Prasolov et al v. Kuhnel et al
Plaintiff: Alizhon Prasolov and ALP Transportation, LLC
Defendant: Karla Kuhnel and Lincoln Trucking Lightning Division, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2023cv03060
Filed: November 17, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Michael E Hegarty
Referring Judge: Nina Y Wang
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 24 SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 1/8/2024. (cthom, )
January 8, 2024 Filing 23 COURTROOM MINUTES for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty: Scheduling Conference held on 1/8/2024. FTR: A501. (cthom, )
December 22, 2023 Filing 22 Proposed Scheduling Order by Defendants Karla Kuhnel, Lincoln Trucking Lightning Division, Inc.. (Olson, Tyler)
December 13, 2023 Filing 21 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Karla Kuhnel Nebraska Commercial Drivers License, #2 Exhibit B- Nebraska Voter Registration, #3 Exhibit C- Karla Kuhnel Affidavit of Service)(Olson, Tyler)
December 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER REFERRING CASE: This case is referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty for non-dispositive matters. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, and (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions. Court-sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the request of the parties by motion, this Court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. Alternatively, the Magistrate Judge, at his discretion, may convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. Counsel for the Parties and all counsel who may later enter an appearance shall review and familiarize themselves with the undersigned's Practice Standards, as well as the Practice Standards of the assigned Magistrate Judge. By Judge Nina Y. Wang on 12/12/2023. Text Only Entry (nywlc6, )
December 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MINUTE ORDER: Defendant Lincoln Trucking Lightning Division, Inc., removed this case on November 17, 2023, invoking this Court's diversity jurisdiction under 28 U.S.C. 1332. [Doc. #1 at 2]. Under Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, "[i]n an action in which jurisdiction is based on diversity under 28 U.S.C. 1332(a), a party... must, unless the court orders otherwise, file a disclosure statement" that "name[s]--and identif[ies] the citizenship of--every individual or entity whose citizenship is attributed to that party or intervenor." Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(2). This disclosure statement is to be filed at the time of the party's "first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court." Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(b)(1). Upon review of the docket, it appears that Defendant Karla Kuhnel has yet to file the appropriate disclosure statement, although she has already filed an Answer to the Complaint. See [Doc. #13 ]. Accordingly, on or before December 18, 2023, Ms. Kuhnel SHALL FILE her Rule 7.1 disclosure statement. By Judge Nina Y. Wang on 12/12/2023. Text Only Entry (nywlc6, )
December 12, 2023 Filing 18 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #17 Order. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Nina Y. Wang and drawn to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. All future pleadings should be designated as 23-cv-03060-NYW. (Text Only Entry) (cmadr, )
December 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 12 December 2023. Pursuant to the consent form filed by the parties declining consent under D.C.Colo.LCivR 40.1(c) #16 , the Court directs the Clerk of the Court to reassign this case under D.C.Colo.LCivR 40.1(a). This Court may continue on the case to hear matters referred by the district judge under 28 U.S.C. 636(b), Fed. R. Civ. P. 72 and D.C.Colo.LCivR 72.1(c). (cmadr, )
December 11, 2023 Filing 16 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendants Karla Kuhnel, Lincoln Trucking Lightning Division, Inc. All parties do not consent.. (Olson, Tyler)
December 4, 2023 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Alizhon Prasolov. Karla Kuhnel served on 11/18/2023, answer due 12/11/2023. (Fields, Timothy)
November 30, 2023 Filing 14 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Olson, Tyler)
November 29, 2023 Filing 13 ANSWER to #3 Complaint Attorney Tyler Douglas Olson added to party Karla Kuhnel(pty:dft) by Karla Kuhnel.(Olson, Tyler)
November 27, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Bethany Anne Pribila on behalf of ALP Transportation, LLC, Alizhon PrasolovAttorney Bethany Anne Pribila added to party ALP Transportation, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Bethany Anne Pribila added to party Alizhon Prasolov(pty:pla) (Pribila, Bethany)
November 27, 2023 Filing 11 STATEMENT Corporate Disclosure by Plaintiff ALP Transportation, LLC. (Fields, Timothy)
November 27, 2023 Filing 10 STATEMENT Disclosure by Plaintiff Alizhon Prasolov. (Fields, Timothy)
November 27, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Timothy L. Fields on behalf of ALP Transportation, LLC, Alizhon PrasolovAttorney Timothy L. Fields added to party ALP Transportation, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Timothy L. Fields added to party Alizhon Prasolov(pty:pla) (Fields, Timothy)
November 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 11/22/2023. Magistrate Judge Consent Form due 12/26/2023. Proposed Scheduling Order due 12/29/2023. Scheduling Conference set for 1/8/2024 at 10:45 a.m. in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. (jtorr, )
November 21, 2023 Filing 7 ANSWER to #3 Complaint Attorney Tyler Douglas Olson added to party Lincoln Trucking Lightning Division, Inc.(pty:dft) by Lincoln Trucking Lightning Division, Inc..(Olson, Tyler)
November 17, 2023 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (efoga, )
November 17, 2023 Filing 5 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Text Only Entry (efoga, )
November 17, 2023 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT/RETURN of Service of Complaint, District Court Civil (CV) Case Cover Sheet for Initial Pleading of Complaint, Counterclaim, Cross-Claim or Third Party Complaint, and District Court Civil Summons upon Lincoln Trucking Lighting Division, Inc. on 10/18/2023 (efoga, )
November 17, 2023 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Karla Kuhnel, Lincoln Trucking Lightning Division, Inc., filed by Alizhon Prasolov, ALP Transportation, LLC.(efoga, )
November 17, 2023 Filing 2 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (efoga, )
November 17, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Lincoln Trucking Lightning Division, Inc. from District Court Garfield County State of Colorado, Case Number 2023CV30149. (Filing fee $ 402, Receipt Number ACODC-9402665), filed by Lincoln Trucking Lightning Division, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit A Complaint, #4 Exhibit B Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Exhibit C Affidavit of Service, #6 Exhibit D Plaintiff Prasolov Colorado Commercial Drivers License, #7 Exhibit E Colorado Secretary of State, #8 Exhibit F Nebraska Secretary of State, #9 Exhibit G Nebraska Voter Registration, #10 Exhibit H Karla Kuhnel Nebraska Commercial Drivers License, #11 Exhibit I Summons for Karla Kuhnel, #12 Exhibit J Summons for Lincoln Trucking, #13 Exhibit K Delay Reduction Order, #14 Exhibit L Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #15 Exhibit M State Court Register of Actions)(Rider, Seth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Prasolov et al v. Kuhnel et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alizhon Prasolov
Represented By: Bethany Anne Pribila
Represented By: Timothy L. Fields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALP Transportation, LLC
Represented By: Bethany Anne Pribila
Represented By: Timothy L. Fields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karla Kuhnel
Represented By: Seth Adam Rider
Represented By: Tyler Douglas Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lincoln Trucking Lightning Division, Inc.
Represented By: Seth Adam Rider
Represented By: Tyler Douglas Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?