Ekstrom v. Reliable Carriers Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Christian Ekstrom
Defendant: Reliable Carriers, Inc., Leroy Davenport and Reliable Carriers Incorporated
Case Number: 1:2023cv02379
Filed: September 13, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: S Kato Crews
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 10, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 10, 2023 Filing 17 NOTICE of Settlement (Stipulated) by Defendant Reliable Carriers Incorporated (Abramson, Jonathan)
November 6, 2023 Filing 16 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant Reliable Carriers Incorporated All parties do not consent.. (Abramson, Jonathan)
October 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING #14 Unopposed Motion to Vacate and Reset Scheduling Conference. The Telephonic Scheduling Conference is RESET to 12/4/2023 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. The conference calling information remains the same. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 10/11/2023. Text Only Entry (skclc3)
October 6, 2023 Filing 14 Unopposed MOTION to Reset Scheduling Conference by Defendant Reliable Carriers Incorporated. (Abramson, Jonathan)
October 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER Setting Telephone Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference. Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 11/13/2023 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. The parties shall file their proposed scheduling order and email a copy in Word format to Crews_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov, no later than seven calendar days before the conference. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that a completed Magistrate Judge Consent Form (ECF. #8 ) shall be filed no later than seven calendar days before the conference. At the scheduled time, counsel shall call the Court provided conference line at (888) 251-2909 Access Code: 5662814#. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 10/4/2023. Text Only Entry (amont, )
September 27, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE re #1 Notice of Removal,, Register of Actions (Summit County District Court) by Defendant Reliable Carriers Incorporated (Abramson, Jonathan)
September 20, 2023 Filing 11 ANSWER to #5 Complaint by Reliable Carriers Incorporated.(Abramson, Jonathan)
September 15, 2023 Filing 10 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES: re #9 Notice of Entry of Appearance filed by attorney Brian S. Matlin. The s/signature did not match the filers name on the account for which the login and password are registered. DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - future documents must be filed pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 4.3(c) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases).(Text Only Entry) (schap, )
September 14, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Brian S. Matlin and Shannon K. VanMatre by Shannon Kay VanMatre on behalf of Christian EkstromAttorney Shannon Kay VanMatre added to party Christian Ekstrom(pty:pla) (VanMatre, Shannon)
September 13, 2023 Filing 8 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (blaws)
September 13, 2023 Filing 7 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Text Only Entry. (blaws)
September 13, 2023 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Service of Summons, Complaint upon Reliable Carriers Incorporated on 08/14/2023. (blaws)
September 13, 2023 Filing 5 STATE COURT CIVIL COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Leroy Davenport, Reliable Carriers Incorporated, filed by Christian Ekstrom. (blaws) Modified on 9/14/2023 to correct main document title. (blaws)
September 13, 2023 Filing 4 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (blaws)
September 13, 2023 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Abramson, Jonathan)
September 13, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Bobby Glendon Riley, Jr on behalf of Reliable Carriers, Inc.Attorney Bobby Glendon Riley, Jr added to party Reliable Carriers, Inc.(pty:dft) (Riley, Bobby)
September 13, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Reliable Carriers, Inc. from Summit County District Court, Case Number 2023CV30103. (Filing fee $ 402, Receipt Number BCODC-9293088), filed by Reliable Carriers, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2-Summons, #3 Exhibit 3-Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Exhibit 4-ROS (Reliable Carriers), #5 Exhibit 5-TAR, #6 Exhibit 6-Accurint Report (Ekstrom), #7 Exhibit 7-Accurint Report (Davenport), #8 Exhibit 8-Cert of Good Standing (Reliable Carriers), #9 Exhibit 9-FMCSA Snapshot (Reliable Carriers), #10 Civil Cover Sheet)(Abramson, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ekstrom v. Reliable Carriers Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christian Ekstrom
Represented By: Brian S. Matlin
Represented By: Shannon Kay VanMatre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reliable Carriers, Inc.
Represented By: Bobby Glendon Riley, Jr.
Represented By: Jonathan Marshall Abramson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leroy Davenport
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reliable Carriers Incorporated
Represented By: Bobby Glendon Riley, Jr.
Represented By: Jonathan Marshall Abramson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?