Anderson et al v. Griswold et al
Petitioner: Norma Anderson, Michelle Priola, Claudine Cmarada, Krista Kafer, Kathi Wright and Christopher Castilian
Respondent: Secretary of State Jena Griswold and Donald J. Trump
Intervenor: Colorado Republican State Central Committee
Case Number: 1:2023cv02291
Filed: September 7, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Philip A Brimmer
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 va - Fed. Question: Violation 5th & 14th Amendments
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 12, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2023 Filing 31 Civil Case Terminated pursuant to the #29 Order filed in this case on 9/12/2023. Text Only Entry. (trvo, )
September 12, 2023 Filing 30 CERTIFICATE of Service by E-Mail by Clerk of Court re #29 Order to the Denver County District Court at nikolaus.zender@judicial.state.co.us, jennifer.rollins@judicial.state.co.us, jennifer.nichols@judicial.state.co.us, and 02Sups@judicial.state.co.us. (trvo, )
September 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 9/12/2023, re: #15 Petitioners' Unopposed Motion to Remand and #16 Petitioners' Unopposed Motion for Expedited Consideration of Motion to Remand are GRANTED. ORDERED that this case is remanded to the District Court for Denver County, Colorado, where it was filed as Case No. 2023CV032577. ORDERED that this case is closed.(trvo, )
September 12, 2023 Filing 28 RESPONSE to #15 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Respondent Donald J. Trump. (Gessler, Scott)
September 12, 2023 Filing 27 RESPONSE to #15 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Respondent Jena Griswold. (Kotlarczyk, Michael)
September 12, 2023 Filing 26 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Michael T. Kotlarczyk on behalf of Jena GriswoldAttorney Michael T. Kotlarczyk added to party Jena Griswold(pty:res) (Kotlarczyk, Michael)
September 11, 2023 Filing 25 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Michael William Melito on behalf of Colorado Republican State Central CommitteeAttorney Michael William Melito added to party Colorado Republican State Central Committee(pty:intv) (Melito, Michael)
September 11, 2023 Filing 24 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance Robert Kitsmiller by Robert Alan Kitsmiller on behalf of Colorado Republican State Central Committee (Kitsmiller, Robert)
September 11, 2023 Filing 23 Motion to Intervene filed by Colorado Republican State Central Committee. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Complaint in Intervention, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kitsmiller, Robert) Modified on 9/12/2023 to edit event type per phone call from Attorney. (sphil, ).
September 11, 2023 Filing 22 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Donald K. Sherman on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Sherman, Donald)
September 11, 2023 Filing 21 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jonathan E. Maier on behalf of Norma Anderson, Christopher Castilian, Claudine Cmarada, Krista Kafer, Michelle Priola, Kathi WrightAttorney Jonathan E. Maier added to party Norma Anderson(pty:pet), Attorney Jonathan E. Maier added to party Christopher Castilian(pty:pet), Attorney Jonathan E. Maier added to party Claudine Cmarada(pty:pet), Attorney Jonathan E. Maier added to party Krista Kafer(pty:pet), Attorney Jonathan E. Maier added to party Michelle Priola(pty:pet), Attorney Jonathan E. Maier added to party Kathi Wright(pty:pet) (Maier, Jonathan)
September 11, 2023 Filing 20 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Nikhel Suresh Sus on behalf of Norma Anderson, Christopher Castilian, Claudine Cmarada, Krista Kafer, Michelle Priola, Kathi WrightAttorney Nikhel Suresh Sus added to party Norma Anderson(pty:pet), Attorney Nikhel Suresh Sus added to party Christopher Castilian(pty:pet), Attorney Nikhel Suresh Sus added to party Claudine Cmarada(pty:pet), Attorney Nikhel Suresh Sus added to party Krista Kafer(pty:pet), Attorney Nikhel Suresh Sus added to party Michelle Priola(pty:pet), Attorney Nikhel Suresh Sus added to party Kathi Wright(pty:pet) (Sus, Nikhel)
September 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MINUTE ORDER by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 9/11/2023. Respondent Donald J. Trump shall file a response to petitioners' #15 Motion to Remand on or before Tuesday, September 12, 2023, at 12:00 p.m. Text Only Entry (pabsec, )
September 11, 2023 Filing 18 NOTICE re #15 MOTION to Remand to State Court Notice of Respondent Donald J. Trump's Response to Petitioners' Unopposed Motion to Remand by Respondent Donald J. Trump (Gessler, Scott)
