Mighell v. HPG Pizza I, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Steve Mighell
Defendant: HPG Pizza I, LLC, HPG Pizza II, LLC, Rob Prange, Doe Corporation 1-10 and John Doe 1-10
Case Number: 1:2023cv02533
Filed: September 28, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: S Kato Crews
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 0206 - FLSA -- Minimum Wage
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2023 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Steve Mighell. Rob Prange served on 11/11/2023, answer due 12/4/2023. (Scherpenberg, Joseph)
November 9, 2023 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. HPG Pizza II, LLC served on 11/7/2023, answer due 11/28/2023. (Scherpenberg, Joseph)
November 9, 2023 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. HPG Pizza I, LLC served on 11/7/2023, answer due 11/28/2023. (Scherpenberg, Joseph)
October 24, 2023 Filing 14 SUMMONSES issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (sphil, )
October 11, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE of Filing Amended Pleading re #4 Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Steve Mighell (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Strikethrough of Amended Complaint)(Scherpenberg, Joseph)
October 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER STRIKING #11 Amended Notice of Plaintiff's First Amended Class and Collective Action Complaint and attached "strike-through" complaint. The "strike-through" complaint is not, in fact, a strike-through document. For example, the comment on page 2 does not reflect a strike-through, but rather a deletion of the comment. Plaintiff is FURTHER ORDERED to file a strike-through version of his Amended Complaint on or before 10/13/2023. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 10/10/2023. Text Only Entry (skclc3)
October 10, 2023 Filing 11 STRICKEN NOTICE of Filing Amended Pleading re #4 Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Steve Mighell (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Strikethrough of Amended Complaint)(Scherpenberg, Joseph) Modified on 10/11/2023 to strike notice pursuant to [#12] Minute Order. (sphil, ).
October 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER DENYING #9 Plaintiff's Motion to Strike and Remove Original Complaint or, in the Alternative, Restrict the Document (Doc. 1). Plaintiff fails to provide good cause to restrict the original #1 Complaint at Level 2 restriction. And striking the Complaint would not affect who can view the document.The Court also notes that the #5 Notice of Plaintiff's First Amended Class and Collective Action Complaint fails to comply with the Local Rules. See D.C.COLO.LCivR 15.1. Plaintiff is ORDERED to file on or before 10/13/2023 a notice of amended complaint that complies fully with the Local Rules, including providing the required strike-through version as an attachment. See D.C.COLO.LCivR 15.1.(a). SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 10/10/2023. Text Only Entry (skclc3)
October 10, 2023 Filing 9 MOTION to Strike #1 Complaint, or alternatively, restrict access, due to clerical error by Plaintiff Steve Mighell. (Scherpenberg, Joseph)
October 3, 2023 Filing 8 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Rob Prange by Plaintiff Steve Mighell. (Scherpenberg, Joseph)
October 3, 2023 Filing 7 SUMMONS REQUEST as to HPG Pizza II, LLC by Plaintiff Steve Mighell. (Scherpenberg, Joseph)
October 3, 2023 Filing 6 SUMMONS REQUEST as to HPG Pizza I, LLC by Plaintiff Steve Mighell. (Scherpenberg, Joseph)
October 2, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE of Filing Amended Pleading re #4 Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Steve Mighell (Scherpenberg, Joseph)
October 2, 2023 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Steve Mighell.(Scherpenberg, Joseph)
September 28, 2023 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. No Summons Issued. Summons Submitted is missing a complete case caption. All parties to the action must be listed in the case caption. For issuance of Summons, please update the document and use the "Summons Request" event type. (tgall, )
September 28, 2023 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Text Only Entry. (tgall, )
September 28, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number ACODC-9318708)Attorney Joseph M. Scherpenberg added to party Steve Mighell(pty:pla), filed by Steve Mighell. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons to HPG Pizza I, LLC, #3 Summons Summons to HPG Pizza II, LLC, #4 Summons Summons to Rob Prange, #5 Exhibit Consent to Join Form)(Scherpenberg, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mighell v. HPG Pizza I, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Mighell
Represented By: Joseph M. Scherpenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HPG Pizza I, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HPG Pizza II, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rob Prange
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Corporation 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?