Davis v. Rizzi et al
Plaintiff: Robert Davis and Brenda Davis
Defendant: Juan Rizzi and Ognotz Home Design
Case Number: 1:2023cv02861
Filed: October 31, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Kathryn A Starnella
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 28, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 28, 2023 Filing 20 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File a More Definite Answer by Defendants Ognotz Home Design, Juan Rizzi. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Damm, Bradley)
December 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella on 22 December 2023. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Motion #18 is GRANTED. The Scheduling Conference set for January 10, 2024, at 11:00 a.m. is VACATED and RESET to February 5, 2024, at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom C-204 of the Byron G. Rogers United States Courthouse, 1929 Stout Street, Denver, Colorado. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, no later than January 29, 2024, the parties shall file their proposed scheduling order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the deadline to file the Election Concerning Consent/Non-Consent to United States Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction #6 is January 22, 2024.(cmadr, )
December 21, 2023 Filing 18 MOTION to Continue scheduling conference by Plaintiffs Brenda Davis, Robert Davis. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Williams, Ben)
December 20, 2023 Filing 17 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Bradley D. Damm on behalf of Ognotz Home Design, Juan RizziAttorney Bradley D. Damm added to party Ognotz Home Design(pty:dft), Attorney Bradley D. Damm added to party Juan Rizzi(pty:dft) (Damm, Bradley)
December 14, 2023 Filing 16 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re: #13 Answer to Complaint Addressed to Juan Rizzi. (angar, )
December 13, 2023 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE of Mailing/Service re #14 MOTION for More Definite Statement by Plaintiffs Brenda Davis, Robert Davis. (Williams, Ben)
December 13, 2023 Filing 14 MOTION for More Definite Statement by Plaintiffs Brenda Davis, Robert Davis. (Williams, Ben)
December 4, 2023 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Juan Rizzi.(cmadr, )
November 16, 2023 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Juan Rizzi served on 11/9/2023, answer due 11/30/2023. (Williams, Ben)
November 16, 2023 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Ognotz Home Design served on 11/10/2023, answer due 12/1/2023. (Williams, Ben)
November 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella on 7 November 2023. Proposed Scheduling Order due 1/3/2024. Scheduling Conference set for 1/10/2024 11:00 AM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella. (Attachments: #1 Continuation of Main Document, #2 Continuation of Main Document) (cmadr, )
November 1, 2023 Filing 9 SUMMONSES issued by Clerk. (cmadr, )
October 31, 2023 Filing 8 SUMMONS REQUEST as to JUAN RIZZI re #1 Complaint, #4 Exhibits,, #2 Exhibits,, #3 Exhibits,, by Plaintiffs Brenda Davis, Robert Davis. (Williams, Ben)
October 31, 2023 Filing 7 SUMMONS REQUEST as to OGNOTZ HOME DESIGNS re #1 Complaint, #4 Exhibits,, #2 Exhibits,, #3 Exhibits,, by Plaintiffs Brenda Davis, Robert Davis. (Williams, Ben)
October 31, 2023 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (blaws)
October 31, 2023 Filing 5 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella. Text Only Entry. (blaws)
October 31, 2023 Filing 4 Exhibits in Support of #1 Complaint, by Plaintiffs Brenda Davis, Robert Davis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit F (Part 1): Text Communications, #2 Exhibit F (Part 2): Text Communications, #3 Exhibit F (Part 3): Text Communications, #4 Exhibit F (Part 4): Text Communications, #5 Exhibit F (Part 5): Text Communications, #6 Exhibit F (Part 6): Text Communications, #7 Exhibit F (Part 7): Text Communications, #8 Exhibit F (Part 8): Text Communications, #9 Exhibit F (Part 9): Text Communications, #10 Exhibit F (Part 10): Text Communications, #11 Exhibit F (Part 11): Text Communications)(Williams, Ben)
October 31, 2023 Filing 3 Exhibits in Support of #1 Complaint, by Plaintiffs BRENDA DAVIS, ROBERT DAVIS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit G: Pre Set Permit and Park County Building Department Documents, #2 Exhibit H: Intermountain Testing Company Welding Certificate Application, #3 Exhibit I: Email from Charles Kay of Heritage Homes of the Valley, #4 Exhibit J: Third-Party Estimate, #5 Exhibit K: Estimate of Converted Funds, #6 Exhibit L: Schedule Updates, #7 Exhibit M: Estimated Total Payments Made)(Williams, Ben)
October 31, 2023 Filing 2 Exhibits in Support of #1 Complaint, by Plaintiffs BRENDA DAVIS, ROBERT DAVIS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Part 1): Notice of Claim, #2 Exhibit A (Part 2): Notice of Claim, #3 Exhibit A (Part 3): Notice of Claim, #4 Exhibit A (Part 4): Notice of Claim, #5 Exhibit A (Part 5): Notice of Claim, #6 Exhibit A (Part 6): Notice of Claim, #7 Exhibit A (Part 7): Notice of Claim, #8 Exhibit A (Part 8): Notice of Claim, #9 Exhibit B: Contract, #10 Exhibit C: Email Correspondence, #11 Exhibit D: Amended Contract, #12 Exhibit E: Expert Report on Defective Construction)(Williams, Ben)
October 31, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number ACODC-9369518)Attorney Ben Williams added to party BRENDA DAVIS(pty:pla), Attorney Ben Williams added to party ROBERT DAVIS(pty:pla), filed by ROBERT DAVIS, BRENDA DAVIS.(Williams, Ben)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. Rizzi et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Davis
Represented By: Ben Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Davis
Represented By: Ben Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juan Rizzi
Represented By: Bradley D. Damm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ognotz Home Design
Represented By: Bradley D. Damm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?