Valentine v. Verizon Wireless, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Elet Valentine
Defendant: Verizon Wireless, LLC, Cello Partnership doing business as Verizon Wireless and Verizon Communication, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2023cv02698
Filed: October 16, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Daniel D Domenico
Referring Judge: Kathryn A Starnella
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2023 Filing 39 BRIEF in Opposition to #28 First MOTION for Default Judgment as to Verizon Communications, Inc., #27 First MOTION for Default Judgment as to Verizon Wireless, LLC filed by Defendant Cello Partnership. (Martin, Kelsey)
December 11, 2023 Filing 38 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Kelsey Alexandra Martin on behalf of Cello PartnershipAttorney Kelsey Alexandra Martin added to party Cello Partnership(pty:dft) (Martin, Kelsey)
December 5, 2023 Filing 37 OBJECTIONS to #24 Objections, and Response to Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless Objection to Plaintiff's Request for Entry of Default [ECF#24] by Plaintiff Elet Valentine. (Valentine, Elet)
December 5, 2023 Filing 36 OBJECTIONS to #24 Objections, and Response to Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless Request for Judicial Notice [ECF#24-1] by Plaintiff Elet Valentine. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 7 - Colorado Sec of State - Verizon Wireless, LLC)(Valentine, Elet)
December 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER REFERRING MOTION: #34 MOTION to Dismiss the Action Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.12(c) and Confirm the Parties' Prior Arbitration Award filed by Cello Partnership.Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 12/5/2023. (dddlc3, )
December 4, 2023 Filing 34 MOTION to Dismiss the Action Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.12(c) and Confirm the Parties' Prior Arbitration Award by Defendant Cello Partnership. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Joseph Ninete, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E)(Werge, Thomas)
November 28, 2023 Filing 33 REPLY to 30 Notice of Noncompliance with Court Procedures/Rules,, 31 Notice of Noncompliance with Court Procedures/Rules,, by Plaintiff Elet Valentine. (Valentine, Elet)
November 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER REFERRING MOTIONS: #28 First MOTION for Default Judgment as to Verizon Communications, Inc. filed by Elet Valentine; AND #27 First MOTION for Default Judgment as to Verizon Wireless, LLC filed by Elet Valentine.Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 11/21/2023. Text Only Entry (dddlc3, )
November 21, 2023 Filing 31 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES re: #25 Certificate of Mailing/Service, #26 Certificate of Mailing/Service, #27 First Motion for Default Judgment, and #28 First Motion for Default Judgment filed by Pro Se E-Filer Elet Valentine. The documents are not text searchable portable document format (PDF) files. DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - future documents must be filed pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 1.3(f) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases). (Text Only Entry) (jtorr, )
November 21, 2023 Filing 30 DISREGARD -- DUPLICATIVE OF ECF 31 - ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES: re: #28 First MOTION for Default Judgment as to Verizon Communications, Inc., #27 First MOTION for Default Judgment as to Verizon Wireless, LLC filed by pro se litigant Elet Valentine. The document was scanned and not converted directly to portable document format (PDF). DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - future documents must be filed pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 1.3(f) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases). (Text Only Entry) (norlin, ) Modified to add disregard note on 11/21/2023 (jtorr, ).
November 20, 2023 Filing 29 OBJECTIONS to Clerk's Note for Default [ECF#23] by Plaintiff Elet Valentine. (Valentine, Elet)
November 20, 2023 Filing 28 First MOTION for Default Judgment as to Verizon Communications, Inc. by Plaintiff Elet Valentine. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidvt of Truth in Support of Default Judgment, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 6 - Court Fees and Costs in support of Affdvt)(Valentine, Elet)
November 20, 2023 Filing 27 First MOTION for Default Judgment as to Verizon Wireless, LLC by Plaintiff Elet Valentine. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Truth in Support of Default Judgment, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 6-Court Cost and fees)(Valentine, Elet)
November 20, 2023 Filing 26 CERTIFICATE of Mailing/Service re #22 First MOTION for Entry of Default as to Verizon Communications, Inc. Proof of Service-Request for Default for Verizon Communications, Inc by Plaintiff Elet Valentine. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 4 - Proof of Service - Request for Default for Verizon Communications, Inc)(Valentine, Elet)
November 20, 2023 Filing 25 CERTIFICATE of Mailing/Service re #21 First MOTION for Entry of Default as to Verizon Wireless, LLC Proof of Service-Request for Default Verizon Wireless, LLC by Plaintiff Elet Valentine. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 3 - Proof of Service - Request for Default Verizon Wireless, LLC)(Valentine, Elet)
November 15, 2023 Filing 24 OBJECTIONS to #17 Proposed Pretrial Order by Defendant Cello Partnership. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Defendant Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless's Request for Judicial Notice in Opposition to Default With Exhibits)(Werge, Thomas)
