OptumRx PBM of Illinois, Inc. v. National Benefit Builders, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: OptumRx PBM of Illinois, Inc.
Defendant: National Benefit Builders, Inc., Raymond J Marszalowicz, Kevin Faherty and Barry J Forester
Case Number: 1:2023cv03020
Filed: November 15, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: N Reid Neureiter
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MINUTE ORDER Defendants' Motion for Withdrawal of Adam B. Wiens, Esq. (Dkt. #23 ) and Motion for Withdrawal of Brandon P. Friede, Esq. (Dkt. #24 ) are GRANTED. Adam B. Wiens and Brandon P. Friede shall be permitted to withdraw as counsel for Defendants. The Clerk is directed to remove Adam B. Wiens and Brandon P. Friede from electronic notification in this case. PLEASE READ ATTACHED MINUTE ORDER. Entered by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 1/10/2024.(norlin, )
January 10, 2024 Filing 24 MOTION to Withdraw Brandon P. Friede, Esq. by Defendants Kevin Faherty, Barry J Forester, Raymond J Marszalowicz, National Benefit Builders, Inc.. (Friede, Brandon)
January 10, 2024 Filing 23 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Adam B. Wiens, Esq. by Defendants Kevin Faherty, Barry J Forester, Raymond J Marszalowicz, National Benefit Builders, Inc.. (Wiens, Adam)
January 5, 2024 Filing 22 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Nicholas W. Katz on behalf of All Defendants Attorney Nicholas W. Katz added to party Kevin Faherty(pty:dft), Attorney Nicholas W. Katz added to party Barry J Forester(pty:dft), Attorney Nicholas W. Katz added to party Raymond J Marszalowicz(pty:dft), Attorney Nicholas W. Katz added to party National Benefit Builders, Inc.(pty:dft) (Katz, Nicholas)
January 5, 2024 Filing 21 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jonathan S. Bender on behalf of All Defendants Attorney Jonathan S. Bender added to party Kevin Faherty(pty:dft), Attorney Jonathan S. Bender added to party Barry J Forester(pty:dft), Attorney Jonathan S. Bender added to party Raymond J Marszalowicz(pty:dft), Attorney Jonathan S. Bender added to party National Benefit Builders, Inc.(pty:dft) (Bender, Jonathan)
December 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MINUTE ORDER Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs Complaint (Dkt. #17 ) is GRANTED as follows. Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs Complaint (Dkt. #1 ) on or before January 26, 2024. PLEASE READ ATTACHED MINUTE ORDER. Entered by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 12/28/2023.(norlin, )
December 22, 2023 Filing 19 RESPONSE to #17 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint,, filed by Plaintiff OptumRx PBM of Illinois, Inc.. (Monafo, James)
December 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 15 December 2023. It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff shall state its objection to the Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint (Dkt. #17 ), if any, on or before December 22, 2023. PLEASE READ ATTACHED MINUTE ORDER. (cmadr, )
December 8, 2023 Filing 17 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint,, by Defendants Kevin Faherty, Barry J Forester, Raymond J Marszalowicz, National Benefit Builders, Inc.. (Wiens, Adam)
December 8, 2023 Filing 16 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Brandon Paul Friede on behalf of All Defendants Attorney Brandon Paul Friede added to party Kevin Faherty(pty:dft), Attorney Brandon Paul Friede added to party Barry J Forester(pty:dft), Attorney Brandon Paul Friede added to party Raymond J Marszalowicz(pty:dft), Attorney Brandon Paul Friede added to party National Benefit Builders, Inc.(pty:dft) (Friede, Brandon)
December 8, 2023 Filing 15 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Adam B. Wiens on behalf of All Defendants Attorney Adam B. Wiens added to party Kevin Faherty(pty:dft), Attorney Adam B. Wiens added to party Barry J Forester(pty:dft), Attorney Adam B. Wiens added to party Raymond J Marszalowicz(pty:dft), Attorney Adam B. Wiens added to party National Benefit Builders, Inc.(pty:dft) (Wiens, Adam)
December 5, 2023 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by OptumRx PBM of Illinois, Inc.. Barry J Forester served on 11/18/2023, answer due 12/11/2023. (Monafo, James)
November 27, 2023 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by OptumRx PBM of Illinois, Inc.. Kevin Faherty served on 11/17/2023, answer due 12/8/2023. (Monafo, James)
November 21, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Samuel B. Thomas on behalf of OptumRx PBM of Illinois, Inc.Attorney Samuel B. Thomas added to party OptumRx PBM of Illinois, Inc.(pty:pla) (Thomas, Samuel)
