Zavala v. Sanofi US Services Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Brenda Zavala
Defendant: Sanofi US Services Inc., McKesson Corporation, Hospira Worldwide, LLC, Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S., Inc., Sanofi-Aventis US LLC, Sandoz, Inc., Accord Healthcare, Inc., McKesson Packaging, Hospira Worldwide, Inc., Hospira, Inc., Sun Pharma Global FZE and Caraco Pharmaceutical Laboratories, Ltd.
Case Number: 1:2023cv03090
Filed: November 21, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Maritza Dominguez Braswell
Referring Judge: S Kato Crews
2 Judge: Charlotte N Sweeney
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 18, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MINUTE ORDER: A Scheduling Conference is set for February 1, 2024, at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Maritza Dominguez Braswell. The Conference will be conducted by video using the attached instructions. By Magistrate Judge Maritza Dominguez Braswell on 1/18/2024. Text Only Entry (mdblc1)
January 18, 2024 Filing 19 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by John Christopher Elliott on behalf of Brenda Zavala Attorney John Christopher Elliott added to party Brenda Zavala (pty:pla) (Elliott, John)
January 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MINUTE ORDER: The #17 Proposed Scheduling Order is signed on behalf of Plaintiff by John Christopher Elliott. However, Mr. Elliott has yet to enter an appearance in the case. Mr. Elliott shall enter his appearance before the Court will consider the Proposed Scheduling Order. By Magistrate Judge Maritza Dominguez Braswell on 1/17/2024. Text Only Entry (mdblc1, )
January 16, 2024 Filing 17 Proposed Scheduling Order by Defendants Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis US LLC. (Yaft, Mariham)
December 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE DEADLINES. Proposed Scheduling Order due 1/16/2024. By Magistrate Judge Maritza Dominguez Braswell on 12/13/2023. (evaug)
December 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Maritza Dominguez Braswell for non-dispositive matters. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of Local Civ. R. 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) pursuant to Local Civ. R. 16.6 and at the discretion of the Magistrate Judge, convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. By Judge Charlotte N. Sweeney on 12/12/2023. Text Only Entry (cnsja.)
December 11, 2023 Filing 14 Case Reassigned. In accordance with D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(a) and (d)(4)(B) with approval of the Chief Judge, this case is reassigned to United States District Judge Charlotte N. Sweeney and drawn to Magistrate Judge Maritza Dominguez Braswell. All future pleadings should be designated as 23-cv-03090-CNS. (Text Only Entry) (agarc, )
November 29, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Christopher J. Kaufman on behalf of Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis US LLCAttorney Christopher J. Kaufman added to party Sanofi US Services Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Christopher J. Kaufman added to party Sanofi-Aventis US LLC(pty:dft) (Kaufman, Christopher)
November 29, 2023 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Yaft, Mariham)
November 29, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Mariham Yaft on behalf of Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis US LLCAttorney Mariham Yaft added to party Sanofi US Services Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Mariham Yaft added to party Sanofi-Aventis US LLC(pty:dft) (Yaft, Mariham)
November 21, 2023 Filing 10 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (blaws)
November 21, 2023 Filing 9 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Text Only Entry. (blaws)
November 21, 2023 Filing 8 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (blaws)
November 21, 2023 Filing 7 Case transferred in from District of Louisiana Eastern; Case Number 2:19-cv-13614. File, transfer order and docket sheet received
November 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TRANSFER ORDER-Case transferred to District of Colorado. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 10/23/2023. (MDL 2740, Doc. 16511)(go) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/21/2023.]
September 27, 2023 Filing 5 Joint Designation of Record for MDL Transfer by Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. Joint Designation of General and Case-Specified MDL Records to Be Included Upon Remand (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(McRae, Christopher) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/21/2023.]
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PRETRIAL ORDERS. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo.(am) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/21/2023.]
November 19, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Accord Healthcare, Inc., Hospira Worldwide, LLC, Hospira, Inc., McKesson Corporation, Sandoz, Inc., Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, Sun Pharma Global FZE, Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons)(ss) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/21/2023.]
November 13, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Jane Triche Milazzo and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (ess) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/21/2023.]
November 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Accord Healthcare, Inc., Hospira Worldwide, LLC, Hospira, Inc., McKesson Corporation, Sandoz Inc., Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, Sun Pharma Global FZE, Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-7970274) filed by Brenda Zavala. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons)Attorney John Christopher Elliott added to party Brenda Zavala (pty:pla).(Elliott, John) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/21/2023.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zavala v. Sanofi US Services Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi US Services Inc.
Represented By: Christopher J. Kaufman
Represented By: Mariham Yaft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hospira Worldwide, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi-Aventis U.S., Inc.
Represented By: Christopher J. Kaufman
Represented By: Mariham Yaft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi-Aventis US LLC
Represented By: Christopher J. Kaufman
Represented By: Mariham Yaft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandoz, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Accord Healthcare, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Packaging
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hospira Worldwide, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hospira, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sun Pharma Global FZE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caraco Pharmaceutical Laboratories, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Zavala
Represented By: John Christopher Elliott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?