Milner et al v. Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Timothy Milner and Carol Milner
Defendant: Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company and Nationwide Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2023cv03131
Filed: November 27, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Daniel D Domenico
Referring Judge: N Reid Neureiter
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2024 Filing 19 AMENDED COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Nationwide Property and Casualty Insurance Company, filed by Carol Milner, Timothy Milner.(Sell, Yvonne)
December 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER GRANTING #17 Unopposed Motion to Amend the Complaint. The plaintiffs must file and serve their amended complaint on all parties no later than fourteen days from the date of this Order. The defendants must answer or otherwise respond to the complaint within the time provided in Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 15(a)(3). SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 12/19/2023. Text Only Entry (dddlc1, )
December 19, 2023 Filing 17 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify the Complaint and Jury Demand by Plaintiffs Carol Milner, Timothy Milner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Sell, Yvonne)
December 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of Local Civ. R. 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions, and (5) pursuant to Local Civ. R. 16.6 and at the discretion of the Magistrate Judge, convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 12/13/2023. Text Only Entry. (rkeec)
December 13, 2023 Filing 15 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #14 Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Daniel D. Domenico. All future pleadings should be designated as 23-cv-03131-DDD. (Text Only Entry) (norlin, )
December 13, 2023 Filing 14 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendants Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company All parties do not consent.. (Werner, Katelyn)
December 12, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Yvonne L. Sell on behalf of Carol Milner, Timothy MilnerAttorney Yvonne L. Sell added to party Carol Milner(pty:pla), Attorney Yvonne L. Sell added to party Timothy Milner(pty:pla) (Sell, Yvonne)
December 4, 2023 Filing 12 ANSWER to #4 Complaint and Jury Demand by Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company.(Werner, Katelyn)
December 4, 2023 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Werner, Katelyn)
November 30, 2023 Filing 10 Utility Resetting Hearing Due to Clerk's error: Text Only Entry Scheduling Conference set for 3/6/2024 10:00 AM in Courtroom C203 before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. (norlin, ) Modified on 12/1/2023 to correct formatting(norlin, ).
November 29, 2023 Filing 9 Utility Setting/Resetting Deadlines/Hearings: Text Only Entry Scheduling Conference set for 3/6/2023 10:00 AM in Courtroom C203 before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. (norlin, )
November 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE AND SETTING DEADLINE FOR FILING OF CONSENT/NONCONSENT FORM On or before February 21, 2024, the parties shall complete and file the Consent/Non-Consent Form (see Dkt. #7), indicating either unanimous consent of the parties or that consent has been declined. Please note that this date may be earlier than the default deadlines contemplated by D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(c)(4). A Scheduling/Planning Conference pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.16(b) shall be held on: March 6, 2024 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom C-203, Second Floor, Byron G. Rogers U.S. Courthouse, 1929 Stout Street, Denver, Colorado 80294. The Scheduling Conference will be conducted via telephone. The parties are directed to call the conference line as a participant at (888) 398-2342, Access Code 5755390# at the scheduled time. Absent exceptional circumstances, no request for rescheduling any appearance in this court will be entertained unless a motion is filed no less than FIVE (5) business days in advance of the date of appearance. By Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 11/27/2023. PLEASE READ ATTACHED ORDER. (norlin, )
November 27, 2023 Filing 7 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (blaws)
November 27, 2023 Filing 6 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Text Only Entry. (blaws)
November 27, 2023 Filing 5 RETURNS of Service of Summons, Complaint, Civil Case Cover Sheet upon Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company on 11/07/2023 (Attachments: #1 Return of Service re: Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company) (blaws)
November 27, 2023 Filing 4 STATE COURT COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, filed by Carol Milner, Timothy Milner. (blaws)
November 27, 2023 Filing 3 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (blaws)
November 27, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Ashley Kline by Ashley K. Kline on behalf of Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Nationwide Mutual Insurance CompanyAttorney Ashley K. Kline added to party Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Ashley K. Kline added to party Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Kline, Ashley)
November 27, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company from District Court, County of Boulder, State of Colorado, Case Number 2023CV82. (Filing fee $ 402, Receipt Number ACODC-9412252), filed by Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Complaint, #3 Exhibit B - ROS, #4 Exhibit C - Policy Excerpt, #5 Exhibit D - Voter Registrations, #6 Exhibit E - SOS Search, #7 Exhibit F - Ohio Secretary of State, #8 Exhibit G - State Civil Cover Sheet, #9 State Court Civil Cover Sheet, #10 State Court Complaint, #11 State Court Summons, #12 State Court Request for Extension, #13 State Court Order Granting Request, #14 State Court Service of Summons, #15 State Court Entry of Appearance)(Werner, Katelyn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Milner et al v. Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Milner
Represented By: Yvonne L. Sell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol Milner
Represented By: Yvonne L. Sell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Ashley K. Kline
Represented By: Katelyn Shea Werner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: Ashley K. Kline
Represented By: Katelyn Shea Werner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationwide Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Ashley K. Kline
Represented By: Katelyn Shea Werner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?