Krueger v. Sanofi US Services Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Karen Krueger
Defendant: Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis US LLC and Sanofi-Aventis U.S., Inc.
In Re: Taxotere (Docetaxel) Products Liability Litigation
Case Number: 1:2023cv02949
Filed: November 7, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Maritza Dominguez Braswell
Referring Judge: N Reid Neureiter
2 Judge: Charlotte N Sweeney
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 14, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to the reassignment of this case, the Status Conference set before Magistrate Judge Neureiter on 12/21/2023 is hereby VACATED. By Magistrate Judge Maritza Dominguez Braswell on 12/14/2023. Text Only Entry (evaug )
December 14, 2023 Filing 20 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Yaft, Mariham)
December 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE DEADLINES. Proposed Scheduling Order due 1/16/2024. By Magistrate Judge Maritza Dominguez Braswell on 12/13/2023. (evaug)
December 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Maritza Dominguez Braswell for non-dispositive matters. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of Local Civ. R. 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) pursuant to Local Civ. R. 16.6 and at the discretion of the Magistrate Judge, convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. By Judge Charlotte N. Sweeney on 12/12/2023. Text Only Entry (cnsja. )
December 11, 2023 Filing 17 Case Reassigned. In accordance with D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(a) and (d)(4)(B) with approval of the Chief Judge, this case is reassigned to United States District Judge Charlotte N. Sweeney and drawn to Magistrate Judge Maritza Dominguez Braswell. All future pleadings should be designated as 23-cv-02949-CNS. (Text Only Entry) (agarc, )
December 7, 2023 Filing 16 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #15 Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Regina M. Rodriguez. All future pleadings should be designated as 23-cv-2949-RMR. (Text Only Entry) (norlin, )
December 7, 2023 Filing 15 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendants Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis US LLC All parties do not consent.. (Yaft, Mariham)
November 16, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance Entry of Appearance by Christopher J. Kaufman on behalf of Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis US LLCAttorney Christopher J. Kaufman added to party Sanofi US Services Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Christopher J. Kaufman added to party Sanofi-Aventis US LLC(pty:dft) (Kaufman, Christopher)
November 15, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Mariham Yaft on behalf of Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis US LLCAttorney Mariham Yaft added to party Sanofi US Services Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Mariham Yaft added to party Sanofi-Aventis US LLC(pty:dft) (Yaft, Mariham)
November 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE AND SETTING DEADLINE FOR FILING OF CONSENT/NON-CONSENT FORM by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 11/8/2023. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that counsel shall comply with the First and Final Notice to All Attorney(s) and Unrepresented Parties in Removed, Transferred or Other Cases (Dkt. # 9 ) entered on November 9, 2023. On or before December 7, 2023, the parties shall complete and file the Consent/Non-Consent Form (see Dkt. #11), indicating either unanimous consent of the parties or that consent has been declined. Please note that this date may be earlier than the default deadlines contemplated by D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(c)(4). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that a Status Conference shall be held on: December 21, 2023 at 10:30 a.m. in Courtroom C-203, Second Floor, Byron G. Rogers U.S. Courthouse, 1929 Stout Street, Denver, Colorado 80294. The Status Conference will be conducted via telephone. The parties are directed to call the conference line as a participant at (888) 398-2342, Access Code 5755390# at the scheduled time. PLEASE READ ATTACHED ORDER. (norlin, )
November 7, 2023 Filing 11 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (blaws)
November 7, 2023 Filing 10 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Text Only Entry. (blaws)
November 7, 2023 Filing 9 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (blaws)
November 7, 2023 Filing 8 Case transferred in from District of Louisiana Eastern; Case Number 2:18-cv-08377. File, transfer order and docket sheet received
November 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TRANSFER ORDER-Case transferred to District of Colorado. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 10/23/2023. (MDL 2740, Doc. 16511)(go) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/7/2023.]
September 26, 2023 Filing 6 Joint Designation of Record for MDL Transfer by Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. Joint Designation of General and Case-Specified MDL Records to Be Included Upon Remand (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(McRae, Christopher) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/7/2023.]
April 12, 2021 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT by Karen Krueger. **See Rec. Doc 12434 filed in master case 16-md-2740** (am) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/7/2023.]
September 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PRETRIAL ORDERS. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo.(ADI) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/7/2023.]
September 6, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (aj) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/7/2023.]
September 4, 2018 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Jane Triche Milazzo and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (ess) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/7/2023.]
September 4, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7096584) filed by Karen Krueger. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)Attorney Justin Charles Roberts added to party Karen Krueger(pty:pla).(Roberts, Justin) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/7/2023.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Krueger v. Sanofi US Services Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi US Services Inc.
Represented By: Christopher J. Kaufman
Represented By: Mariham Yaft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi-Aventis US LLC
Represented By: Christopher J. Kaufman
Represented By: Mariham Yaft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi-Aventis U.S., Inc.
Represented By: Christopher J. Kaufman
Represented By: Mariham Yaft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Taxotere (Docetaxel) Products Liability Litigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Krueger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?