeVine on behalf of Jason Gomez, Tommie GomezAttorney Angela Deborah DeVine added to party Jason Gomez(pty:dft), Attorney Angela Deborah DeVine added to party Tommie Gomez(pty:dft) (DeVine, Angela)
September 27, 2023 Filing 11 Report re Patent/Trademark: Report on the filing of an action emailed (NEF) to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Refiled version of ECF #6 to ensure proper noticing.) (cmadr, )
September 25, 2023 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Biller, Anthony)
September 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella on 11 September 2023. Proposed Scheduling Order due 11/9/2023. Scheduling Conference set for 11/16/2023 10:30 AM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella. (Attachments: #1 Continuation of Main Document, #2 Continuation of Main Document) (cmadr, )
September 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER. Pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(c)(4), the deadline to file the Consent/Non-Consent to United States Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form [#4-3] is November 2, 2023. by Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella on 9/11/2023. Text Only Entry (kaslc2, )
September 11, 2023 Filing 7 CASE REASSIGNED. This case was originally assigned incorrectly, therefore has been randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella. All future pleadings should be designated as 23-cv-2278-KAS. (Text only entry.) (efoga, )
September 7, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE re #1 Complaint, Report on the Filing of an Action Regarding a Trademark by Plaintiff The Crafts Outlet, Inc. (Biller, Anthony)
September 7, 2023 Filing 5 Exhibits in Support of #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff The Crafts Outlet, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A :www.the-crafts-outlet.com, #2 Exhibit B: 'Amazon.com_ 144pc Flatback Acrylic Rhinestones Round 5mm - 21ss Jet Black' - www.amazon.com, #3 Exhibit C: 85574530 US Registration, #4 Exhibit D: Supp regisration, #5 Exhibit E: Registration Certificate Canada, #6 Exhibit F: www.thecraftsonlineoutlet.com)(Biller, Anthony)
September 7, 2023 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (efoga, )
September 6, 2023 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Maritza Dominguez Braswell. Text Only Entry (efoga, )
September 6, 2023 Filing 2 Administrative Notice: Notice to filer of non-compliance with Patent, Trademark, or Copyright Action case opening procedures. It is the responsibility of the attorney or pro se party commencing the action to follow Local Rule D.C.COLO.LCivR 3.1. Please file a properly completed Report form, which can be found on the courts website. (efoga, )
September 6, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jason Gomez, Tommie Gomez, The Crafts Online Outlet, Inc (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number ACODC-9280164)Attorney Anthony Joseph Biller added to party The Crafts Outlet, Inc.(pty:pla), filed by The Crafts Outlet, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet, #2 Summons The Crafts Online Outlet, #3 Summons Tommie Gomez, #4 Summons Jason Gomez)(Biller, Anthony)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crafts Outlet, Inc., The v. Crafts Online Outlet, Inc, The et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Crafts Outlet, Inc.
Represented By: Anthony Joseph Biller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crafts Outlet, Inc., The
Represented By: Allison Joelle Harvill
Represented By: Anthony Joseph Biller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Crafts Online Outlet, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tommie Gomez
Represented By: Angela Deborah DeVine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Gomez
Represented By: Angela Deborah DeVine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crafts Online Outlet, Inc, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?