Nguyen v. Geico Casualty Co.
Plaintiff: Thuy Vy Nguyen
Defendant: Geico Casualty Co. and GEICO Indemnity Company
Case Number: 1:2023cv03147
Filed: November 28, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Referring Judge: Kathryn A Starnella
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 26, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 26, 2024 Filing 28 SUMMONS REQUEST as to GEICO Indemnity Co re #27 Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Thuy Vy Nguyen. (Garvey, Timothy)
January 26, 2024 Filing 27 AMENDED COMPLAINT against GEICO Indemnity Company, filed by Thuy Vy Nguyen.(Garvey, Timothy)
January 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 26 SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella on 1/17/24. (lgale, )
January 17, 2024 Filing 25 MINUTE ENTRY for Scheduling Conference held before Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella on 1/17/2024. Discovery due by 10/18/2024. Dispositive Motions due by 11/18/2024. FTR: KAS Courtroom C204. (Attachments: #1 Discovery Procedures) (lgale, )
January 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 24 PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella on 11 January 2024. (cmadr, )
January 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella on 11 January 2024. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Unopposed Motion for Entry of Protective Order #21 is GRANTED. The Protective Order [#21-1] supplied by Defendant is accepted and entered as an Order of the Court as of the date of this Minute Order. (cmadr, )
January 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MEMORANDUM regarding #21 Unopposed MOTION for Protective Order filed by Geico Casualty Co. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella, by District Judge Gordon P Gallagher on 1/10/2024. Text Only Entry (schap, )
January 10, 2024 Filing 21 Unopposed MOTION for Protective Order by Defendant Geico Casualty Co.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Protective Order)(Falls, Gregory)
January 10, 2024 Filing 20 Proposed Scheduling Order by Defendant Geico Casualty Co.. (Falls, Gregory)
January 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 19 PRE-SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella on 6 January 2024. (cmadr, )
December 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER REFERRING CASE to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other specifically-referred motions, and (4) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. By District Judge Gordon P Gallagher on 12/29/2023. Text Only Entry (schap, )
December 29, 2023 Filing 17 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #16 Order of Recusal. This case is randomly reassigned to District Judge Gordon P Gallagher and drawn to Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella for all further proceedings. All future pleadings should be designated as 23-cv-03147-GPG-KAS. (Text Only Entry) (jtorr, )
December 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER OF RECUSAL by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 12/29/2023. ORDERED that the clerk's office shall reassign this case by random draw. (jtorr, )
December 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella for non-dispositive matters. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, and (4) conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding, by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 12/22/2023. Text Only Entry (pabsec, )
December 22, 2023 Filing 14 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #13 Order. This case is randomly reassigned to Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer and drawn to Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella. All future pleadings should be designated as 23-cv-03147-PAB. (Text Only Entry) (cmadr, )
December 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella on 22 December 2023. The signed Consent-Non-Consent Form #12 indicates that at least one party has declined to consent. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this case shall be assigned to a District Judge under D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(c)(8) and D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(a). (cmadr, )
December 22, 2023 Filing 12 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant Geico Casualty Co. All parties do not consent.. (Falls, Gregory)
December 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella on 13 December 2023. Proposed Scheduling Order due 1/10/2024. Scheduling Conference set for 1/17/2024 10:30 AM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella. (Attachments: #1 Continuation of Main Document, #2 Continuation of Main Document) (cmadr, )
December 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER. Pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(c)(4), the deadline to file the Consent/Non-Consent to United States Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form [#7] is January 3, 2024. by Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella on 12/13/2023. Text Only Entry (kaslc2, )
November 28, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Sean Michael Dormer on behalf of Thuy Vy NguyenAttorney Sean Michael Dormer added to party Thuy Vy Nguyen(pty:pla) (Dormer, Sean)
November 28, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Timothy M. Garvey on behalf of Thuy Vy NguyenAttorney Timothy M. Garvey added to party Thuy Vy Nguyen(pty:pla) (Garvey, Timothy)
November 28, 2023 Filing 7 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (efoga, )
November 28, 2023 Filing 6 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella. Text Only Entry (efoga, )
November 28, 2023 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT/RETURN of Service of Complaint, Cover Sheet, Summons, and Order-DRO upon Geico Casualty Co. on 11/9/2023 (efoga, )
November 28, 2023 Filing 4 COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND against Geico Casualty Co., filed by Thuy Vy Nguyen.(efoga, )
November 28, 2023 Filing 3 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (efoga, )
November 28, 2023 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint by Geico Casualty Company.(Falls, Gregory)
November 28, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Geico Casualty Company from Denver District Court, Case Number 2023CV32874. (Filing fee $ 402, Receipt Number ACODC-9414345), filed by Geico Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Index of State Court Filed Documents, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Civil Case Cover Sheet, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Complaint and Jury Demand, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 3 - Delay Reduction Order, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 4 - Return of Service, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 5 - Register of Action, #8 Exhibit Corporate Disclosure Statement)(Falls, Gregory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nguyen v. Geico Casualty Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thuy Vy Nguyen
Represented By: Sean Michael Dormer
Represented By: Timothy M. Garvey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geico Casualty Co.
Represented By: Gregory Keith Falls
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEICO Indemnity Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?