November 21, 2023 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by OptumRx PBM of Illinois, Inc.. Raymond J Marszalowicz served on 11/18/2023, answer due 12/11/2023. (Monafo, James)
November 21, 2023 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by OptumRx PBM of Illinois, Inc.. National Benefit Builders, Inc. served on 11/17/2023, answer due 12/8/2023. (Monafo, James)
November 21, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by James F. Monafo on behalf of OptumRx PBM of Illinois, Inc. (Monafo, James)
November 21, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Tanya M. Maerz on behalf of OptumRx PBM of Illinois, Inc.Attorney Tanya M. Maerz added to party OptumRx PBM of Illinois, Inc.(pty:pla) (Maerz, Tanya)
November 21, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jeffrey D. Whitney on behalf of OptumRx PBM of Illinois, Inc.Attorney Jeffrey D. Whitney added to party OptumRx PBM of Illinois, Inc.(pty:pla) (Whitney, Jeffrey)
November 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE AND SETTING DEADLINE FOR FILING OF CONSENT/NON-CONSENT FORM Plaintiff shall promptly serve Defendants. On or before February 20, 2023, the parties shall complete and file the Consent/Non-Consent Form (see Dkt. #), indicating either unanimous consent of the parties or that consent has been declined. Please note that this date may be earlier than the default deadlines contemplated by D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(c)(4). A Scheduling/Planning Conference pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.16(b) shall be held on: March 5, 2024 at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom C-203, Second Floor, Byron G. Rogers U.S. Courthouse, 1929 Stout Street, Denver, Colorado 80294. The Scheduling Conference will be conducted via telephone. The parties are directed to call the conference line as a participant at (888) 398-2342, Access Code 5755390# at the scheduled time. Absent exceptional circumstances, no request for rescheduling any appearance in this court will be entertained unless a motion is filed no less than FIVE (5) business days in advance of the date of appearance.PLEASE READ ATTACHED ORDER. By Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 11/15/2023. (norlin, )
November 15, 2023 Filing 5 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (tgall, )
November 15, 2023 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Text Only Entry. (tgall, )
November 15, 2023 Filing 3 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/Procedures: #1 Complaint, filed by attorney James F. Monafo. DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - counsel must submit a change of contact request through the Manage my Account tab at the PACER website at https://www.pacer.gov/, pursuant to D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(c) and 3.5 of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases).(Text Only Entry). (tgall, )
November 15, 2023 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent United Health Group, Inc. for OptumRx PBM of Illinois. (Monafo, James)
November 15, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number ACODC-9396236)Attorney James F. Monafo added to party OptumRx PBM of Illinois(pty:pla), filed by OptumRx PBM of Illinois. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - HealthTrans Discount Card Program Agreement with NBBI and Amendments, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons Summons in a Civil Action - NBBI, #4 Summons Summons in a Civil Action - Ray Marszalowicz, #5 Summons Summons in a Civil Action - Kevin Faherty, #6 Summons Summons in a Civil Action - Barry Forester)(Monafo, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: OptumRx PBM of Illinois, Inc. v. National Benefit Builders, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: OptumRx PBM of Illinois, Inc.
Represented By: James F. Monafo
Represented By: Jeffrey D. Whitney
Represented By: Samuel B. Thomas
Represented By: Tanya M. Maerz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Benefit Builders, Inc.
Represented By: Adam B. Wiens
Represented By: Brandon Paul Friede
Represented By: Jonathan S. Bender
Represented By: Nicholas W. Katz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raymond J Marszalowicz
Represented By: Brandon Paul Friede
Represented By: Adam B. Wiens
Represented By: Jonathan S. Bender
Represented By: Nicholas W. Katz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Faherty
Represented By: Adam B. Wiens
Represented By: Brandon Paul Friede
Represented By: Jonathan S. Bender
Represented By: Nicholas W. Katz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barry J Forester
Represented By: Adam B. Wiens
Represented By: Brandon Paul Friede
Represented By: Jonathan S. Bender
Represented By: Nicholas W. Katz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?