September 9, 2023 Filing 17 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Martha M. Tierney on behalf of Norma Anderson, Christopher Castilian, Claudine Cmarada, Krista Kafer, Michelle Priola, Kathi WrightAttorney Martha M. Tierney added to party Norma Anderson(pty:pet), Attorney Martha M. Tierney added to party Christopher Castilian(pty:pet), Attorney Martha M. Tierney added to party Claudine Cmarada(pty:pet), Attorney Martha M. Tierney added to party Krista Kafer(pty:pet), Attorney Martha M. Tierney added to party Michelle Priola(pty:pet), Attorney Martha M. Tierney added to party Kathi Wright(pty:pet) (Tierney, Martha)
September 8, 2023 Filing 16 Unopposed MOTION to Expedite Motion to Remand (ECF 15) by Petitioners Norma Anderson, Christopher Castilian, Claudine Cmarada, Krista Kafer, Michelle Priola, Kathi Wright. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Murray, Jason)
September 8, 2023 Filing 15 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Petitioners Norma Anderson, Christopher Castilian, Claudine Cmarada, Krista Kafer, Michelle Priola, Kathi Wright. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit CO State Court Docket, #2 Exhibit Secretary of State Waiver of Service, #3 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Murray, Jason)
September 8, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Sean C. Grimsley on behalf of Norma Anderson, Christopher Castilian, Claudine Cmarada, Krista Kafer, Michelle Priola, Kathi WrightAttorney Sean C. Grimsley added to party Norma Anderson(pty:pet), Attorney Sean C. Grimsley added to party Christopher Castilian(pty:pet), Attorney Sean C. Grimsley added to party Claudine Cmarada(pty:pet), Attorney Sean C. Grimsley added to party Krista Kafer(pty:pet), Attorney Sean C. Grimsley added to party Michelle Priola(pty:pet), Attorney Sean C. Grimsley added to party Kathi Wright(pty:pet) (Grimsley, Sean)
September 8, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jason C. Murray on behalf of Norma Anderson, Christopher Castilian, Claudine Cmarada, Krista Kafer, Michelle Priola, Kathi WrightAttorney Jason C. Murray added to party Norma Anderson(pty:pet), Attorney Jason C. Murray added to party Christopher Castilian(pty:pet), Attorney Jason C. Murray added to party Claudine Cmarada(pty:pet), Attorney Jason C. Murray added to party Krista Kafer(pty:pet), Attorney Jason C. Murray added to party Michelle Priola(pty:pet), Attorney Jason C. Murray added to party Kathi Wright(pty:pet) (Murray, Jason)
September 8, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Eric R. Olson on behalf of Norma Anderson, Christopher Castilian, Claudine Cmarada, Krista Kafer, Michelle Priola, Kathi WrightAttorney Eric R. Olson added to party Norma Anderson(pty:pet), Attorney Eric R. Olson added to party Christopher Castilian(pty:pet), Attorney Eric R. Olson added to party Claudine Cmarada(pty:pet), Attorney Eric R. Olson added to party Krista Kafer(pty:pet), Attorney Eric R. Olson added to party Michelle Priola(pty:pet), Attorney Eric R. Olson added to party Kathi Wright(pty:pet) (Olson, Eric)
September 8, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Martha M. Tierney on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Tierney, Martha)
September 7, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Mario Daniel Nicolais, II on behalf of Norma Anderson, Christopher Castilian, Claudine Cmarada, Krista Kafer, Michelle Priola, Kathi WrightAttorney Mario Daniel Nicolais, II added to party Norma Anderson(pty:pet), Attorney Mario Daniel Nicolais, II added to party Christopher Castilian(pty:pet), Attorney Mario Daniel Nicolais, II added to party Claudine Cmarada(pty:pet), Attorney Mario Daniel Nicolais, II added to party Krista Kafer(pty:pet), Attorney Mario Daniel Nicolais, II added to party Michelle Priola(pty:pet), Attorney Mario Daniel Nicolais, II added to party Kathi Wright(pty:pet) (Nicolais, Mario)
September 7, 2023 Filing 9 Readmission fee payment for Martha M. Tierney $223, receipt number BCODC-9283463.. (Tierney, Martha)
September 7, 2023 Filing 8 VERIFIED PETITION, filed by Christopher Castilian, Claudine Cmarada, Michelle Priola, Norma Anderson, Krista Kafer, Kathi Wright.(efoga, )
September 7, 2023 Filing 7 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (efoga, )
September 7, 2023 Filing 6 Case assigned to Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer and drawn to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Text Only Entry (efoga, )
September 7, 2023 Filing 5 DISREGARD--FILED IN ERROR. Administrative Notice: Notice to filer of non-compliance with Notice of Removal case opening procedures. It is the responsibility of the attorney or pro se party removing the case to follow Local Rule D.C.COLO.LCivR 81.1, and 28 U.S.C. 1446(a). State court documents were not all submitted.See Appendix B Notice of Removal in the User Guide - Attorney Case Opening Procedures document. (Text Only Entry) (efoga, ) Modified on 9/7/2023 (efoga, ).
