Ruiz Alvarez et al v. Santa Ana et al
Plaintiff: Karina Ruiz Alvarez, Karla Gonzalez Velez, Gabriela Moctezuma Castillo and Amelia Colon Chairez
Defendant: Adriana Santa Ana and Briana Santa Ana
Case Number: 1:2023cv02571
Filed: October 2, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Michael E Hegarty
Referring Judge: John L Kane
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity - Real Property
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Modifying Preliminary Injunction, by Judge John L. Kane on 11/21/2023.(angar, )
November 13, 2023 Filing 19 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify #18 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction, by Defendant Adriana Santa Ana. (Crisham, John)
October 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Granting #9 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. This Preliminary Injunction shall remain in effect pending final resolution of the claims brought in Civil Action No. 23-cv-02571-JLK-MEH. No bond shall be required under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 65(c), by Judge John L. Kane on 10/23/2023.(angar, )
October 18, 2023 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Karina Ruiz Alvarez, Amelia Colon Chairez, Gabriela Moctezuma Castillo, Karla Gonzalez Velez. Briana Santa Ana waiver sent on 10/16/2023, answer due 12/15/2023. (Turner, Andrew)
October 18, 2023 Filing 16 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance for Briana Santa Ana by Daniel Joseph Lowenberg on behalf of Briana Santa AnaAttorney Daniel Joseph Lowenberg added to party Briana Santa Ana(pty:dft) (Lowenberg, Daniel)
October 18, 2023 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE re: 11 Minute Order,,, by Plaintiffs Amelia Colon Chairez, Karla Gonzalez Velez, Gabriela Moctezuma Castillo, Karina Ruiz Alvarez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Email Correspondence, #2 Exhibit B - Email Correspondence)(Turner, Andrew)
October 12, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Christopher T. Carry on behalf of Adriana Santa AnaAttorney Christopher T. Carry added to party Adriana Santa Ana(pty:dft) (Carry, Christopher)
October 12, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by John K. Crisham on behalf of Adriana Santa AnaAttorney John K. Crisham added to party Adriana Santa Ana(pty:dft) (Crisham, John)
October 12, 2023 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Karina Ruiz Alvarez, Amelia Colon Chairez, Gabriela Moctezuma Castillo, Karla Gonzalez Velez. Adriana Santa Ana waiver sent on 10/10/2023, answer due 12/11/2023. (Turner, Andrew)
October 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER. The Court has reviewed the Motion for Preliminary Injunction #9 filed by Plaintiffs in Case No. 23-cv-02571. The Court intends to set a hearing on the Motion. Plaintiffs are DIRECTED to file proof that sufficient notice of the Motion has been provided to Defendants Adriana Santa Ana and Briana Santa Ana. Plaintiffs are further DIRECTED to confer with those Defendants and then to submit, on or before October 20, 2023, a mutually agreed upon briefing schedule for the Motion and a proposed date and time for the preliminary injunction hearing. Depending on the anticipated length of the hearing, the Court has availability on October 30 and 31 and November 2, 22, and 23, by Judge John L. Kane on 10/11/2023. Text Only Entry (angar, )
October 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Minute Order granting 44 Motion to Consolidate Cases. Plaintiffs' Notice of Related Case 43 and Motion to Reassign and Consolidate Related Case 44 have been considered as required by Local Rules 3.2 and 42.1. The relief requested by Plaintiffs is found to be appropriate. Consequently, Plaintiffs' Motion 44 is GRANTED. Pursuant to Local Rules 40.1(d)(4)(C) and 42.1, Case No. 23-cv-02571-PAB-STV shall be reassigned to me and consolidated with this case for pretrial proceedings. By Judge John L. Kane on 10/10/2023. Text Only Entry Text Only Entry (angar, )
October 5, 2023 Filing 9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiffs Amelia Colon Chairez, Karla Gonzalez Velez, Gabriela Moctezuma Castillo, Karina Ruiz Alvarez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit #1 - Payroll Records, #2 Exhibit #2 - Special Warranty Deed 1513 Haystack Rd, #3 Exhibit #3 - Special Warranty Deed 1124 Hemlock Way, #4 Exhibit #4 - General Warranty Deed Stoney Creek)(Turner, Andrew)
October 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak for all motions. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order, and (5) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding, by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 10/5/2023. Text Only Entry (pabsec, )
October 5, 2023 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Adriana Santa Ana, Briana Santa Ana, filed by Karina Ruiz Alvarez, Amelia Colon Chairez, Gabriela Moctezuma Castillo, Karla Gonzalez Velez.(Turner, Andrew)
October 5, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE of Filing Amended Pleading by Plaintiffs Amelia Colon Chairez, Karla Gonzalez Velez, Gabriela Moctezuma Castillo, Karina Ruiz Alvarez (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Redlined Amended Complaint)(Turner, Andrew)
October 4, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Alexander Neville Hood on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Alexander Neville Hood added to party Amelia Colon Chairez(pty:pla), Attorney Alexander Neville Hood added to party Karla Gonzalez Velez(pty:pla), Attorney Alexander Neville Hood added to party Gabriela Moctezuma Castillo(pty:pla), Attorney Alexander Neville Hood added to party Karina Ruiz Alvarez(pty:pla) (Hood, Alexander)
October 3, 2023 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (ccuen, )
October 2, 2023 Filing 3 Case assigned to Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer and drawn to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Text Only Entry (ccuen, )
October 2, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CASE ASSOCIATION Related Case by Andrew H. Turner on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Turner, Andrew)
October 2, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Adriana Santa Ana, Briana Santa Ana (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number ACODC-9324060)Attorney Andrew H. Turner added to party Amelia Colon Chairez(pty:pla), Attorney Andrew H. Turner added to party Karla Gonzalez Velez(pty:pla), Attorney Andrew H. Turner added to party Gabriela Moctezuma Castillo(pty:pla), Attorney Andrew H. Turner added to party Karina Ruiz Alvarez(pty:pla), filed by Karina Ruiz Alvarez, Amelia Colon Chairez, Gabriela Moctezuma Castillo, Karla Gonzalez Velez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Adriana Santa Ana, #3 Summons)(Turner, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ruiz Alvarez et al v. Santa Ana et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karina Ruiz Alvarez
Represented By: Andrew H. Turner
Represented By: Alexander Neville Hood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karla Gonzalez Velez
Represented By: Andrew H. Turner
Represented By: Alexander Neville Hood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gabriela Moctezuma Castillo
Represented By: Andrew H. Turner
Represented By: Alexander Neville Hood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amelia Colon Chairez
Represented By: Andrew H. Turner
Represented By: Alexander Neville Hood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adriana Santa Ana
Represented By: Christopher T. Carry
Represented By: John K. Crisham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Briana Santa Ana
Represented By: Daniel Joseph Lowenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?