Velasquez v. Sanofi US Services Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Shirley Diane Velasquez
Defendant: Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S., Inc. and Sanofi-Aventis US LLC doing business as Winthrop US
Case Number: 1:2023cv03078
Filed: November 21, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Maritza Dominguez Braswell
Referring Judge: Charlotte N Sweeney
2 Judge: Scott T Varholak
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 12, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Maritza Dominguez Braswell for non-dispositive matters. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of Local Civ. R. 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) pursuant to Local Civ. R. 16.6 and at the discretion of the Magistrate Judge, convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. By Judge Charlotte N. Sweeney on 12/12/2023. Text Only Entry (cnsja. )
December 11, 2023 Filing 16 Case Reassigned. In accordance with D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(a) and (d)(4)(B) with approval of the Chief Judge, this case is reassigned to United States District Judge Charlotte N. Sweeney and drawn to Magistrate Judge Maritza Dominguez Braswell. All future pleadings should be designated as 23-cv-03078-CNS. (Text Only Entry) (agarc, )
November 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to the #14 Notice of Pending Settlement and Request to Stay Proceedings, the parties shall file dismissal papers or a joint report regarding the status of settlement on or before 5/24/2024. The deadlines and hearings, including the Status Conference set 12/21/2023, are vacated. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 11/29/2023. Text Only Entry (stvlc5, )
November 28, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE Notice of Pending Settlement and Request to Stay Proceedings by Defendants Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis US LLC (Yaft, Mariham)
November 28, 2023 Filing 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Yaft, Mariham)
November 28, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Mariham Yaft on behalf of Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis US LLCAttorney Mariham Yaft added to party Sanofi US Services Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Mariham Yaft added to party Sanofi-Aventis US LLC(pty:dft) (Yaft, Mariham)
November 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER This matter is before the Court sua sponte. A Status Conference is set for 12/21/2023 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. The parties shall file the Consent/Nonconsent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form by 12/14/2023. SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 11/21/2023. Text Only Entry (stvlc5, )
November 21, 2023 Filing 10 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (blaws)
November 21, 2023 Filing 9 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Text Only Entry. (blaws)
November 21, 2023 Filing 8 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (blaws)
November 21, 2023 Filing 7 Case transferred in from District of Louisiana Eastern; Case Number 2:20-cv-00641. File, transfer order and docket sheet received
November 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TRANSFER ORDER - Case transferred to District of Colorado. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 10/23/2023. (MDL 2740, DOC 16511)(my) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/21/2023.]
September 27, 2023 Filing 5 Joint Designation of Record for MDL Transfer by Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. Joint Designation of General and Case-Specified MDL Records to Be Included Upon Remand (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(McRae, Christopher) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/21/2023.]
February 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PRETRIAL ORDERS. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo.(am) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/21/2023.]
February 27, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (ss) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/21/2023.]
February 21, 2020 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Jane Triche Milazzo and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (cc) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/21/2023.]
February 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Sanofi U.S. Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-8165915) filed by Shirley Diane Velasquez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Sanofi U.S. Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC.)Attorney Russell T. Abney added to party Shirley Diane Velasquez(pty:pla).(Abney, Russell) Modified text on 2/27/2020 (ss). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/21/2023.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Velasquez v. Sanofi US Services Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi US Services Inc.
Represented By: Mariham Yaft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi-Aventis U.S., Inc.
Represented By: Mariham Yaft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi-Aventis US LLC doing business as Winthrop US
Represented By: Mariham Yaft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shirley Diane Velasquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?