Barnett et al v. Aquila Services Corp
Plaintiff: Kyle Barnett, Luke Miederhoff, Michael Billadeau and Damonte Couch
Defendant: Aquila Services Corp doing business as Denver Metro Protective Services
Case Number: 1:2023cv03039
Filed: November 16, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Referring Judge: Scott T Varholak
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 12, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 12, 2024 Filing 16 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by Aquila Services Corp.(Mackender, Darin)
January 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 1/11/2024. (morti,)
January 11, 2024 Filing 14 MINUTE ENTRY for Scheduling Conference held before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 1/11/2024. Discovery due by 8/7/2024. Dispositive Motions due by 9/20/2024. The Scheduling Order is signed and entered on January 11, 2024. FTR: A402. (morti,)
January 4, 2024 Filing 13 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Darin L. Mackender on behalf of Aquila Services CorpAttorney Darin L. Mackender added to party Aquila Services Corp(pty:dft) (Mackender, Darin)
January 4, 2024 Filing 12 Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiffs Kyle Barnett, Michael Billadeau, Damonte Couch, Luke Miederhoff. (Galera, Joseph)
December 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other specifically-referred motions, and (4) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. By District Judge Gordon P Gallagher on 12/28/2023. Text Only Entry (norlin, )
December 28, 2023 Filing 10 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #9 Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to District Judge Gordon P Gallagher and drawn to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak for all further proceedings. All future pleadings should be designated as 23-cv-03039-GPG. (Text Only Entry) (jtorr, )
December 27, 2023 Filing 9 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiffs Kyle Barnett, Michael Billadeau, Damonte Couch, Luke Miederhoff All parties do not consent.. (Dodson, Penn)
December 14, 2023 Filing 8 STIPULATION to Answer Date by Plaintiffs Kyle Barnett, Michael Billadeau, Damonte Couch, Luke Miederhoff. (Galera, Joseph)
November 21, 2023 Filing 7 SUPPLEMENT/AMENDMENT to #1 Complaint,, Plaintiffs' Verification of Complaint by Plaintiffs Kyle Barnett, Michael Billadeau, Damonte Couch, Luke Miederhoff. (Dodson, Penn)
November 17, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Penn Anderson Dodson on behalf of Kyle Barnett, Michael Billadeau, Damonte Couch, Luke MiederhoffAttorney Penn Anderson Dodson added to party Kyle Barnett(pty:pla), Attorney Penn Anderson Dodson added to party Michael Billadeau (pty:pla), Attorney Penn Anderson Dodson added to party Damonte Couch(pty:pla), Attorney Penn Anderson Dodson added to party Luke Miederhoff(pty:pla) (Dodson, Penn)
November 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Setting Deadline for Filing Election Concerning Consent/Non-Consent to Magistrate Jurisdiction Form and Setting Scheduling Conference. Consent Form due by 12/28/2023. Joint Proposed Scheduling Order due 1/4/2024. Scheduling Conference set for 1/11/2024 11:00 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. By Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 11/16/2023. (schap, )
November 16, 2023 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (efoga, )
November 16, 2023 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Text Only Entry (efoga, )
November 16, 2023 Filing 2 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Aquila Services Corporation by Plaintiffs Kyle Barnett, Michael Billadeau, Damonte Couch, Luke Miederhoff. (Galera, Joseph)
November 16, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against AQUILA SERVICES CORPORATION (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number ACODC-9399048)Attorney Joseph W. Galera added to party Kyle Barnett(pty:pla), Attorney Joseph W. Galera added to party Michael Billadeau (pty:pla), Attorney Joseph W. Galera added to party Damonte Couch(pty:pla), Attorney Joseph W. Galera added to party Luke Miederhoff(pty:pla), filed by Damonte Couch, Kyle Barnett, Michael Billadeau, Luke Miederhoff. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Galera, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barnett et al v. Aquila Services Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kyle Barnett
Represented By: Joseph W. Galera
Represented By: Penn Anderson Dodson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luke Miederhoff
Represented By: Joseph W. Galera
Represented By: Penn Anderson Dodson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Billadeau
Represented By: Joseph W. Galera
Represented By: Penn Anderson Dodson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Damonte Couch
Represented By: Joseph W. Galera
Represented By: Penn Anderson Dodson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aquila Services Corp doing business as Denver Metro Protective Services
Represented By: Darin L. Mackender
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?