Trimble v. American Family Insurance et al
Plaintiff: Faliesha Trimble
Defendant: American Family Insurance, HomeSite, Kirk Appraisal and Scott Rachel
Case Number: 1:2023cv02420
Filed: September 15, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Referring Judge: Michael E Hegarty
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 as - Fed. Question - Assault, Libel, Slander
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2023 Filing 38 MOTION to Reset Scheduling Conference and Extend Deadlines by Defendants American Family Insurance, HomeSite. (Hertzke, Billy-George)
November 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting #31 Plaintiff's Motion for Appointment of Counsel. Entered by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 11/7/2023.(jtorr, )
November 7, 2023 Filing 35 CLERK'S NOTE REGARDING DEFAULT. Default will not be entered as to Scott Rachel, as a responsive pleading has been filed by defendant. Text Only Entry. (jtorr, )
November 6, 2023 Filing 36 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re: #21 Letter re: Service Addressed to Faliesha Trimble. (jtorr, )
November 6, 2023 Filing 34 REQUEST for a Default Motion as to Defendant Scott Rachel, filed by Plaintiff Faliesha Trimble. (jtorr, )
November 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER denying #30 Motion to Reschedule. Plaintiff cites the need for more time because a witness has lost her voice. There is no anticipated hearing or planned presentation of testimony at this time. The Scheduling Conference will be held as scheduled (11/20/2023 at 11:00 AM) and the Court will address all other pending motions at that time. It is further ordered that the deadline for the proposed scheduling order is extended to 11/13/23. Entered by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 11/5/23. Text Only Entry(mehlc4, )
November 3, 2023 Filing 32 MEMORANDUM regarding #30 MOTION to Continue filed by Faliesha Trimble, #31 MOTION to Appoint Pro Bono Counsel filed by Faliesha Trimble. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty, by District Judge Gordon P Gallagher on 11/3/2023. Text Only Entry (schap, )
November 2, 2023 Filing 31 MOTION for Appointment of Counsel by Plaintiff Faliesha Trimble. (Attachments: #1 Continuation of Main Document)(jtorr, )
November 2, 2023 Filing 30 MOTION to Reschedule by Plaintiff Faliesha Trimble. (jtorr, )
November 2, 2023 Filing 29 NOTICE of Change of Address by Plaintiff Faliesha Trimble. (jtorr, )
November 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other specifically-referred motions, and (4) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. Motions #18 , #19 , #20 , #21 referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. By District Judge Gordon P Gallagher on 11/2/2023. Text Only Entry (schap, )
November 2, 2023 Filing 26 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to 25 Minute Order. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to District Judge Gordon P Gallagher and drawn to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty for all further proceedings. All future pleadings should be designated as 23-cv-02420-GPG. (Text Only Entry) (jtorr, )
November 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to the form declining consent under D.C. Colo. LCivR 40.1(c) at ECF 24, the Court directs the Clerk of Court to reassign this case under D.C. Colo. LCivR 40.1(a). This Court may continue on the case to hear matters referred by the district judge under 28 U.S.C. 636(b), Fed. R. Civ. P. 72 and D.C. Colo. LCivR 72.1(c). Entered by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 11/2/23. Text Only Entry (mehlc4, )
November 1, 2023 Filing 28 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re: #20 MOTION re LETTER re Add a Name by Plaintiff Faliesha Trimble. Addressed to Faliesha Trimble. (tgall, )
November 1, 2023 Filing 24 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendants American Family Insurance, HomeSite All parties do not consent.. (Hertzke, Billy-George)
November 1, 2023 Filing 23 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Billy-George Hertzke on behalf of American Family Insurance, HomeSiteAttorney Billy-George Hertzke added to party American Family Insurance(pty:dft), Attorney Billy-George Hertzke added to party HomeSite(pty:dft) (Hertzke, Billy-George)
October 27, 2023 Filing 22 RESPONSE to #18 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Scott Rachel filed by Defendant Scott Rachel. (Anderson, Derek)
October 25, 2023 Filing 21 LETTER re: Service by Plaintiff Faliesha Trimble. (jtorr, )
October 25, 2023 Filing 20 LETTER re: Add a Name by Plaintiff Faliesha Trimble. (jtorr, )
October 23, 2023 Filing 19 MOTION to Quash Proof of Service by Defendant Scott Rachel. (Anderson, Derek)
October 16, 2023 Filing 18 LETTER re: Default Judgment by Plaintiff Faliesha Trimble. (jtorr, )
October 4, 2023 Filing 17 Answer Deadline Reset for 11/27/2023 as to Defendants HomeSite and American Family Insurance pursuant to 15 Order. Text Only Entry. (jtorr, )
October 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER finding as moot #11 Motion to Quash Service of Process on the grounds Defendants American Family Insurance Company and Homesite Group Incorporated have voluntarily waived service. Entered by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 10/4/23. Text Only Entry(mehlc4, )
October 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Order Regarding Response Deadline. Defendants American Family Insurance Group and Homesite Group Incorporated have voluntarily waived service, and therefore shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint within 60 days from 9/28/23. Entered by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 10/4/23. Text Only Entry(mehlc4, )
October 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER Due to a conflict on the Court's calendar, the Scheduling Conference is reset for 11/20/2023 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 10/3/2023. Text Only Entry (cthom, )
September 28, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE OF CASE ASSOCIATION by Jessica Rae Schultz on behalf of American Family Insurance, HomeSite (Attachments: #1 Exhibit to Notice of Related Case)(Schultz, Jessica)
September 28, 2023 Filing 12 MOTION for Order to Regarding Response Deadline and Waiver of Service by Defendants American Family Insurance, HomeSite. (Schultz, Jessica)
September 28, 2023 Filing 11 MOTION to Quash Service of Process by Defendants American Family Insurance, HomeSite. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Motion to Quash Service of Process, #2 Exhibit B to Motion to Quash Service of Process, #3 Exhibit C to Motion to Quash Service Process)(Schultz, Jessica)
September 25, 2023 Filing 10 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Faliesha Trimble. Plaintiff consents. (jtorr, )
September 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 9/19/2023. Magistrate Judge Consent Form due 11/1/2023. Proposed Scheduling Order due 11/6/2023. Scheduling Conference set for 11/14/2023 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. (jtorr, )
September 18, 2023 Filing 8 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Faliesha Trimble. Plaintiff consents. (jtorr, )
September 18, 2023 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed. American Family Insurance served on 9/18/2023, answer due 10/10/2023; HomeSite served on 9/18/2023, answer due 10/10/2023; Kirk Appraisal served on 9/18/2023, answer due 10/10/2023; Scott Rachel served on 9/18/2023, answer due 10/10/2023. (jtorr, )
September 15, 2023 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (blaws)
September 15, 2023 Filing 5 SUMMONS issued over the counter by Clerk. (blaws)
September 15, 2023 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Text Only Entry. (blaws)
September 15, 2023 Filing 3 Filing fee: $ 402.00, receipt number 108218. (blaws)
September 15, 2023 Filing 2 SUMMONS REQUEST by Plaintiff Faliesha Trimble. (blaws)
September 15, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against American Family Insurance, HomeSite, Kirk Appraisal, Scott Rachel, filed by Faliesha Trimble. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibits) (blaws)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trimble v. American Family Insurance et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Faliesha Trimble
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Family Insurance
Represented By: Billy-George Hertzke
Represented By: Jessica Rae Schultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HomeSite
Represented By: Jessica Rae Schultz
Represented By: Billy-George Hertzke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kirk Appraisal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Rachel
Represented By: Derek C. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?