November 15, 2023 Filing 23 CLERK'S NOTE REGARDING DEFAULT Default will not be entered as to Verizon Communication, Inc., Verizon Wireless, LLC re #21 First MOTION for Entry of Default as to Verizon Wireless, LLC, #22 First MOTION for Entry of Default as to Verizon Communications, Inc. as: a responsive pleading has been filed, by Clerk. Text Only Entry (cmadr, )
November 14, 2023 Filing 22 First MOTION for Entry of Default as to Verizon Communications, Inc. by Plaintiff Elet Valentine. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Document Proposed Clerk's, #2 Affidavit Affidavit in Support of Clerk's Certificate of Default)(Valentine, Elet)
November 14, 2023 Filing 21 First MOTION for Entry of Default as to Verizon Wireless, LLC by Plaintiff Elet Valentine. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Document Proposed Clerk's Certificate of Default, #2 Affidavit Affidavit in Support of Clerk's Certificate of Default)(Valentine, Elet)
November 10, 2023 Filing 20 Proposed Pretrial Order Amended - Proposed Clerk's Certificate of Default by Plaintiff Elet Valentine. (Valentine, Elet)
November 10, 2023 Filing 19 Proposed Pretrial Order Amended - Declaration of Truth in Support of Clerk's Certificate of Default by Plaintiff Elet Valentine. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Truth)(Valentine, Elet)
November 10, 2023 Filing 18 Proposed Pretrial Order Affidavit in Support of Clerk's Certificate of Default by Plaintiff Elet Valentine. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit in Support of Clerk's Default)(Valentine, Elet)
November 10, 2023 Filing 17 Proposed Pretrial Order Proposed Clerk's Certificate of Default by Plaintiff Elet Valentine. (Valentine, Elet)
November 10, 2023 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE Proof of Acknowledgement of Pending Legal Action re: #10 Certificate, #11 Certificate, #12 Certificate by Plaintiff Elet Valentine. (Valentine, Elet)
November 8, 2023 Filing 15 Defendant Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless's ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Cello Partnership.(Werge, Thomas)
November 8, 2023 Filing 14 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Bell Atlantic Mobile Systems LLC, Corporate Parent Verizon Americas Inc., Corporate Parent GTE Wireless LLC for Cello Partnership. (Werge, Thomas)
November 8, 2023 Filing 13 Defendant Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless's ANSWER to #1 Complaint, Attorney Thomas E.M. Werge added to party Cello Partnership(pty:dft) by Cello Partnership.(Werge, Thomas)
October 25, 2023 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE Proof of Service - Verizon Communications, Inc. re: #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Elet Valentine. (Valentine, Elet)
October 25, 2023 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE Proof of Service - Cello Partners d/b/a Verizon Wireless re: #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Elet Valentine. (Valentine, Elet)
October 25, 2023 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE Proof of Service - Verizon Wireless, LLC re: #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Elet Valentine. (Valentine, Elet)
October 25, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Elet Valentine (Valentine, Elet)
October 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of Local Civ. R. 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions, and (5) pursuant to Local Civ. R. 16.6 and at the discretion of the Magistrate Judge, convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 10/25/2023. Text Only Entry. (rkeec)
October 25, 2023 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE by Senior Judge Christine M. Arguello. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Daniel D. Domenico and drawn to Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella for all further proceedings. All future pleadings should be designated as 23-cv-02698-DDD. (sphil, )
October 24, 2023 Filing 6 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #5 Order. This case is reassigned to Senior Judge Christine M. Arguello and drawn to Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella. All future pleadings should be designated as 23-cv-02698-CMA. (Text Only Entry) (cmadr, )
October 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella on 24 October 2023. The signed Consent-Non-Consent Form #4 indicates that at least one party has declined to consent. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this case shall be assigned to a District Judge under D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(c)(8) and D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(a). (cmadr, )
October 23, 2023 Filing 4 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Elet Valentine. Plaintiff does not consent. (cmadr, )
October 16, 2023 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. Summons issued over the counter. (efoga, )
October 16, 2023 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella. Text Only Entry (efoga, )
October 16, 2023 Filing 1 VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND JURY DEMAND against Cello Partnership, Verizon Communication, Inc., Verizon Wireless, LLC Filing Fee: $402.00. Receipt Number:108554, filed by Elet Valentine. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(efoga, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Valentine v. Verizon Wireless, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elet Valentine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Verizon Wireless, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cello Partnership doing business as Verizon Wireless
Represented By: Kelsey Alexandra Martin
Represented By: Thomas E.M. Werge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Verizon Communication, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?