Flores Rosales et al v. Prestige Maintenance USA, Ltd.
Plaintiff: Vicente Flores Rosales, Yesenia Castillo and Rubith Gonzalez
Defendant: Prestige Maintenance USA, Ltd.
Case Number: 1:2023cv02895
Filed: November 1, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Daniel D Domenico
Referring Judge: N Reid Neureiter
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 19, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Corey Bartkus by Corey Christopher Bartkus on behalf of Prestige Maintenance USA, Ltd.Attorney Corey Christopher Bartkus added to party Prestige Maintenance USA, Ltd.(pty:dft) (Bartkus, Corey)
December 4, 2023 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Vicente Flores Rosales, Rubith Gonzalez, Yesenia Castillo. Prestige Maintenance USA, Ltd. waiver sent on 11/29/2023, answer due 1/29/2024. (Turner, Andrew)
November 13, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Andrew H. Turner on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Turner, Andrew)
November 13, 2023 Filing 8 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Plaintiffs Yesenia Castillo, Vicente Flores Rosales, Rubith Gonzalez. (Turner, Andrew)
November 7, 2023 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Prestige Maintenance USA, Ltd., filed by Vicente Flores Rosales.(Turner, Andrew)
November 7, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE of Filing Amended Pleading by Plaintiffs Yesenia Castillo, Vicente Flores Rosales, Rubith Gonzalez (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Redline- 1st Amended Complaint)(Turner, Andrew)
November 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 11/2/2023. The above-captioned case has been referred to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter pursuant to the Order Referring Case, entered by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on November 2, 2023 (Dkt. # 4 ). IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs shall promptly serve Defendant. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that a Scheduling/Planning Conference pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) shall be held on: January 31, 2024 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom C-203, Second Floor, Byron G. Rogers U.S. Courthouse, 1929 Stout Street, Denver, Colorado 80294. The Scheduling Conference will be conducted via telephone. The parties are directed to call the conference line as a participant at (888) 398-2342, Access Code 5755390# at the scheduled time. PLEASE READ ATTACHED ORDER. (norlin, )
November 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of Local Civ. R. 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions, and (5) pursuant to Local Civ. R. 16.6 and at the discretion of the Magistrate Judge, convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 11/2/2023. Text Only Entry. (rkeec)
November 2, 2023 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (tgall, )
November 1, 2023 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge Daniel D. Domenico and drawn to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Text Only Entry. (tgall, )
November 1, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Prestige Maintenance USA, Ltd. (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number ACODC-9374941)Attorney Andrew H. Turner added to party Yesenia Castillo(pty:pla), Attorney Andrew H. Turner added to party Vicente Flores Rosales(pty:pla), Attorney Andrew H. Turner added to party Rubith Gonzalez(pty:pla), filed by Vicente Flores Rosales, Rubith Gonzalez, Yesenia Castillo. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - FLSA Consent Form of Vicente Flores Rosales, #2 Exhibit 2 - FLSA Consent Form of Yesenia Castillo, #3 Exhibit 3 - FLSA Consent Form of Rubith Gonzalez, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summons)(Turner, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Flores Rosales et al v. Prestige Maintenance USA, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vicente Flores Rosales
Represented By: Andrew H. Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yesenia Castillo
Represented By: Andrew H. Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rubith Gonzalez
Represented By: Andrew H. Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prestige Maintenance USA, Ltd.
Represented By: Corey Christopher Bartkus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?