Siegle et al v. Re/Max LLC
Plaintiff: William Siegle and Re/Max Hometown
Defendant: Re/Max LLC
Case Number: 1:2023cv03102
Filed: November 21, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Susan Prose
Referring Judge: Regina M Rodriguez
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2024 Filing 22 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant Re/Max LLC All parties do not consent.. (Olsen, Thomas)
January 16, 2024 Filing 21 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Derek Guy Timms on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Derek Guy Timms added to party William Siegle(pty:pla) (Timms, Derek)
January 2, 2024 Filing 20 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Carolyn Marie Welter on behalf of Re/Max LLCAttorney Carolyn Marie Welter added to party Re/Max LLC(pty:dft) (Welter, Carolyn)
January 2, 2024 Filing 19 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Thomas Austin Olsen on behalf of Re/Max LLCAttorney Thomas Austin Olsen added to party Re/Max LLC(pty:dft) (Olsen, Thomas)
November 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER SETTING CONSENT DEADLINE AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Susan Prose on 11/30/2023. Consent Form due by 1/17/2024. Proposed Scheduling Order due 1/24/2024. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 1/31/2024 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom C205 before Magistrate Judge Susan Prose. The parties shall attend by calling 571-353-2301, Guest meeting ID- 868150043. All attendees shall please mute their phone when not speaking and not use speaker phone. (trvo, )
November 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Susan B. Prose. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of Local Civ. R. 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions, and (5) pursuant to Local Civ. R. 16.6 and at the discretion of the Magistrate Judge, convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. SO ORDERED by Judge Regina M. Rodriguez on 11/22/2023. Text Only Entry (rmrja)
November 21, 2023 Filing 16 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (tgall, )
November 21, 2023 Filing 15 Case assigned to Judge Regina M. Rodriguez and drawn to Magistrate Judge Susan Prose. Text Only Entry. (tgall, )
November 21, 2023 Filing 14 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry). (tgall, )
November 21, 2023 Filing 13 Case transferred in from District of New Jersey; Case Number 1:23-cv-01773. File, transfer order and docket sheet received.
November 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #5 Motion for Transfer or in the Alternative, Dismiss; Defendant's request to transfer this action is GRANTED and as a result Defendant's request to dismiss in the alternative is DENIED as moot; the Clerk is directed to transfer this action to the District Court of Colorado. Signed by Judge Karen M. Williams on 11/21/2023. (ssp, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 11/21/2023.]
November 21, 2023 Filing 11 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Karen M. Williams: Motion Hearing held on the record on 11/21/2023 re #5 MOTION to Change Venue or Alternatively to Dismiss Complaint; oral opinion read into the record; Motion to Transfer Venue is GRANTED; order to be entered. (Court Reporter, Sharon Ricci (267-249-8780)) (ssp, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 11/21/2023.]
November 21, 2023 ***Civil Case Terminated. (ssp, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 11/21/2023.]
October 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER The Court has scheduled Oral Argument re #5 MOTION to Change Venue or Alternatively to Dismiss Complaint filed by RE/MAX, LLC, for 11/21/2023 at 11:00 AM in Camden - Courtroom 4A. So Ordered by Judge Karen M. Williams on 10/16/23. (nar) [Transferred from New Jersey on 11/21/2023.]
April 28, 2023 Filing 9 Certification of Joint Certification re Citizenship on behalf of RE/MAX, LLC. (FREIJOMIL, DERRICK) [Transferred from New Jersey on 11/21/2023.]
April 24, 2023 Filing 8 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by RE/MAX, LLC re #5 MOTION to Change Venue or Alternatively to Dismiss Complaint (FREIJOMIL, DERRICK) [Transferred from New Jersey on 11/21/2023.]
April 17, 2023 Filing 7 BRIEF in Opposition filed by All Plaintiffs re #5 MOTION to Change Venue or Alternatively to Dismiss Complaint (TIMMS, DERRICK) [Transferred from New Jersey on 11/21/2023.]
April 3, 2023 Notice of Judicial Preferences. #Click here for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (ssp, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 11/21/2023.]
March 30, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by DERRICK G. TIMMS on behalf of All Plaintiffs (TIMMS, DERRICK) [Transferred from New Jersey on 11/21/2023.]
March 30, 2023 Set Deadlines as to #5 MOTION to Change Venue or Alternatively to Dismiss Complaint. Motion set for 5/1/2023 before Judge Karen M. Williams. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (amv) [Transferred from New Jersey on 11/21/2023.]
March 30, 2023 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Notice of Appearance #6 submitted by DEREK TIMMS on 3/30/2023 appears to have address information that does not match the court's records for this case. Please refer to the court's website at www.njd.uscourts.gov for information and instructions on maintaining your account. (amv) [Transferred from New Jersey on 11/21/2023.]
March 29, 2023 Filing 5 MOTION to Change Venue or Alternatively to Dismiss Complaint by RE/MAX, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Brief Brief of RE/MAX, LLC, #2 Declaration Declaration of D. Freijomil, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Superior Court Complaint, #4 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(FREIJOMIL, DERRICK) [Transferred from New Jersey on 11/21/2023.]
March 29, 2023 Filing 4 Exhibit to #1 Notice of Removal,, Civil Case Cover Sheet by RE/MAX, LLC. (FREIJOMIL, DERRICK) [Transferred from New Jersey on 11/21/2023.]
March 29, 2023 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by RE/MAX, LLC identifying RMCO, LLC, RIHI, Inc., and RE/MAX Holdings, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (FREIJOMIL, DERRICK) [Transferred from New Jersey on 11/21/2023.]
March 29, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by TYLER JOHN WICKS on behalf of RE/MAX, LLC (WICKS, TYLER) [Transferred from New Jersey on 11/21/2023.]
March 29, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by RE/MAX, LLC from Superior Court of New Jersey, Law Division, Burlington County, case number BUR-L-230-23. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-14206431), filed by RE/MAX, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Track Assignment Notice, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 - Amended Designation of Trial Counsel, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4 - Affidavit of Service, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5 - Substitution of Counsel, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6 - Periodic Report of RIHI, Inc., #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7 - Periodic Report of RE/MAX Holdings, Inc., #8 Declaration Declaration of S. Jamison)(FREIJOMIL, DERRICK) [Transferred from New Jersey on 11/21/2023.]
March 29, 2023 Judge Karen M. Williams and Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Pascal added. (dmw) [Transferred from New Jersey on 11/21/2023.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Siegle et al v. Re/Max LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Siegle
Represented By: Derek Guy Timms
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Re/Max Hometown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Re/Max LLC
Represented By: Carolyn Marie Welter
Represented By: Thomas Austin Olsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?