September 7, 2023 Filing 4 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (efoga, )
September 7, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Justin T North on behalf of Donald J. TrumpAttorney Justin T North added to party Donald J. Trump(pty:res) (North, Justin)
September 7, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Geoffrey N. Blue on behalf of Donald J. TrumpAttorney Geoffrey N. Blue added to party Donald J. Trump(pty:res) (Blue, Geoffrey)
September 7, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Donald J. Trump from District Court, City and County of Denver, Colorado, Case Number 2023CV32577. (Filing fee $ 402, Receipt Number ACODC-9282265), filed by Donald J. Trump. (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet Ex. 1 - State Court Docket Sheet, #2 Exhibit Ex. 2 - State Court Petition, #3 Exhibit Ex. 3 - State Court Cover Sheet, #4 Exhibit Ex. 4 - State Court Motion for Expedited Case Management Conference, #5 Exhibit Ex. 5 - State Court Notice of Recusal of Judge, #6 Exhibit Ex. 6 - State Court Order of Reassignment, #7 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Case Cover Sheet)(Gessler, Scott)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anderson et al v. Griswold et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Norma Anderson
Represented By: Mario Daniel Nicolais, II
Represented By: Donald K. Sherman
Represented By: Eric R. Olson
Represented By: Martha M. Tierney
Represented By: Nikhel Suresh Sus
Represented By: Sean C. Grimsley
Represented By: Jason C. Murray
Represented By: Jonathan E. Maier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Michelle Priola
Represented By: Mario Daniel Nicolais, II
Represented By: Nikhel Suresh Sus
Represented By: Sean C. Grimsley
Represented By: Donald K. Sherman
Represented By: Eric R. Olson
Represented By: Jason C. Murray
Represented By: Jonathan E. Maier
Represented By: Martha M. Tierney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Claudine Cmarada
Represented By: Mario Daniel Nicolais, II
Represented By: Sean C. Grimsley
Represented By: Donald K. Sherman
Represented By: Eric R. Olson
Represented By: Jason C. Murray
Represented By: Jonathan E. Maier
Represented By: Martha M. Tierney
Represented By: Nikhel Suresh Sus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Krista Kafer
Represented By: Mario Daniel Nicolais, II
Represented By: Donald K. Sherman
Represented By: Jason C. Murray
Represented By: Jonathan E. Maier
Represented By: Martha M. Tierney
Represented By: Nikhel Suresh Sus
Represented By: Sean C. Grimsley
Represented By: Eric R. Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Kathi Wright
Represented By: Mario Daniel Nicolais, II
Represented By: Donald K. Sherman
Represented By: Jonathan E. Maier
Represented By: Martha M. Tierney
Represented By: Nikhel Suresh Sus
Represented By: Sean C. Grimsley
Represented By: Eric R. Olson
Represented By: Jason C. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Christopher Castilian
Represented By: Mario Daniel Nicolais, II
Represented By: Donald K. Sherman
Represented By: Eric R. Olson
Represented By: Martha M. Tierney
Represented By: Nikhel Suresh Sus
Represented By: Sean C. Grimsley
Represented By: Jason C. Murray
Represented By: Jonathan E. Maier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Secretary of State Jena Griswold
Represented By: Michael T. Kotlarczyk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Donald J. Trump
Represented By: Geoffrey N. Blue
Represented By: Justin T North
Represented By: Scott E. Gessler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Colorado Republican State Central Committee
Represented By: Michael William Melito
Represented By: Robert Alan Kitsmiller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?